This case was last updated from PACER on 01/12/2021 at 11:54:29 (UTC).

Ad Hoc Committee of Equity Interest Holders

Case Summary

On 11/13/2020 Ad Hoc Committee of Equity Interest Holders was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Nelva Gonzales Ramos. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00280

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nelva Gonzales Ramos

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Ad Hoc Group of First Lienholders

Appellants

Ad Hoc Committee of Equity Interest Holders

Li Li

Houston, TX 77025

In Re

J. C. Penney Company, Inc.

Interested Parties

Walker & Patterson, P.C.

Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors

Brookfield Property Group LLC and Simon JCP Holdings, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Alan J Stone

Attorney at Milbank LLP

55 Hudson Yards

New York, NY 10001

Andrew M. Leblanc

Attorney at Milbank Tweed Hadley & McCloy

1850 K. Street Nw, Ste 1100

Washington, DC 20006

John F Higgins, IV

Attorney at Porter Hedges LLP

1000 Main St, Suite 3600

Houston, TX 77002

Appellant and Interested Party Attorneys

Johnie J Patterson, II

Attorney at Walker & Patterson

P O Box 61301

Houston, TX 77208-1301

Miriam Trubek Goott

Attorney at Walker & Patterson PC

4815 Dacoma

Houston, TX 77092

Seth Van Aalten

Attorney at Kronish Lief et al

1114 Ave Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

Michael D Warner

Attorney at Cole Schotz et al

301 Commerce St, Suite 1700

Fort Worth, TX 76102

Cathy Hershcopf

Attorney at Kronish Lieb et al

1114 Ave Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036-7798

Brian Hermann

Attorney at Paul Weiss et al

1285 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019

Timothy Alvin Davidson, II

Attorney at Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP

600 Travis, Ste 4200

Houston, TX 77002

In Re Attorneys

Joshua Walton Wolfshohl

Attorney at Porter Hedges LLP

1000 Main St, Ste 3600

Houston, TX 77002

Matthew Dudley Cavenaugh

Attorney at Jackson Walker

1401 Mckinney Street, Ste 1900

Houston, TX 77010

Veronica A Polnick

Attorney at Jackson Walker, LLP

1401 Mckinney St., Suite 1900

Houston, TX 77010

Kristhy M Peguero

Attorney at Jackson Walker LLP

1401 Mckinney St, Ste 1900

Houston, TX 77010

Christopher Marcus

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

601 Lexington Ave

New York, NY 10022

Jennifer Francine Wertz

Attorney at Jackson Walker LLP

100 Congress Ave, Suite 1100

Austin, TX 78701

Aparna Yenamandra

Attorney at Kirkland Ellis LLP

601 Lexington Ave

New York, NY 10022

Joshua A Sussberg

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

601 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Michael B. Slade

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis, LLP

300 North Lasalle

Chicago, IL 60654

3 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

61 #1

Exhibit 1

#61

(#61) RESPONSE to #55 MOTION TO RECEIVE NOTICE OF CASE ACTIVITIES AND DOCUMENTS , filed by J. C. Penney Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Cavenaugh, Matthew) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

60 #3

Exhibit C

60 #2

Exhibit B

60 #1

Exhibit A

#60

(#60) Unopposed MOTION to Abate by J. C. Penney Company, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 2/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Cavenaugh, Matthew) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

#59

(#59) APPELLANTS SECOND AMENDED OPENING BRIEF by Li Li, filed.(bcortez, 2) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

#58

(#58) NOTICE Of Response To Court's Request re: #54 Order, by Walker & Patterson, P.C., filed. (Patterson, Johnie) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

#55

(#61) RESPONSE to #55 MOTION TO RECEIVE NOTICE OF CASE ACTIVITIES AND DOCUMENTS , filed by J. C. Penney Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Cavenaugh, Matthew) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

5 #1

Service List

#5

(#5) NOTICE Of Parties Served by Ad Hoc Committee of Equity Interest Holders, filed. (Attachments: #1 Service List)(Patterson, Johnie) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua A. Sussberg, Christopher A. Marcus, Aparna Yenamandra, Michael B. Slade, Matthew D. Cavenaugh, Jennifer F. Wertz, Kristhy M. Peguero, Veronica A. Polnick on behalf of J. C. Penney Company, Inc., filed. (Cavenaugh, Matthew) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

#3

(#3) ORDER REGARDING NOTICE AND RESPONSES. The Court ORDERS AHEC to serve all appropriate interested parties with a copy of its motion and this Order at or before 4:30 p.m. today, November 16, 2020. The Court further ORDERS AHEC to file a certificate of service listing the parties served and/or stating the reasons service is not necessary on or before Tuesday, November 17, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. The Court ORDERS that all interested parties who wish to be heard must file a response to the motion (D.E. 2) on or before Wednesday, November 18, 2020, at 12:00 noon. Motion Hearing set for 11/20/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. All parties who wish to speak on the matter at the hearing must contact the Courts case manager, Brandy Cortez, at their earliest convenience, but no later than Wednesday, November 18, 2020, at 12:00 noon to announce to the Court the amount of time expected to be needed in their court appearance.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(bcortez, 2) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

2 #2

Proposed Order

2 #1

Proposed Order Setting Hearing

#2

(#2) EMERGENCY MOTION( Motion Docket Date 12/7/2020.), MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal by Ad Hoc Committee of Equity Interest Holders, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Setting Hearing, #2 Proposed Order)(Patterson, Johnie) (Entered: 11/15/2020)

1 #1

Notice of Appeal

#1

(#51) Appellant's SECOND AMENDED RESPONSE to #44 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Clerk's Notice of Filing of an Appeal from the Bankruptcy Court, Motion of Appellee J. C. Penney Company, Inc. to Dismiss Appeal as Moot and for Lack of Standing, (jguajardo, 4) (Entered: 12/31/2020)

90 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) RESPONSE to #55 MOTION TO RECEIVE NOTICE OF CASE ACTIVITIES AND DOCUMENTS , filed by J. C. Penney Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Cavenaugh, Matthew) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) Unopposed MOTION to Abate by J. C. Penney Company, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 2/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Cavenaugh, Matthew) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) APPELLANTS SECOND AMENDED OPENING BRIEF by Li Li, filed.(bcortez, 2) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) NOTICE Of Response To Court's Request re: #54 Order, by Walker & Patterson, P.C., filed. (Patterson, Johnie) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) AMENDED OPENDING Appellant's BRIEF by Li Li, filed.(hlerma, 4) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) Appellant's Opening BRIEF by Li Li, filed.(bcortez, 2) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) ORDER re: #53 Corrected EMERGENCY MOTION MOTION for Walker & Patterson to Withdraw as Attorney Responses due by 1/11/2021. Movants are ORDERED to address these issues on or before January 11, 2021. Pending this information, the Court takes the motion UNDER ADVISEMENT.ORDERED this(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(legarza, 2) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) Corrected EMERGENCY MOTION, MOTION for Walker & Patterson to Withdraw as Attorney( Motion Docket Date 1/21/2021.) by Walker & Patterson, P.C., filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Patterson, Johnie) (Entered: 12/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) EMERGENCY MOTION, MOTION for Walker & Patterson to Withdraw as Attorney( Motion Docket Date 1/21/2021.) by Walker & Patterson, P.C., filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Patterson, Johnie) (Entered: 12/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) Appellant's SECOND AMENDED RESPONSE to #44 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Clerk's Notice of Filing of an Appeal from the Bankruptcy Court, Motion of Appellee J. C. Penney Company, Inc. to Dismiss Appeal as Moot and for Lack of Standing, (jguajardo, 4) (Entered: 12/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
45 More Docket Entries
  • 11/17/2020
  • Docket***The hearing set for November 20, 2020 at 9:00 a.m. will be conducted by Zoom. Zoom link has been emailed to the attorneys listed on the docket sheet., filed. (bcortez, 2) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Michael B. Slade to Appear Pro Hac Vice by J. C. Penney Company, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 12/8/2020. (Cavenaugh, Matthew) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Joshua A. Sussberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice by J. C. Penney Company, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 12/8/2020. (Cavenaugh, Matthew) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Christopher Marcus to Appear Pro Hac Vice by J. C. Penney Company, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 12/8/2020. (Cavenaugh, Matthew) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Aparna Yenamandra to Appear Pro Hac Vice by J. C. Penney Company, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 12/8/2020. (Cavenaugh, Matthew) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE Of Parties Served by Ad Hoc Committee of Equity Interest Holders, filed. (Attachments: #1 Service List)(Patterson, Johnie) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua A. Sussberg, Christopher A. Marcus, Aparna Yenamandra, Michael B. Slade, Matthew D. Cavenaugh, Jennifer F. Wertz, Kristhy M. Peguero, Veronica A. Polnick on behalf of J. C. Penney Company, Inc., filed. (Cavenaugh, Matthew) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER REGARDING NOTICE AND RESPONSES. The Court ORDERS AHEC to serve all appropriate interested parties with a copy of its motion and this Order at or before 4:30 p.m. today, November 16, 2020. The Court further ORDERS AHEC to file a certificate of service listing the parties served and/or stating the reasons service is not necessary on or before Tuesday, November 17, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. The Court ORDERS that all interested parties who wish to be heard must file a response to the motion (D.E. 2) on or before Wednesday, November 18, 2020, at 12:00 noon. Motion Hearing set for 11/20/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. All parties who wish to speak on the matter at the hearing must contact the Courts case manager, Brandy Cortez, at their earliest convenience, but no later than Wednesday, November 18, 2020, at 12:00 noon to announce to the Court the amount of time expected to be needed in their court appearance.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(bcortez, 2) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) EMERGENCY MOTION( Motion Docket Date 12/7/2020.), MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal by Ad Hoc Committee of Equity Interest Holders, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Setting Hearing, #2 Proposed Order)(Patterson, Johnie) (Entered: 11/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Clerks Notice of Filing of an Appeal from an Order or Judgment of the Bankruptcy Court. On November 13, 2020, Ad Hoc Committee of Equity Interest Holders filed a notice of appeal. The appeal has been assigned to U.S. District Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos, Civil Action 2:20cv280. Parties notified, filed. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal)(rwestmoreland, 4) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where J.C PENNEY CORPORATION, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew M. Leblanc

Latest cases represented by Lawyer A.J. Stone, III

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John F Higgins, IV