This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/03/2019 at 07:11:07 (UTC).

Adamo Demolition Group et al v. International Union of Operating Engineers Local 150 et al

Case Summary

On 07/05/2019 Adamo Demolition Group filed a Labor - National Labor Relations Act lawsuit against International Union of Operating Engineers Local 150. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Terrence G. Berg, Elizabeth A. Stafford, Linda V. Parker and R. Steven Whalen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-11999

  • Filing Date:

    07/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - National Labor Relations Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Terrence G. Berg

Linda V. Parker

Referral Judges

Elizabeth A. Stafford

R. Steven Whalen

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Adamo Demolition Group

Adamo Group, Inc.

Defendants

International Union of Operating Engineers Local 150

James M. Sweeney

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ronald G. Acho

Attorney at Cummings, McClorey,

17436 College Parkway

Livonia, MI 48152

Defendant Attorney

John R. Canzano

Attorney at McKnight, Canzano, Smith, Radtke & Brault, P.C.

423 N. Main Street, Suite 200

Royal Oak, MI 48067

 

Court Documents

#14

#13

12 #6

Exhibit Ex. 5

12 #5

Exhibit Ex. 4

12 #4

Exhibit Ex. 3

12 #3

Exhibit Ex. 2

12 #2

Exhibit Ex. 1

#12

#11

7 #3

Exhibit 2: Cuppetilli Affidavit

7 #2

Exhibit 1: Gunn Affidavit

7 #1

Index of Exhibits

#7

6 #4

Exhibit Ex. 3

6 #3

Exhibit Ex. 2

6 #2

Exhibit Ex. 1

6 #1

Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits

#6

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) STIPULATION AND ORDER for Extension of Time to Reply to Defendants' Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's #7 Motion to Remand. (Reply due by 9/6/2019). Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (BSau) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) REPLY to Response re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by International Union of Operating Engineers Local 150, James M. Sweeney. (Canzano, John) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) RESPONSE to #7 MOTION to Remand Action to Wayne County Circuit Court filed by International Union of Operating Engineers Local 150, James M. Sweeney. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit Ex. 1, #3 Exhibit Ex. 2, #4 Exhibit Ex. 3, #5 Exhibit Ex. 4, #6 Exhibit Ex. 5) (Canzano, John) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) STIPULATED ORDER for Extension of Time for (1) Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's #7 MOTION to Remand, and (2) for Defendant's Reply Brief in Support of #6 MOTION to Dismiss (Defendants' Response due by 8/23/2019, Defendant's Reply due by 8/23/2019). Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) RESPONSE to #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A: Cuppetilli Affidavit, #3 Exhibit B: Gunn Affidavit) (Acho, Ronald) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) STIPULATED ORDER Allowing Plaintiffs to Exceed the Page Limit by up to Five Additional Pages Regarding Their Brief in Support of Their Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (EKar) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) OBJECTION to #1 Notice of Removal, by All Plaintiffs. (Acho, Ronald) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Remand Action to Wayne County Circuit Court by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1: Gunn Affidavit, #3 Exhibit 2: Cuppetilli Affidavit) (Acho, Ronald) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Dismiss by International Union of Operating Engineers Local 150, James M. Sweeney. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Ex. 1, #3 Exhibit Ex. 2, #4 Exhibit Ex. 3) (Canzano, John) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER Regarding Removal. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Terrence G. Berg and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford to District Judge Linda V. Parker and Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (SSch) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald G. Acho on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Acho, Ronald) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of Error directed to: John R. Canzano re #1 Notice of Remova. Parties listed on the initiating document were omitted [ADAMO GROUP]. The filing attorney must use the docket event Addition of Parties to correct the error. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (DWor) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE by International Union of Operating Engineers Local 150, James M. Sweeney re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice of Filing Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Jt Notice of Removal) (Canzano, John) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by James M. Sweeney, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 150 Joint Notice of Removal from Third Judicial Circuit, case number 19-008077-cz. Receipt No: 0645-7310779 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Canzano, John) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Adamo Group Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Adamo Demolition Company is a litigant

Latest cases where International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 150, AFL-CIO is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ronald G. Acho