This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/08/2020 at 11:30:52 (UTC).

Actelion Pharmaceuticals Ltd. v. Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/09/2020 Actelion Pharmaceuticals Ltd filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Irene M. Keeley. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00110

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Irene M. Keeley

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Actelion Pharmaceuticals Ltd.

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Frank Edward Simmerman, III

Attorney at Simmerman Law Office PLLC

254 E Main St

Clarksburg, WV 26301

Bruce M. Wexler

Attorney at PAUL HASTINGS LLP - NY

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

Chad L Taylor

Attorney at Simmerman Law Office PLLC

254 E Main St

Clarksburg, WV 26301

Preston K. Ratliff, II

Attorney at PAUL HASTINGS LLP - NY

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

Mark Russell Sperling

Attorney at PAUL HASTINGS LLP - NY

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

Frank E. Simmerman, Jr.

Attorney at Simmerman Law Office, PLLC

254 E. Main St.

Clarksburg, WV 26301-2170

Aaron P. Selikson

Attorney at PAUL HASTINGS LLP - NY

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Lance A Soderstrom

Attorney at Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP

575 Madison Avenue

New York, NY 10022

William J O'Brien

Attorney at Steptoe & Johnson PLLC - Bridgeport

400 White Oaks Blvd

Bridgeport, WV 26330

Deepro R. Mukerjee

Attorney at Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP

575 Madison Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Gordon H. Copland

Attorney at Steptoe & Johnson PLLC - Bridgeport

400 White Oaks Blvd

Bridgeport, WV 26330

Alissa M. Pacchioli

Attorney at Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP - NC

550 S. Tryon Street, Suite 2900

Charlotte, NC 28202

Jitendra Malik

Attorney at Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP - NC

550 S. Tryon Street, Suite 2900

Charlotte, NC 28202

8 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#30

#29

#28

#27

RESTRICTED

26 #1

Proposed Order

#26

25 #1

Proposed Order

#25

#17

6 #1

Proposed Order

#6

#5

#4

#2

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B - Patent Information

1 #1

Exhibit A - Patent Information

#1

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) ANSWER to #17 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Actelion Pharmaceuticals Ltd..(Taylor, Chad) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) ORDER granting #25 Motion for A. Pacchioli to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Mylan. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 7/16/20. (mh) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) ORDER granting #26 Motion for J. Malik to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Mylan. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 7/16/20. (mh) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) PHV Filing fee for J. Malik and A. Pacchioli: $ 400.00, receipt number WVNC002988 (mh) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Jitendra Malik) by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(O'Brien, William) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Alissa M. Pacchioli) by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(O'Brien, William) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER granting #22 Motion for Lance A. Soderstrom to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 7/13/20. (mh) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER granting #21 Motion for Deepro R. Mukerjee to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 7/13/20. (mh) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Lance A. Soderstrom) by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(O'Brien, William) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Deepro R. Mukerjee) by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(O'Brien, William) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Preston Ratliff to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 6/16/20. (mh) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PHV Filing fee for Attorneys Wexler, Russell, Selikson and Ratliff: $ 800.00, receipt number WVNC002960 (mh) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Bruce M. Wexler by Actelion Pharmaceuticals Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Taylor, Chad) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Mark Russell Sperling by Actelion Pharmaceuticals Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Taylor, Chad) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Aaron P. Selikson by Actelion Pharmaceuticals Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Taylor, Chad) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Preston K. Ratliff II by Actelion Pharmaceuticals Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Taylor, Chad) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION to Attorneys Selikson, Wexler, Sperling and Ratliff. (mh) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Actelion Pharmaceuticals Ltd. identifying Corporate Parent Johnson and Johnson for Actelion Pharmaceuticals Ltd... (Taylor, Chad) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REPORT to USPTO on the filing or determination of an action regarding re #1 Complaint. (mh) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., filed by Actelion Pharmaceuticals Ltd. Filing Fee $400. Receipt #0424-3054157. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Patent Information, #2 Exhibit B - Patent Information, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(mh) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ACTELION PHARMACEUTICALS US, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Mylan Pharmaceuticals Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Chad L Taylor