This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/01/2022 at 09:16:48 (UTC).

Acuna v. American Campus Communities, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/02/2022 Acuna filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against American Campus Communities, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Carol Bagley Amon and James R. Cho. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-03254

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Carol Bagley Amon

Referral Judge

James R. Cho

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Samuel Acuna

Defendants

American Campus Communities, Inc.

Bill Bayless

Herman Bulls

Steve Dawson

Cydney Donnell

Mary C. Egan

Alison Hill

Craig Leupold

Oliver Luck

Pat Oles

John T. Rippel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Daniel Sadeh

Attorney at Halper Sadeh LLP

667 Madison Avenue, Ste 5Th Floor

New York, NY 10065

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Proposed Summons

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

#3

(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

#4

(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Samuel Acuna (Sadeh, Daniel) (Entered: 06/19/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Terminated. (Fernandez, Erica) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Samuel Acuna (Sadeh, Daniel) (Entered: 06/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Carol Bagley Amon and Magistrate Judge James R. Cho for all further proceedings. Judge Allyne R. Ross, Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 6/16/2022. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 06/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: To assist the Court in its review of this action, plaintiff is directed to submit a letter on or before July 1, 2022, responding to the following:1. Does plaintiff claim any concrete, particularized injury in fact from the statutory violations alleged in the Amended Complaint? If so, please set forth such injury/injuries with particularity.2. If plaintiff is not claiming any concrete injury, in light of the Supreme Court's decision in Transunion LLC v. Ramirez, 141 S. Ct. 2190 (2021), plaintiff shall provide a basis for standing in this action or indicate whether the action should be dismissed.Defendants shall file any response to plaintiff's submission by July 15, 2022, or within ten days of their appearance in the case, whichever is later.Ordered by Judge Allyne R. Ross on 6/16/2022. (McLaughlin, Grace) (Entered: 06/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketNotice of Related Case: The Civil Cover Sheet filed in this civil action indicates a related case. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Allyne R. Ross and Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against American Campus Communities, Inc., Bill Bayless, Herman Bulls, Steve Dawson, Cydney Donnell, Mary C. Egan, Alison Hill, Craig Leupold, Oliver Luck, Pat Oles, John T. Rippel filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15622969 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Samuel Acuna. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Sadeh, Daniel) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN CAMPUS COMMUNITIES INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel Sadeh