This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/13/2022 at 08:41:38 (UTC).

Acuity Insurance v. McBride

Case Summary

On 09/14/2022 Acuity Insurance filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against McBride. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Montana District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Susan P. Watters. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00100

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan P. Watters

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Acuity Insurance

Defendant

Rika McBride

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Philip B. Condra

Attorney at MILODRAGOVICH DALE STEINBRENNER

620 High Park Way, Po Box 4947

Missoula, MT 59806-4947

Rachel H. Parkin

Attorney at MILODRAGOVICH DALE STEINBRENNER

620 High Park Way, Po Box 4947

Missoula, MT 59806-4947

Defendant Attorney

Eric E. Holm

Attorney at HOLM LAW FIRM, PLLC

12 North 35Th Street

Billings, MT 59101

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit Supplement corporate disclosure statement

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Rika McBride. (E-filed summmons to be downloaded by plaintiffs attorney for service) (EMH) (Entered: 09/15/2022)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Acuity Insurance. (Parkin, Rachel) (Entered: 09/15/2022)

4 #4

Main Document

4 #1

Exhibit Acuity Exhibits (2)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Acuity Insurance. Rika McBride served on 9/19/2022, answer due 10/21/2022. (Parkin, Rachel) Modified on 10/14/2022 clerk updated the time in which to file per the notice by the party (AMC). (Entered: 10/14/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE by Acuity Insurance re #1 Complaint (Parkin, Rachel) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

#7

(#7) ORDER, IT IS ORDERED that a joint case management plan be filed with the Court on or before 11/23/2022. If parties are unable to agree on a joint case management plan, they shall each file separate case management plans on or before 11/23/2022. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 10/17/2022. (EMH) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Rika McBride. (Holm, Eric) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Rika McBride. (Holm, Eric) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER, IT IS ORDERED that a joint case management plan be filed with the Court on or before 11/23/2022. If parties are unable to agree on a joint case management plan, they shall each file separate case management plans on or before 11/23/2022. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 10/17/2022. (EMH) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE by Acuity Insurance re #1 Complaint (Parkin, Rachel) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Acuity Insurance. Rika McBride served on 9/19/2022, answer due 10/21/2022. (Parkin, Rachel) Modified on 10/14/2022 clerk updated the time in which to file per the notice by the party (AMC). (Entered: 10/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Filing Exhibits (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Acuity Exhibits (2)) (Parkin, Rachel) (Entered: 09/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Acuity Insurance. (Parkin, Rachel) (Entered: 09/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketRemark: REMINDER: Non-governmental corporate parties in civil cases are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements at the time of their initial appearance. The statement should disclose parent corporations and any publicly held corporation that owns 10% or more of the filing parties stock or state that no such corporate relationship exists. Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1(a) and (b). The corporate disclosure statement is e-filed by the parties as a separate entry following the opening of the case. (EMH) (Entered: 09/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketFiling fee received: $ 402, receipt number AMTDC-2935539. (EMH) (Entered: 09/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Rika McBride. (E-filed summmons to be downloaded by plaintiffs attorney for service) (EMH) (Entered: 09/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT AND REQUEST FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against Rika McBride, filed by Acuity Insurance, a Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Supplement corporate disclosure statement) (EMH) (Entered: 09/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less