This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/02/2023 at 07:49:11 (UTC).

Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company v. Jvanwinkle Trucking, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 02/01/2023 Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Jvanwinkle Trucking, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-00015

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company

Defendants and Counter Defendants

Jvanwinkle Trucking, LLC

PGT Trucking, Inc.

Nina L. Marshall

Lora B. Schumer

Edward J. Hunter

Maxwell W. Hunter

L. H.

Rebecca Hunter

Colin A. Keele

Keaton R. Watson

Buckley Powder Co.

American Family Mutual Insurance Company

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Starr Indemnity & Liability Company

Liberty Mutual Insurance Company

Saint Francis Medical Center

Defendant and Counter Claimant

American Family Mutual Insurance Company

4 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James R. Howard

Elizabeth H. Weber

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Daniel J. Grimm

Kara L. Rakers

Andrew T, Drazen

John R. Schneider

Stephanie Allen Kennedy

Tracy J. Cowan

David H. Bailey

 

Court Documents

#51

(#51) Starr Indemnity & Liability Company ANSWER to Complaint Answer and Affirmative Defenses by Starr Indemnity & Liability Company.(Cowan, Tracy) (Entered: 03/31/2023)

#50

(#50) Starr Indemnity & Liability Company ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,, Interpleader Complaint,,,,, Entry of Appearance by Starr Indemnity & Liability Company.(Cowan, Tracy) (Entered: 03/31/2023)

#48

RESTRICTED

#47

RESTRICTED

#46

(#46) Plaintiff's ANSWER to Counterclaim of Defendant American Family Insurance Company by Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company.(Weber, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/20/2023)

#45

(#45) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: #12 First MOTION to Dismiss Party MHTC n/a filed by Defendant Missouri Department of Transportation: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants motion to dismiss is GRANTED and defendant MHTC is dismissed from the case. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 03/06/2023. (CMH) (Entered: 03/06/2023)

#44

(#44) Colin A. Keele's ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,, Interpleader Complaint,,,,, by Colin A. Keele.(Schneider, John) (Entered: 03/03/2023)

#25

(#43) Docket Text ORDER: Re: #25 MOTION for Extension of Time to File ;Proposed extension date 03-03-2023 by Defendant Colin A. Keele. (Schneider, John) filed by Colin A. Keele ; ORDERED GRANTED ( Response to Court due by 3/3/2023.). Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 2/27/2023. (JMC) (Entered: 02/27/2023)

#12

(#45) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: #12 First MOTION to Dismiss Party MHTC n/a filed by Defendant Missouri Department of Transportation: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants motion to dismiss is GRANTED and defendant MHTC is dismissed from the case. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 03/06/2023. (CMH) (Entered: 03/06/2023)

1 #19

Summons Summons to Starr Indemnity & Liability Co

1 #14

Summons Summons to Missouri Dept of Transportation

1 #12

Summons Summons to Lora Schumer

1 #10

Summons Summons to L.H.

1 #9

Summons Summons to Keaton Watson

1 #7

Summons Summons to Edward Hunter

1 #6

Summons Summons to Colin Keele

1 #3

Original Filing Form Original Filing Form

1 #1

Main Document

58 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) Starr Indemnity & Liability Company ANSWER to Complaint Answer and Affirmative Defenses by Starr Indemnity & Liability Company.(Cowan, Tracy) (Entered: 03/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) Starr Indemnity & Liability Company ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,, Interpleader Complaint,,,,, Entry of Appearance by Starr Indemnity & Liability Company.(Cowan, Tracy) (Entered: 03/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company. Keaton R. Watson served on 2/12/2023, answer due 3/6/2023. (Weber, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company. Jvanwinkle Trucking, LLC served on 2/9/2023, answer due 3/2/2023. (Weber, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) Plaintiff's ANSWER to Counterclaim of Defendant American Family Insurance Company by Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company.(Weber, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: #12 First MOTION to Dismiss Party MHTC n/a filed by Defendant Missouri Department of Transportation: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants motion to dismiss is GRANTED and defendant MHTC is dismissed from the case. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 03/06/2023. (CMH) (Entered: 03/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) Colin A. Keele's ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,, Interpleader Complaint,,,,, by Colin A. Keele.(Schneider, John) (Entered: 03/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) Docket Text ORDER: Re: #25 MOTION for Extension of Time to File ;Proposed extension date 03-03-2023 by Defendant Colin A. Keele. (Schneider, John) filed by Colin A. Keele ; ORDERED GRANTED ( Response to Court due by 3/3/2023.). Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 2/27/2023. (JMC) (Entered: 02/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) American Family Insurance Company's ANSWER to Complaint , First COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff Jvanwinkle Trucking, LLC, Keaton R. Watson by American Family Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Form Entry of Appearance)(Kennedy, Stephanie) (Entered: 02/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company served on 2/3/2023, answer due 2/24/2023. (Weber, Elizabeth) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ENTRY of Appearance by Kara L. Rakers for Defendant Nina L. Marshall. (Rakers, Kara) (Entered: 02/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ENTRY of Appearance by Kara L. Rakers for Defendant Lora B. Schumer. (Rakers, Kara) (Entered: 02/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketCase Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr.. 17 Summons(es) issued and emailed to Attorney Weber. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within 10 days of the filing of the first pleading or entry of appearance # (moed-0001.pdf). (MRS) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company Process Server: Shannon County Sheriff's Office (Weber, Elizabeth) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company Process Server: Progressive Legal Process Services (Weber, Elizabeth) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company Process Server: Captured Investigative Agency (Weber, Elizabeth) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company Process Server: SB Serve, LLC (Weber, Elizabeth) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company Process Server: Brian Asbury and/or Greg Lanham (Weber, Elizabeth) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Weber, Elizabeth) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Complaint for Interpleader Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1335 against defendant All Defendants with receipt number AMOEDC-9757085, in the amount of $402 Non-Jury Demand,, Interpleader COMPLAINT with receipt number AMOEDC-9757085, in the amount of $402 Non-JuryDemand,, filed by Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form, #4 Summons Summons to American Family, #5 Summons Summons to Buckley Powder, #6 Summons Summons to Colin Keele, #7 Summons Summons to Edward Hunter, #8 Summons Summons to Jvanwinkle Trucking, #9 Summons Summons to Keaton Watson, #10 Summons Summons to L.H., #11 Summons Summons to Liberty Mutual, #12 Summons Summons to Lora Schumer, #13 Summons Summons to Maxwell Hunter, #14 Summons Summons to Missouri Dept of Transportation, #15 Summons Summons to Nina Marshall, #16 Summons Summons to PGT Trucking, #17 Summons Summons to Rebecca Hunter, #18 Summons Summons to Saint Francis Med Ctr, #19 Summons Summons to Starr Indemnity & Liability Co, #20 Summons Summons to State Farm Mutual Auto Ins Co)(Weber, Elizabeth) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less