This case was last updated from PACER on 12/13/2020 at 09:21:39 (UTC).

ACS v. Malek

Case Summary

On 10/14/2020 ACS filed an Other lawsuit against Malek. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Ramon E. Reyes, Jr and William F. Kuntz, II. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-03967

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Ramon E. Reyes, Jr

Presiding Judge

William F. Kuntz, II

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ACS

Defendant

Robert Malek

Brooklyn, NY 11235

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service re: #7 Motion for Reconsideration, Motion to Stay filed by Robert Malek. (Tavarez, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, Order of Remand to State Court, by Robert Malek. No fee paid. IFP granted. (McGee, Mary Ann) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

#5

(#5) MEMORANDUM & ORDER: On October 14, 2020, Robert Malek, appearing pro se, filed a notice seeking to remove two petitions filed on July 31, 2018 in the Family Court of the State of New York, City of New York, County of Kings under Docket Numbers NN-19410-18 and NN-19411-18. The Court grants leave to proceed in forma pauperis solely for the purpose of this Order. For the reasons set forth below, the actions are remanded to the Family Court, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(c). For all of the reasons set forth above, the Court finds that removal of the actions is improper. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to remand the neglect proceedings back to the Kings County Family Court pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(c). The Clerk is further directed to send a certified copy of this Order to the Clerk of the Family Court, mail a copy of this Order to Malek, and close the case in this Court. So Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 10/28/2020. (Love, Alexis) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Robert Malek. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

1 #3

10.14.20 Submission

1 #2

Letter

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Robert Malek from Family Court of the State of New York, Kings County, case number NN-19410-18/NN-19411-18. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Letter, #3 10.14.20 Submission) (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER denying #7 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying #7 Motion to Stay. So Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 12/7/2020. (Stykes, Jacqueline) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service re: #7 Motion for Reconsideration, Motion to Stay filed by Robert Malek. (Tavarez, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Index to Record on Appeal sent to US Court of Appeals. #6 Notice of Appeal Documents are available via Pacer. For docket entries without a hyperlink or for documents under seal, contact the court and we'll arrange for the document(s) to be made available to you. (McGee, Mary Ann) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Reconsideration re #5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,,,, Order of Remand to State Court,,, , MOTION to Stay re #5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,,,, Order of Remand to State Court,,, by Robert Malek. (Tavarez, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, Order of Remand to State Court, by Robert Malek. No fee paid. IFP granted. (McGee, Mary Ann) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEMORANDUM & ORDER: On October 14, 2020, Robert Malek, appearing pro se, filed a notice seeking to remove two petitions filed on July 31, 2018 in the Family Court of the State of New York, City of New York, County of Kings under Docket Numbers NN-19410-18 and NN-19411-18. The Court grants leave to proceed in forma pauperis solely for the purpose of this Order. For the reasons set forth below, the actions are remanded to the Family Court, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(c). For all of the reasons set forth above, the Court finds that removal of the actions is improper. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to remand the neglect proceedings back to the Kings County Family Court pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(c). The Clerk is further directed to send a certified copy of this Order to the Clerk of the Family Court, mail a copy of this Order to Malek, and close the case in this Court. So Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 10/28/2020. (Love, Alexis) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Leave to Electronically File Document under Seal and Motion for an Extension of Time to Amend by Robert Malek. (Tavarez, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Robert Malek. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Robert Malek from Family Court of the State of New York, Kings County, case number NN-19410-18/NN-19411-18. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Letter, #3 10.14.20 Submission) (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ACS is a litigant