This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/14/2019 at 07:21:35 (UTC).

ACTELION PHARMACEUTICALS LTD v. AUROBINDO PHARMA USA INC. et al

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 ACTELION PHARMACEUTICALS LTD filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against AUROBINDO PHARMA USA INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Lois H. Goodman and Freda L. Wolfson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-15437

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Lois H. Goodman

Presiding Judge

Freda L. Wolfson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

ACTELION PHARMACEUTICALS LTD

Defendants and Counter Claimants

AUROBINDO PHARMA USA INC.

AUROBINDO PHARMA LIMITED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

CHARLES MICHAEL LIZZA

Attorney at SAUL EWING ARNSTEIN & LEHR LLP

One Riverfront Plaza

Newark, NJ 07102-5490

DAVID LEIGH MOSES

Attorney at SAUL EWING ARNSTEIN & LEHR LLP

1037 Raymond Boulevard, Suite 1520

Newark, NJ 07102

WILLIAM C. BATON

Attorney at SAUL EWING ARNSTEIN & LEHR LLP

One Riverfront Plaza, 1037 Raymond Blvd., Suite 1520

Newark, NJ 07102

SARAH ANN SULLIVAN

Attorney at SAUL EWING ARNSTEIN & LEHR LLP

One Riverfront Plaza, Suite 1520

Newark, NJ 07102-5426

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorney

MARC D. YOUNGELSON

Attorney at Cosner Cosner & Youngelson

197 Highway 18 Suite 104

East Brunswick, NJ 08816

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Plaintiff's time to answer, move, or otherwise reply to Defendants' Counterclaims.. (LIZZA, CHARLES) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

#15

(#15) Corporate Disclosure Statement by AUROBINDO PHARMA LIMITED, AUROBINDO PHARMA USA INC. identifying Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (YOUNGELSON, MARC) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

14 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#14

(#14) Aurobindo's ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against ACTELION PHARMACEUTICALS LTD by AUROBINDO PHARMA LIMITED, AUROBINDO PHARMA USA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(YOUNGELSON, MARC) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

#13

(#13) Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Steven J. Moore, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9902097.) (YOUNGELSON, MARC) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

#12

(#12) Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice James E. Nealon, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9902064.) (YOUNGELSON, MARC) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

#11

(#11) ORDER granting pro hac vice admission as to James E. Nealon, Esq., and Steven J. Moore, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 8/15/2019. (jem) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

10 #2

Certification Steven J. Moore, Esq.

10 #1

Certification of James E. Nealon, Esq.

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by MARC D. YOUNGELSON on behalf of All Defendants (YOUNGELSON, MARC) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID LEIGH MOSES on behalf of ACTELION PHARMACEUTICALS LTD (MOSES, DAVID) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by SARAH ANN SULLIVAN on behalf of ACTELION PHARMACEUTICALS LTD (SULLIVAN, SARAH) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM C. BATON on behalf of ACTELION PHARMACEUTICALS LTD (BATON, WILLIAM) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to AUROBINDO PHARMA LIMITED, AUROBINDO PHARMA USA INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jdb) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

#3

(#3) AO120 Patent Form filed. (jdb) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by ACTELION PHARMACEUTICALS LTD. (LIZZA, CHARLES) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against AUROBINDO PHARMA LIMITED, AUROBINDO PHARMA USA INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9819615), filed by ACTELION PHARMACEUTICALS LTD. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LIZZA, CHARLES) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk`s Text Order - The document #16 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by ACTELION PHARMACEUTICALS LTD has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 9/30/2019. (jem) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Plaintiff's time to answer, move, or otherwise reply to Defendants' Counterclaims.. (LIZZA, CHARLES) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Corporate Disclosure Statement by AUROBINDO PHARMA LIMITED, AUROBINDO PHARMA USA INC. identifying Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (YOUNGELSON, MARC) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Aurobindo's ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against ACTELION PHARMACEUTICALS LTD by AUROBINDO PHARMA LIMITED, AUROBINDO PHARMA USA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(YOUNGELSON, MARC) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • Pro Hac Vice counsel, JAMES E. NEALON and STEVEN J. MOORE, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (jem) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Steven J. Moore, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9902097.) (YOUNGELSON, MARC) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice James E. Nealon, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9902064.) (YOUNGELSON, MARC) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER granting pro hac vice admission as to James E. Nealon, Esq., and Steven J. Moore, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 8/15/2019. (jem) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) APPLICATION/PETITION for Pro Hac Vice Admission for James E. Nealon, Esq., and Steven J. Moore, Esq., for by AUROBINDO PHARMA LIMITED, AUROBINDO PHARMA USA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of James E. Nealon, Esq., #2 Certification Steven J. Moore, Esq., #3 Text of Proposed Order)(YOUNGELSON, MARC) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk`s Text Order - The document #9 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by AUROBINDO PHARMA LIMITED, AUROBINDO PHARMA USA INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 8/26/2019. (jem) Modified on 8/6/2019 (km). (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Aurobindo.. (YOUNGELSON, MARC) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by MARC D. YOUNGELSON on behalf of All Defendants (YOUNGELSON, MARC) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID LEIGH MOSES on behalf of ACTELION PHARMACEUTICALS LTD (MOSES, DAVID) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by SARAH ANN SULLIVAN on behalf of ACTELION PHARMACEUTICALS LTD (SULLIVAN, SARAH) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM C. BATON on behalf of ACTELION PHARMACEUTICALS LTD (BATON, WILLIAM) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to AUROBINDO PHARMA LIMITED, AUROBINDO PHARMA USA INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jdb) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) AO120 Patent Form filed. (jdb) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (jdb) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by ACTELION PHARMACEUTICALS LTD. (LIZZA, CHARLES) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against AUROBINDO PHARMA LIMITED, AUROBINDO PHARMA USA INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9819615), filed by ACTELION PHARMACEUTICALS LTD. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LIZZA, CHARLES) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ACTELION PHARMACEUTICALS US, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAVID LEIGH MOSES

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SARAH ANN SULLIVAN