This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 07:34:27 (UTC).

Acuity v. Hambicki's Truck & Container Sales Incorporated

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Acuity filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Hambicki's Truck Container Sales Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judge overseeing this case is John Z Boyle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00025

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arizona District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John Z Boyle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Acuity

Defendant

Hambicki's Truck & Container Sales Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael J Zdancewicz

Attorney at Windtberg & Zdancewicz PLC

P.O. Box 51826

Phoenix, AZ 85076

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) Order that Acuity show cause for failure to comply with LRCiv 3.7(b) before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. Show Cause Hearing set for 2/18/2020 at 04:30 PM before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. (Attachments: #1 Instructions, #2 Consent Form)(MAP) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

#4

(#4) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17799596. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John Z Boyle. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-0025-PHX-JZB. Magistrate Election form attached. (MCO) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

7 #2

Consent Form

#12

(#12) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Hambicki's Truck & Container Sales Incorporated. (SLQ) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

#11

(#11) *APPLICATION for Entry of Default as to Hambicki's Truck & Container Sales, Inc., an Arizona Corporation by Acuity. (Zdancewicz, Michael) *Modified to correct event; attorney noticed on 2/21/2020 (SLQ). (Entered: 02/20/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MCO) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17799596 filed by Acuity. (Zdancewicz, Michael) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MCO) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Submitted by Acuity. (Zdancewicz, Michael) (MCO) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

7 #1

Instructions

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Hambicki's Truck & Container Sales Incorporated. (MCO). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Acuity. (Zdancewicz, Michael) (MCO) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Hambicki's Truck & Container Sales Incorporated. (SLQ) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) *APPLICATION for Entry of Default as to Hambicki's Truck & Container Sales, Inc., an Arizona Corporation by Acuity. (Zdancewicz, Michael) *Modified to correct event; attorney noticed on 2/21/2020 (SLQ). (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • Docket(#10) MINUTE ORDER: That counsel having complied with this Court's Order, the Order to Show Cause Hearing scheduled for February 18, 2020 is hereby VACATED. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • Docket(#9) Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Order that Acuity show cause for failure to comply with LRCiv 3.7(b) before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. Show Cause Hearing set for 2/18/2020 at 04:30 PM before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. (Attachments: #1 Instructions, #2 Consent Form)(MAP) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Hambicki's Truck & Container Sales Incorporated. (MCO). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MCO) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17799596. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John Z Boyle. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-0025-PHX-JZB. Magistrate Election form attached. (MCO) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Submitted by Acuity. (Zdancewicz, Michael) (MCO) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Acuity. (Zdancewicz, Michael) (MCO) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17799596 filed by Acuity. (Zdancewicz, Michael) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MCO) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.