1:22-CV-06303
11/11/2022
Pending - Other Pending
Contract - Insurance
John F. Kness
ACUITY A Mutual Insurance Company
KSA Lighting & Controls, Inc.
Jim Williams
Ashley Williams
Force Partners, LLC
Joseph Patrick Postel
Philip Goodwin Brandt
Main Document
Exhibit A
Exhibit B
Exhibit C
Exhibit D
Civil Cover Sheet
(#2) AMENDED complaint, #1 Civil Cover Sheet (Postel, Joseph) (Entered: 11/14/2022)
(#3) ORDER signed by the Honorable John F. Kness on 11/15/2022: Telephonic initial status hearing is set for 1/24/2023 at 9:30 AM. Consistent with Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the parties are directed to meet and conduct a planning conference in advance of the initial status hearing. No later than ten days before the status hearing, the parties shall jointly complete and file on the docket a report that provides the information required by the Court's model Joint Initial Status Report, which can be found at https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judge-info.aspx?Iu9/vqz23r5X7AkWx/nLtg== (see link entitled "Joint Initial Status Report"). If all Defendants have not yet been served or have not yet responded to requests to draft the required Joint Initial Status Report, Plaintiff must file the report on its own and must inform the Court of that circumstance. The parties are to use the following call-in number: 888-684-8852, conference code 3796759. The public and media representatives may have access to the hearing via the same number. Audio recording of the hearing is not permitted; violations of this prohibition may result in sanctions. Participants are directed to keep their device muted when they are not speaking. Mailed notice (ef, ) (Entered: 11/15/2022)
(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by ACUITY A Mutual Insurance Company. KSA Lighting & Controls, Inc. waiver sent on 12/2/2022, answer due 1/31/2023. (Postel, Joseph) (Entered: 12/05/2022)
(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by ACUITY A Mutual Insurance Company. Jim Williams waiver sent on 12/2/2022, answer due 1/31/2023. (Postel, Joseph) (Entered: 12/05/2022)
(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by ACUITY A Mutual Insurance Company. Ashley Williams waiver sent on 12/2/2022, answer due 1/31/2023. (Postel, Joseph) (Entered: 12/05/2022)
(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff ACUITY A Mutual Insurance Company by Philip Goodwin Brandt (Brandt, Philip) (Entered: 12/05/2022)
(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff ACUITY A Mutual Insurance Company by Joseph Patrick Postel (Postel, Joseph) (Entered: 12/07/2022)
(#9) ANNUAL REMINDER: Pursuant to #Local Rule 3.2 (Notification of Affiliates)#, any nongovernmental party, other than an individual or sole proprietorship, must file a statement identifying all its affiliates known to the party after diligent review or, if the party has identified no affiliates, then a statement reflecting that fact must be filed. An affiliate is defined as follows: any entity or individual owning, directly or indirectly (through ownership of one or more other entities), 5% or more of a party. The statement is to be electronically filed as a PDF in conjunction with entering the affiliates in CM/ECF as prompted. As a reminder to counsel, parties must supplement their statements of affiliates within thirty (30) days of any change in the information previously reported. This minute order is being issued to all counsel of record to remind counsel of their obligation to provide updated information as to additional affiliates if such updating is necessary. If counsel has any questions regarding this process, this #LINK# will provide additional information. Signed by the Executive Committee on 12/29/2022: Mailed notice. (tg, ) (Entered: 12/29/2022)
(#10) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by ACUITY A Mutual Insurance Company (Brandt, Philip) (Entered: 01/03/2023)
Docket(#10) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by ACUITY A Mutual Insurance Company (Brandt, Philip) (Entered: 01/03/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#9) ANNUAL REMINDER: Pursuant to #Local Rule 3.2 (Notification of Affiliates)#, any nongovernmental party, other than an individual or sole proprietorship, must file a statement identifying all its affiliates known to the party after diligent review or, if the party has identified no affiliates, then a statement reflecting that fact must be filed. An affiliate is defined as follows: any entity or individual owning, directly or indirectly (through ownership of one or more other entities), 5% or more of a party. The statement is to be electronically filed as a PDF in conjunction with entering the affiliates in CM/ECF as prompted. As a reminder to counsel, parties must supplement their statements of affiliates within thirty (30) days of any change in the information previously reported. This minute order is being issued to all counsel of record to remind counsel of their obligation to provide updated information as to additional affiliates if such updating is necessary. If counsel has any questions regarding this process, this #LINK# will provide additional information. Signed by the Executive Committee on 12/29/2022: Mailed notice. (tg, ) (Entered: 12/29/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff ACUITY A Mutual Insurance Company by Joseph Patrick Postel (Postel, Joseph) (Entered: 12/07/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff ACUITY A Mutual Insurance Company by Philip Goodwin Brandt (Brandt, Philip) (Entered: 12/05/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by ACUITY A Mutual Insurance Company. Ashley Williams waiver sent on 12/2/2022, answer due 1/31/2023. (Postel, Joseph) (Entered: 12/05/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by ACUITY A Mutual Insurance Company. Jim Williams waiver sent on 12/2/2022, answer due 1/31/2023. (Postel, Joseph) (Entered: 12/05/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by ACUITY A Mutual Insurance Company. KSA Lighting & Controls, Inc. waiver sent on 12/2/2022, answer due 1/31/2023. (Postel, Joseph) (Entered: 12/05/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#3) ORDER signed by the Honorable John F. Kness on 11/15/2022: Telephonic initial status hearing is set for 1/24/2023 at 9:30 AM. Consistent with Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the parties are directed to meet and conduct a planning conference in advance of the initial status hearing. No later than ten days before the status hearing, the parties shall jointly complete and file on the docket a report that provides the information required by the Court's model Joint Initial Status Report, which can be found at https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judge-info.aspx?Iu9/vqz23r5X7AkWx/nLtg== (see link entitled "Joint Initial Status Report"). If all Defendants have not yet been served or have not yet responded to requests to draft the required Joint Initial Status Report, Plaintiff must file the report on its own and must inform the Court of that circumstance. The parties are to use the following call-in number: 888-684-8852, conference code 3796759. The public and media representatives may have access to the hearing via the same number. Audio recording of the hearing is not permitted; violations of this prohibition may result in sanctions. Participants are directed to keep their device muted when they are not speaking. Mailed notice (ef, ) (Entered: 11/15/2022)
[-] Read LessDocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jk2, ) (Entered: 11/14/2022)
[-] Read LessDocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John F. Kness. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jk2, ) (Entered: 11/14/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#2) AMENDED complaint, #1 Civil Cover Sheet (Postel, Joseph) (Entered: 11/14/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#1) COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment filed by ACUITY A Mutual Insurance Company; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20038344. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Postel, Joseph) (Entered: 11/11/2022)
[-] Read Less