This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/08/2020 at 18:57:45 (UTC).

ACTELION PHARMACEUTICALS LTD et al v. MSN PHARMACEUTICALS INC. et al

Case Summary

On 04/09/2020 ACTELION PHARMACEUTICALS LTD filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against MSN PHARMACEUTICALS INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Karen M. Williams and Renee Marie Bumb. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-03859

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Karen M. Williams

Presiding Judge

Renee Marie Bumb

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NIPPON SHINYAKU CO., LTD.

ACTELION PHARMACEUTICALS LTD

Defendants

ZYDUS WORLDWIDE DMCC

MSN LABORATORIES PRIVATE LIMITED

ALEMBIC PHARMACEUTICALS LIMITED

AIZANT DRUG RESEARCH SOLUTIONS PRIVATE LIMITED

ZYDUS PHARMACUETICALS (USA) INC.

ALEMBIC PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.

VGYAAN PHARMACEUTICALS LLC

MSN PHARMACEUTICALS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KEITH J. MILLER

Attorney at ROBINSON MILLER LLC

110 Edison Place, Suite 302

Newark, NJ 07102

Defendant Attorney

ANANDITA VYAKARNAM

Attorney at WINDELS MARX LANE & MITTENDORF, LLP

One Giralda Farms

Madison, NJ 07940

 

Court Documents

19 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#19

#18

#17

#16

#15

14 #6

Text of Proposed Order

14 #5

Certification of Sarah E. Spencer

#14

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C to Complaint

1 #2

Exhibit B to Complaint

1 #1

Exhibit A to Complaint

#1

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Letter from Keith J. Miller, Esq. to Hon. Renee Bumb, U.S.D.J. re Stipulation and Proposed Order Dismissing Without Prejudice Aizant Drug Research Solutions Private Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MILLER, KEITH) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ANSWER to Complaint by VGYAAN PHARMACEUTICALS LLC.(VYAKARNAM, ANANDITA) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Corporate Disclosure Statement by VGYAAN PHARMACEUTICALS LLC. (VYAKARNAM, ANANDITA) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ANSWER to Complaint by MSN LABORATORIES PRIVATE LIMITED, MSN PHARMACEUTICALS INC..(VYAKARNAM, ANANDITA) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Corporate Disclosure Statement by MSN LABORATORIES PRIVATE LIMITED, MSN PHARMACEUTICALS INC. identifying MSN Laboratories Private Ltd as Corporate Parent.. (VYAKARNAM, ANANDITA) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Deadlines as to #14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 6/1/2020 before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rtm, ) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by ACTELION PHARMACEUTICALS LTD, NIPPON SHINYAKU CO., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Keith J. Miller, #2 Certification of Aaron Selikson, #3 Certification of Bruce M. Wexler, #4 Certification of Preston K. Ratliff II, #5 Certification of Sarah E. Spencer, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(MILLER, KEITH) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by NIPPON SHINYAKU CO., LTD., ACTELION PHARMACEUTICALS LTD. MSN PHARMACEUTICALS INC. waiver sent on 4/13/2020, answer due 6/12/2020. (MILLER, KEITH) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by NIPPON SHINYAKU CO., LTD., ACTELION PHARMACEUTICALS LTD. MSN LABORATORIES PRIVATE LIMITED waiver sent on 4/13/2020, answer due 6/12/2020. (MILLER, KEITH) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by NIPPON SHINYAKU CO., LTD., ACTELION PHARMACEUTICALS LTD. VGYAAN PHARMACEUTICALS LLC waiver sent on 4/13/2020, answer due 6/12/2020. (MILLER, KEITH) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 04/15/2020
  • Docket(#8) TEXT ORDER REALLOCATING AND REASSIGNING CASE. Case Number 3:20-cv-3859. Case reallocated to Camden and reassigned to Judge Renee Marie Bumb and Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams for all further proceedings. Judge Michael A. Shipp, Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 4/15/2020. (jjc, ) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketText Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael A. Shipp: Pursuant to Local Patent Rule 1.5 Patent Pilot Project, case shall be reassigned to a designated patent judge. (gxh) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by NIPPON SHINYAKU CO., LTD., ACTELION PHARMACEUTICALS LTD. ZYDUS WORLDWIDE DMCC waiver sent on 4/13/2020, answer due 6/12/2020. (MILLER, KEITH) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by NIPPON SHINYAKU CO., LTD., ACTELION PHARMACEUTICALS LTD. ZYDUS PHARMACUETICALS (USA) INC. waiver sent on 4/13/2020, answer due 6/12/2020. (MILLER, KEITH) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS ISSUED as to AIZANT DRUG RESEARCH SOLUTIONS PRIVATE LIMITED, ALEMBIC PHARMACEUTICALS LIMITED, ALEMBIC PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MSN LABORATORIES PRIVATE LIMITED, MSN PHARMACEUTICALS INC., VGYAAN PHARMACEUTICALS LLC, ZYDUS PHARMACUETICALS (USA) INC., ZYDUS WORLDWIDE DMCC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (abr) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AO120 Patent Form filed. (abr) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketJudge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (abr) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by NIPPON SHINYAKU CO., LTD.. (MILLER, KEITH) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by ACTELION PHARMACEUTICALS LTD identifying Johnson & Johnson as Corporate Parent.. (MILLER, KEITH) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against AIZANT DRUG RESEARCH SOLUTIONS PRIVATE LIMITED, ALEMBIC PHARMACEUTICALS LIMITED, ALEMBIC PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MSN LABORATORIES PRIVATE LIMITED, MSN PHARMACEUTICALS INC., VGYAAN PHARMACEUTICALS LLC, ZYDUS PHARMACUETICALS (USA) INC., ZYDUS WORLDWIDE DMCC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10662648), filed by NIPPON SHINYAKU CO., LTD., ACTELION PHARMACEUTICALS LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Exhibit B to Complaint, #3 Exhibit C to Complaint, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(MILLER, KEITH) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ACTELION PHARMACEUTICALS US, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Aizant Drug Research Solutions Pvt. Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases where Alembic Pharmaceuticals Limited is a litigant

Latest cases where MSN Pharmaceuticals, Inc. is a litigant