This case was last updated from PACER on 07/23/2019 at 07:33:25 (UTC).

Adamo Demolition Company v. International Union of Operating Engineers Local 150 et al

Case Summary

On 05/24/2019 Adamo Demolition Company filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against International Union of Operating Engineers Local 150. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Linda V. Parker and R. Steven Whalen. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-11526

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Linda V. Parker

Referral Judge

R. Steven Whalen

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Adamo Demolition Company

Adamo Group Inc.

Adamo Group

Defendants

International Union of Operating Engineers Local 150

James M. Sweeney

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ronald G. Acho

Attorney at Cummings, McClorey,

17436 College Parkway

Livonia, MI 48152

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) ORDER of DISMISSAL. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#6

(#6) Order Vacating #4 Order to Show Cause. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Withdrawal of Claim re #1 Complaint,, . (Acho, Ronald) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER to Show Cause. Show Cause Response due by 6/11/2019. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Issued for *James M. Sweeney* (NAhm) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Issued for *International Union of Operating Engineers Local 150* (NAhm) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Adamo Demolition Company against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7254344 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Cook County, Illinois. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Acho, Ronald) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER of DISMISSAL. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Order Vacating #4 Order to Show Cause. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Withdrawal of Claim re #1 Complaint,, . (Acho, Ronald) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER to Show Cause. Show Cause Response due by 6/11/2019. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (NAhm) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS Issued for *James M. Sweeney* (NAhm) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS Issued for *International Union of Operating Engineers Local 150* (NAhm) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Adamo Demolition Company against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7254344 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Cook County, Illinois. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Acho, Ronald) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Adamo Group Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Adamo Demolition Company is a litigant

Latest cases where International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 150, AFL-CIO is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ronald G. Acho