This case was last updated from PACER on 10/12/2020 at 09:08:28 (UTC).

ADAMAS PHARMA, LLC v. ZYDUS WORLDWIDE DMCC et al

Case Summary

On 08/13/2020 ADAMAS PHARMA, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against ZYDUS WORLDWIDE DMCC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Douglas E. Arpert, Freda L. Wolfson, Brian R. Martinotti and Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-10463

  • Filing Date:

    08/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Referral Judges

Douglas E. Arpert

Tonianne J. Bongiovanni

Presiding Judges

Freda L. Wolfson

Brian R. Martinotti

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ADAMAS PHARMA, LLC

Defendants

ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC.

ZYDUS WORLDWIDE DMCC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CHARLES MICHAEL LIZZA

Attorney at SAUL EWING ARNSTEIN & LEHR LLP

One Riverfront Plaza

Newark, NJ 07102-5490

WILLIAM C. BATON

Attorney at SAUL EWING ARNSTEIN & LEHR LLP

One Riverfront Plaza, 1037 Raymond Blvd., Suite 1520

Newark, NJ 07102

SARAH ANN SULLIVAN

Attorney at SAUL EWING ARNSTEIN & LEHR LLP

One Riverfront Plaza, Suite 1520

Newark, NJ 07102-5426

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by SARAH ANN SULLIVAN on behalf of ADAMAS PHARMA, LLC (SULLIVAN, SARAH) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM C. BATON on behalf of ADAMAS PHARMA, LLC (BATON, WILLIAM) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC., ZYDUS WORLDWIDE DMCC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mg) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by ADAMAS PHARMA, LLC. (LIZZA, CHARLES) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC., ZYDUS WORLDWIDE DMCC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11206684), filed by ADAMAS PHARMA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LIZZA, CHARLES) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2020
  • Docket(#6) TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson, Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 8/18/2020. (jjc, ) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by SARAH ANN SULLIVAN on behalf of ADAMAS PHARMA, LLC (SULLIVAN, SARAH) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM C. BATON on behalf of ADAMAS PHARMA, LLC (BATON, WILLIAM) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC., ZYDUS WORLDWIDE DMCC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mg) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketChief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (mg) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by ADAMAS PHARMA, LLC. (LIZZA, CHARLES) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC., ZYDUS WORLDWIDE DMCC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11206684), filed by ADAMAS PHARMA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LIZZA, CHARLES) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less