This case was last updated from PACER on 05/01/2020 at 08:22:15 (UTC).

Active Sports Lifestyle USA, LLC et al v. Apparel Production Services Global, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 03/02/2020 Active Sports Lifestyle USA, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Apparel Production Services Global, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jacqueline Chooljian and Percy Anderson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-02056

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Jacqueline Chooljian

Presiding Judge

Percy Anderson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Active RS Holdings, Inc.

ARS Brands, LLC

Active Sports Lifestyle USA, LLC

Defendants

Oneworld Star International Holdings Ltd.

Apparel Production Services Global, LLC

Active Holdings, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David H Stern

Attorney at Dechert LLP

633 West 5Th Street Suite 4900

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2032

Anna Quynh Do

Attorney at Dechert LLP

633 West Fifth Street Suite 4900

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2032

Alex Edwin Spjute

Attorney at Dechert LLP

633 West 5Th Street Suite 4900

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#21

#20

#19

#18

17 #1

Declaration of David Stern ISO Request to Enter Default of Apparel Production Se

#17

16 #1

Declaration of David Stern ISO Request to Enter Default of Active Holdings LLC

#16

#15

#14

#13

12 #7

Exhibit 7

12 #6

Exhibit 6

12 #5

Exhibit 5

12 #4

Exhibit 4

12 #3

Exhibit 3

12 #2

Exhibit 2

12 #1

Exhibit 1

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) RECEIPT FOR FOREIGN SERVICE from U. S. Post Office for documents Re: (Amended Complaint/Petition, #12 ) mailed to One World Star International Holdings, Wickhams Cay 1, Omar Hodge Building, Road Town, Tortola VG 1110, British Virgin Islands on 4/27/2020 (mrgo) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Apparel Production Services Global, LLC. (mrgo) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Active Holdings, LLC. (mrgo) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) RESPONSE filed by Plaintiffs ARS Brands, LLC, Active RS Holdings, Inc., Active Sports Lifestyle USA, LLCto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, Set/Reset Deadlines #15 Response to Order to Show Cause (Stern, David) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against defendant Apparel Production Services Global, LLC filed by plaintiffs Active Sports Lifestyle USA, LLC, Active RS Holdings, Inc., ARS Brands, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Stern ISO Request to Enter Default of Apparel Production Services Global LLC) (Stern, David) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against defendant Active Holdings, LLC filed by plaintiffs Active Sports Lifestyle USA, LLC, Active RS Holdings, Inc., ARS Brands, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Stern ISO Request to Enter Default of Active Holdings LLC) (Stern, David) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal For Lack Of Prosecution by Judge Percy Anderson. (Show Cause Response due by 4/17/2020.) (mrgo) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiffs Active Sports Lifestyle USA, LLC, Active RS Holdings, Inc., ARS Brands, LLC, upon Defendant Active Holdings, LLC served on 3/16/2020, answer due 4/6/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Rebecca Webster, Registered Agent Solutions, Inc., Agent for Service, in compliance with statute not specified by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Do, Anna) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiffs Active Sports Lifestyle USA, LLC, Active RS Holdings, Inc., ARS Brands, LLC, upon Defendant Apparel Production Services Global, LLC served on 3/16/2020, answer due 4/6/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Rebecca Webster, Registered Agent Solutions, Inc., Agent for Service, in compliance with statute not specified by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Do, Anna) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Active Holdings, LLC, Apparel Production Services Global, LLC, Oneworld Star International Holdings Ltd. amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , filed by Plaintiffs Active Sports Lifestyle USA, LLC, Active RS Holdings, Inc., ARS Brands, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Stern, David) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants Active Holdings, LLC, Apparel Production Services Global, LLC, Oneworld Star International Holdings Ltd. (car) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (See document for details) (mrgo) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (car) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings filed by plaintiffs ARS Brands, LLC, Active RS Holdings, Inc., Active Sports Lifestyle USA, LLC. LASC 20STCV01955 (Stern, David) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiffs ARS Brands, LLC, Active RS Holdings, Inc., Active Sports Lifestyle USA, LLC identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Stern, David) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff ARS Brands, LLC, Active RS Holdings, Inc., Active Sports Lifestyle USA, LLC, identifying Tengram Capital Partners Gen 2 Fund, L.P., Active Sports Lifestyle USA, LLC, ARS Brands, LLC, Active RS Holdings, Inc., Apparel Production Services Global, LLC, Active Holdings, LLC, Oneworld Star International Holdings Ltd.. (Stern, David) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by plaintiff ARS Brands, LLC, Active RS Holdings, Inc., Active Sports Lifestyle USA, LLC. (Stern, David) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs ARS Brands, LLC, Active RS Holdings, Inc., Active Sports Lifestyle USA, LLC. (Stern, David) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-25580260 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Active Sports Lifestyle USA, LLC, Active RS Holdings, Inc., ARS Brands, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7) (Attorney David H Stern added to party ARS Brands, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney David H Stern added to party Active RS Holdings, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney David H Stern added to party Active Sports Lifestyle USA, LLC(pty:pla))(Stern, David) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Active Sports Lifestyle USA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Active Holdings LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alex Edwin Spjute