This case was last updated from PACER on 09/17/2021 at 08:21:50 (UTC).

Active Creations LLC v. Beijing Jinwei Kangda Medical Instrument Ltd.

Case Summary

On 07/19/2021 Active Creations LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Beijing Jinwei Kangda Medical Instrument Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Roderick C. Young and Robert J. Krask. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00406

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Roderick C. Young

Referral Judge

Robert J. Krask

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Active Creations LLC

Defendant

Beijing Jinwei Kangda Medical Instrument Ltd.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Craig Crandall Reilly

Attorney at Law Office of Craig C. Reilly

209 Madison Street, Suite 501

Alexandria, VA 22314

Mark Jon Rosenberg

Attorney at Trater Krinsky & Drogin LLP

1350 Broadway

New York, NY 10018

 

Court Documents

#30

(#30) Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent.(epri, ) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

29 #11

Exhibit 11

29 #8

Exhibit 8

29 #6

Exhibit 6

29 #3

Exhibit 3

29 #2

Exhibit 2

#29

(#29) Declaration re #19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Declaration of Raunak Nirmal and Exhibits REFILED by Active Creations LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)(Reilly, Craig) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

19 #1

Proposed Order

#19

(#22) Declaration re #19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Declaration of Mark J. Rosenberg and Exhibits by Active Creations LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Reilly, Craig) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

1 #10

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #9

Exhibit 9

1 #8

Exhibit 8

1 #6

Exhibit 6

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-7898689.), filed by Active Creations LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(Reilly, Craig) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

89 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent.(epri, ) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Declaration re #19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Declaration of Raunak Nirmal and Exhibits REFILED by Active Creations LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)(Reilly, Craig) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Declaration re #19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Declaration of Gal Mor and Exhibits REFILED by Active Creations LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Reilly, Craig) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Declaration re #19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Declaration of Mark J. Rosenberg and Exhibits REFILED by Active Creations LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Reilly, Craig) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Correction re 22 Declaration, 24 Declaration and 25 Declaration. Incorrect case number used. Filing user has been notified to refile the documents. (tamarm, ) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Active Creations LLC re 25 Declaration, #20 Memorandum in Support, 24 Declaration, #21 Declaration, #19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , 22 Declaration, #23 Declaration (Reilly, Craig) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Declaration re #19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Declaration of Gal Mor and Exhibits by Active Creations LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Reilly, Craig) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Declaration re #19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Declaration of Raunak Nirmal and Exhibits by Active Creations LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11)(Reilly, Craig) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Declaration re #19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Declaration of Raunak Nirmal by Active Creations LLC. (Reilly, Craig) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Declaration re #19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Declaration of Mark J. Rosenberg and Exhibits by Active Creations LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Reilly, Craig) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Service by Publication or by Email by Active Creations LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for Email Service, #2 Proposed Order for Email Service and Publication)(Reilly, Craig) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Mark J. Rosenberg and Certification of Local Counsel Craig C. Reilly Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-7903782. by Active Creations LLC. (Reilly, Craig) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketCase transferred in from Alexandria Division. Case Number 1:21cv842. (afar) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Declaration re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order EX PARTE and for Rule to Show Cause Why a Preliminary Injunction Should Not be Ordered Declaration of Raunak Nirmal by Active Creations LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)(Reilly, Craig) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Declaration re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order EX PARTE and for Rule to Show Cause Why a Preliminary Injunction Should Not be Ordered Declaration of Gal Mor by Active Creations LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Reilly, Craig) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Declaration re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order EX PARTE and for Rule to Show Cause Why a Preliminary Injunction Should Not be Ordered Declaration of Mark J. Rosenberg by Active Creations LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Reilly, Craig) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Memorandum in Support re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order EX PARTE and for Rule to Show Cause Why a Preliminary Injunction Should Not be Ordered filed by Active Creations LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix of Claim Charts)(Reilly, Craig) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order EX PARTE and for Rule to Show Cause Why a Preliminary Injunction Should Not be Ordered by Active Creations LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reilly, Craig) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Active Creations LLC. (Reilly, Craig) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-7898689.), filed by Active Creations LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(Reilly, Craig) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark Jon Rosenberg

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Craig Crandall Reilly