This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 08:07:39 (UTC).

Adam v. D & W Fine Pack

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Adam filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against D W Fine Pack. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Holly A Brady and Susan L Collins. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00010

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Holly A Brady

Referral Judge

Susan L Collins

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jessie A Adam

Defendants

D & W Fine Pack

Janet Pierre

Renard Hollard

Nemeih Slaughter

Not Classified By Court

Anthony Stites

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Samuel L Bolinger

803 S Calhoun St Ste 300

Fort Wayne, IN 46802

Defendant Attorneys

Renee J Mortimer

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP - Hi/IN

2211 Main St Ste 3-2A

Highland, IN 46322

Allison R Wallrapp-McMullan

Attorney at Shankman Leone PA

707 N Franklin St 5Th Fl

Tampa, FL 33602

David S Shankman

Attorney at Shankman Leone PA

707 N Franklin St 5Th Fl

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#6

(#6) MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by David S Shankman on behalf of D & W Fine Pack (Shankman, David) ***FILING ERROR ATTORNEY INSTRUCTED TO RE-FILE; REFILED AT #10 *** Modified on 2/6/2020 (ace). (Entered: 02/04/2020)

#12

(#12) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Wallrapp-McMullan, Allison) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

#17

(#17) SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMORANDUM OF PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: The Court sets the following deadlines pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b): Initial Disclosures to be exchanged by 3/5/2020. Discovery deadline is 5/3/2021. The serving of reports from retained experts under Rule 26(a)(2) are due from Plaintiff by 2/8/2021; and from Defendant by 3/8/2021. Supplementation under Rule 26(e) due by 4/6/2021. Amended pleadings deadline as to Plaintiff is 5/1/2020; as to Defendant is 6/1/2020. Dispositive motions deadline is 6/3/2021, with any response due 28 days thereafter and any reply due 14 days after the filing of a response. The parties are encouraged to engage in direct negotiations and/or alternate dispute resolution with mediator Anthony Stites, as outlined in Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 2/12/2020. (lhc) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Renee J Mortimer on behalf of D & W Fine Pack (Mortimer, Renee) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#19

(#19) ORDER: The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's motion to amend ECF #13 . The Clerk is DIRECTED to show Plaintiff's amended complaint ECF #14 and its exhibits ECF [14-1] and [14-2] as filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 2/25/20. (nal) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

1 #1

Exhibit A - State Court Record

14 #1

Exhibit A

#20

(#20) AMENDED COMPLAINT against D & W Fine Pack, Janet Pierre, Nemeih Slaughter and Renard Hollard filed by Jessie A Adam. No proposed summons filed. (nal) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

#7

Reset Deadlines: Answer due 2/10/2020 per #7 Agreed Notice. (jld) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by D & W Fine Pack. (Mortimer, Renee) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 2/12/2020 at 9:30 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Court to initiate call.(mr) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#18

(#18) Defendant D&W Fine Pack's ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint For Damages by D & W Fine Pack.(Shankman, David) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

#14

(#14) Proposed AMENDED COMPLAINT against D & W Fine Pack, filed by Jessie A Adam. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Bolinger, Samuel) Modified on 2/6/2020 (jld). (Entered: 02/05/2020)

#13

(#13) MOTION to Amend/Correct #4 State Court Complaint by Plaintiff Jessie A Adam. (Bolinger, Samuel) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4108192.) from Allen Superior Court, Cause No. 02D03-1912-PL-000470, filed by D & W Fine Pack. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mortimer, Renee) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

14 #2

Exhibit B

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) AMENDED COMPLAINT against D & W Fine Pack, Janet Pierre, Nemeih Slaughter and Renard Hollard filed by Jessie A Adam. No proposed summons filed. (nal) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER: The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's motion to amend ECF #13 . The Clerk is DIRECTED to show Plaintiff's amended complaint ECF #14 and its exhibits ECF [14-1] and [14-2] as filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 2/25/20. (nal) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Defendant D&W Fine Pack's ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint For Damages by D & W Fine Pack.(Shankman, David) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMORANDUM OF PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: The Court sets the following deadlines pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b): Initial Disclosures to be exchanged by 3/5/2020. Discovery deadline is 5/3/2021. The serving of reports from retained experts under Rule 26(a)(2) are due from Plaintiff by 2/8/2021; and from Defendant by 3/8/2021. Supplementation under Rule 26(e) due by 4/6/2021. Amended pleadings deadline as to Plaintiff is 5/1/2020; as to Defendant is 6/1/2020. Dispositive motions deadline is 6/3/2021, with any response due 28 days thereafter and any reply due 14 days after the filing of a response. The parties are encouraged to engage in direct negotiations and/or alternate dispute resolution with mediator Anthony Stites, as outlined in Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 2/12/2020. (lhc) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) TELEPHONIC RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 2/12/2020 before Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry. Pla appeared by atty Samuel Bolinger. Dft appeared by atty Allison Wallrapp-McMullan. Dft has no objection to Pla's #13 Motion to Amend Complaint. Pla anticipates filing a Second Motion to Amend Complaint. The #12 Report of the Parties Planning Meeting is approved, as amended, in all respects (except establishment of a trial date). Anthony Stites appointed as Mediator. Magistrate Consent forms due by 3/4/2020. Court to issue Scheduling Order. (FTR 1st floor.) (mr) Modified on 2/12/2020 to add language (mr). (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) CERTIFICATE Attorney - Client Certification. (Bolinger, Samuel) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Proposed AMENDED COMPLAINT against D & W Fine Pack, filed by Jessie A Adam. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Bolinger, Samuel) Modified on 2/6/2020 (jld). (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION to Amend/Correct #4 State Court Complaint by Plaintiff Jessie A Adam. (Bolinger, Samuel) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Wallrapp-McMullan, Allison) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Allison R Wallrapp-McMullan on behalf of D & W Fine Pack (Wallrapp-McMullan, Allison) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Allison R Wallrapp-McMullan on behalf of D & W Fine Pack (Wallrapp-McMullan, Allison) ***FILING ERROR ATTORNEY INSTRUCTED TO RE-FILE; REFILED AT #11 *** Modified on 2/6/2020 (ace). (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by David S Shankman on behalf of D & W Fine Pack (Shankman, David) ***FILING ERROR ATTORNEY INSTRUCTED TO RE-FILE; REFILED AT #10 *** Modified on 2/6/2020 (ace). (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReset Deadlines: Answer due 2/10/2020 per #7 Agreed Notice. (jld) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by D & W Fine Pack ; answer due by February 10, 2020. (Mortimer, Renee) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 2/12/2020 at 9:30 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Court to initiate call.(mr) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketJudge Holly A Brady and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. *NEW CASE* (lhc) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by D & W Fine Pack. (Mortimer, Renee) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Renee J Mortimer on behalf of D & W Fine Pack (Mortimer, Renee) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4108192.) from Allen Superior Court, Cause No. 02D03-1912-PL-000470, filed by D & W Fine Pack. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mortimer, Renee) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.