This case was last updated from PACER on 09/13/2020 at 11:56:39 (UTC).

Adams et al v. Pearl River Valley Water Supply District

Case Summary

On 07/15/2020 Adams filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Pearl River Valley Water Supply District. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Linda R. Anderson and Henry T. Wingate. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00469

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Linda R. Anderson

Presiding Judge

Henry T. Wingate

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

John Quincy Adams

Alean Adams

Defendants

Pearl River Valley Water Supply District

Ben Evans

Jack Winstead

Bruce Brackin

Lonnie Johnson

John Pittman

Phillip Crosby

Tedrick Ratcliff

Kenny Latham

Kenny Windham

W. C. Gorden

Billy Cook

Jennifer Hall

Samuel Mitchell

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ellis Turnage

Attorney at ELLIS TURNAGE, ATTORNEY

P.O. Box 216

Cleveland, MS 38732-0216

Defendant Attorney

Justin L. Matheny-State Gov

Attorney at MISSISSIPPI ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE

P. O. Box 220, 550 High Street (39201)

Jackson, MS 39205-0220

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to re #12 Plaintiffs' First Amended Class Action Complaint by Bruce Brackin, Billy Cook, Phillip Crosby, Ben Evans, W. C. Gorden, Jennifer Hall, Lonnie Johnson, Kenny Latham, Samuel Mitchell, Pearl River Valley Water Supply District, John Pittman, Tedrick Ratcliff, Kenny Windham, Jack Winstead (Matheny-State Gov, Justin) Modified on 9/4/2020 (LAT). (Entered: 09/04/2020)

12 #3

Exhibit 3 - Estate Proceeding Documents for Estate of Joseph L. Adams, D

12 #2

Exhibit 2 - Warranty Deed (Joseph L. & Ruth Adams)

12 #1

Exhibit 1 - Warranty Deed (John Q. and Alean Adams)

#12

(#12) AMENDED COMPLAINT Class Action against Jennifer Hall, Ben Evans, Billy Cook, Jack Winstead, Samuel Mitchell, Lonnie Johnson, Tedrick Ratcliff, Kenny Windham, Bruce Brackin, Phillip Crosby, John Pittman, Kenny Latham, W. C. Gorden, filed by John Quincy Adams, Alean Adams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Warranty Deed (John Q. and Alean Adams), #2 Exhibit 2 - Warranty Deed (Joseph L. & Ruth Adams), #3 Exhibit 3 - Estate Proceeding Documents for Estate of Joseph L. Adams, Deceased)(Turnage, Ellis) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

#11

(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Quincy Adams, Alean Adams. Pearl River Valley Water Supply District served on 7/29/2020, answer due 8/20/2020. (Turnage, Ellis) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

#10

(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Quincy Adams, Alean Adams. Pearl River Valley Water Supply District served on 7/30/2020, answer due 8/20/2020. (Turnage, Ellis) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

#9

(#9) MOTION to Withdraw #8 MOTION to Amend/Correct #7 Order Staying Discovery, by Alean Adams, John Quincy Adams (Turnage, Ellis) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

8 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order Staying Discovery Not Related To The Eleventh

#8

(#8) MOTION to Amend/Correct #7 Order Staying Discovery, by Alean Adams, John Quincy Adams (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order Staying Discovery Not Related To The Eleventh Amendment Immunity Issue)(Turnage, Ellis) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

#7

(#7) ORDER STAYING DISCOVERY. In accordance with Local Rule 16(b)(3)(E), upon receiving a ruling from the Court on the pending dispositive motion, Plaintiffs shall notify the United States Magistrate Judge of a decision on the pending dispositive motion and, if appropriate, submit an order lifting the stay. Within fourteen days (14) of the order lifting the stay, the parties shall confer in accordance with the Local Rules. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 8/12/2020 (Lewis, Nijah) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

#6

(#6) MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction on Eleventh Amendment Immunity Grounds filed by Pearl River Valley Water Supply District (Matheny-State Gov, Justin) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

5 #2

Exhibit B - 2020 HB 1722

5 #1

Exhibit A - Sigman Declaration

#5

(#5) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction on Eleventh Amendment Immunity Grounds by Pearl River Valley Water Supply District (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Sigman Declaration, #2 Exhibit B - 2020 HB 1722)(Matheny-State Gov, Justin) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Pearl River Valley Water Supply District. (VM) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

#3

(#3) ***ERROR***DISREGARD THIS ENTRY***Letter from Arthur Johnston, Clerk to Eva Givens, Clerk of Adams County Circuit Court transmitting certified copies of Order and Docket Sheet. (KNS) Modified on 7/16/2020 (KNS). (Entered: 07/16/2020)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Pearl River Valley Water Supply District. (VM) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ONLY ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; All Defendants' Answer due 9/21/2020. NO WRITTEN ORDER TO FOLLOW. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 9/4/2020. (ACF) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to re #12 Plaintiffs' First Amended Class Action Complaint by Bruce Brackin, Billy Cook, Phillip Crosby, Ben Evans, W. C. Gorden, Jennifer Hall, Lonnie Johnson, Kenny Latham, Samuel Mitchell, Pearl River Valley Water Supply District, John Pittman, Tedrick Ratcliff, Kenny Windham, Jack Winstead (Matheny-State Gov, Justin) Modified on 9/4/2020 (LAT). (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) AMENDED COMPLAINT Class Action against Jennifer Hall, Ben Evans, Billy Cook, Jack Winstead, Samuel Mitchell, Lonnie Johnson, Tedrick Ratcliff, Kenny Windham, Bruce Brackin, Phillip Crosby, John Pittman, Kenny Latham, W. C. Gorden, filed by John Quincy Adams, Alean Adams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Warranty Deed (John Q. and Alean Adams), #2 Exhibit 2 - Warranty Deed (Joseph L. & Ruth Adams), #3 Exhibit 3 - Estate Proceeding Documents for Estate of Joseph L. Adams, Deceased)(Turnage, Ellis) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson: Telephonic Discovery Conference held on 8/20/2020. Participants: Ellis Turnage and Justin Matheny. The Court spoke with Counsel. Order to be entered setting deadline to amend Complaint and granting motion to withdraw. (Lewis, Nijah) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ONLY ORDER re: telephonic hearing conducted 8/20/2020; withdrawing Plaintiffs' #8 Motion to Amend the Stay Order, granting the #9 Motion to Withdraw #8 . Plaintiffs are granted until August 31, 2020, to file an Amended Complaint. NO WRITTEN ORDER TO FOLLOW. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 8/20/2020. (ACF) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketSet/Reset Hearings: Scheduling Conference set for 8/20/2020 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call; and once all parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4440. (Lewis, Nijah) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Quincy Adams, Alean Adams. Pearl River Valley Water Supply District served on 7/29/2020, answer due 8/20/2020. (Turnage, Ellis) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Quincy Adams, Alean Adams. Pearl River Valley Water Supply District served on 7/30/2020, answer due 8/20/2020. (Turnage, Ellis) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Withdraw #8 MOTION to Amend/Correct #7 Order Staying Discovery, by Alean Adams, John Quincy Adams (Turnage, Ellis) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Amend/Correct #7 Order Staying Discovery, by Alean Adams, John Quincy Adams (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order Staying Discovery Not Related To The Eleventh Amendment Immunity Issue)(Turnage, Ellis) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER STAYING DISCOVERY. In accordance with Local Rule 16(b)(3)(E), upon receiving a ruling from the Court on the pending dispositive motion, Plaintiffs shall notify the United States Magistrate Judge of a decision on the pending dispositive motion and, if appropriate, submit an order lifting the stay. Within fourteen days (14) of the order lifting the stay, the parties shall confer in accordance with the Local Rules. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 8/12/2020 (Lewis, Nijah) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction on Eleventh Amendment Immunity Grounds filed by Pearl River Valley Water Supply District (Matheny-State Gov, Justin) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction on Eleventh Amendment Immunity Grounds by Pearl River Valley Water Supply District (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Sigman Declaration, #2 Exhibit B - 2020 HB 1722)(Matheny-State Gov, Justin) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Pearl River Valley Water Supply District. (VM) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKET ANNOTATION as to #3 : Document has been filed in the wrong case. It should be disregarded. (KNS) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ***ERROR***DISREGARD THIS ENTRY***Letter from Arthur Johnston, Clerk to Eva Givens, Clerk of Adams County Circuit Court transmitting certified copies of Order and Docket Sheet. (KNS) Modified on 7/16/2020 (KNS). (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Pearl River Valley Water Supply District. (VM) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY INJUNCTIVE AND EQUITABLE RELIEF against Pearl River Valley Water Supply District ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4321713), filed by John Quincy Adams, Alean Adams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Warranty Deed (John & Alean Adams), #2 Exhibit 2 - Warranty Deed (Joseph & Ruth Adams), #3 Exhibit 3 - Joseph L. Adams Estate Documents, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(VM) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Justin L. Matheny-State Gov