This case was last updated from PACER on 07/12/2020 at 06:12:11 (UTC).

Acrisure LLC v. Edgewood Partners Insurance Center et al

Case Summary

On 03/06/2019 Acrisure LLC filed a Government Benefit - Government Benefit Recovery lawsuit against Edgewood Partners Insurance Center. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert J. Jonker and Ray Kent. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00170

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Government Benefit Recovery

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert J. Jonker

Referral Judge

Ray Kent

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

Acrisure, LLC

Acrisure, LLC doing business as Upstream Brokers

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Nikki Howes

Edgewood Partners Insurance Center

Jose Palmer

Edgewood Partners Insurance Center doing business as EPIC Insurance Brokers and Consultants

Not Classified By Court

Facilitative Mediator

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Sonila Themeli

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon LLP

600 Travis St., Ste. 3400

Houston, TX 77002

Tanya Lynn Chaney

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon LLP

600 Travis St., Ste. 3400

Houston, TX 77002-2926

Michael Bradley Barnett

Attorney at Shook Hardy & Bacon LLP (MO)

2555 Grand Blvd.

Kansas City, MO 64108

Lawrence J. Murphy

Attorney at Varnum Riddering Schmidt & Howlett LLP (Grand Rapids)

333 Bridge St., Nw, P.O. Box 352

Grand Rapids, MI 49501-0352

Herman Daniel Hofman

Attorney at Varnum LLP

333 Bridge St., Nw, P.O. Box 352

Grand Rapids, MI 49501

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Richard Thomas Kienzler

Attorney at Freeborn & Peters LLP

311 S Wacker Dr., Ste. 3000

Chicago, IL 60606

David L. Barron

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor, P.C (TX)

1221 Mckinney St., Ste. 2900

Houston, TX 77010

Steven D. Pearson

Attorney at Freeborn & Peters LLP

311 S Wacker Dr., Ste. 3000

Chicago, IL 60606

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Frederick D. Dilley

Attorney at Foster Swift Collins & Smith PC (GR)

1700 E Beltline Ave., Ste. 200

Grand Rapids, MI 49525

 

Court Documents

#68

(#68) NOTICE of appointment of Facilitative Mediator Frederick D. Dilley ; plaintiff VFM fee to be submitted by 5/10/2019 defendant VFM fee to be submitted by 5/10/2019 (lep) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

#66

(#66) NOTICE re #61 Selection of Mediator by plaintiff Acrisure, LLC (Hofman, Herman) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

65 #5

Exhibit E

65 #3

Exhibit C

65 #2

Exhibit B

#65

(#65) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Acrisure, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K) (Hofman, Herman) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

64 #1

Exhibit A - Proposed Order

#64

(#64) MOTION to withdraw as attorney of Tanya Chaney and Sonila Themeli by plaintiff Acrisure, LLC, counter-defendant Acrisure, LLC; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order) (Hofman, Herman) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

#61

(#61) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: settlement conference set for 5/27/2020 at 01:30 PM at 584 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Ray Kent; final pretrial conference set for 6/26/2020 at 03:00 PM at 699 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker; jury trial set for 7/14/2020 at 08:30 AM at 699 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

1 #13

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #12

Proposed Order

1 #11

Exhibit K

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#2) MEMORANDUM In Support re: #1 Complaint, by Acrisure LLC, filed.(Chaney, Tanya) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/6/2019.] (Entered: 02/25/2019)

116 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#68) NOTICE of appointment of Facilitative Mediator Frederick D. Dilley ; plaintiff VFM fee to be submitted by 5/10/2019 defendant VFM fee to be submitted by 5/10/2019 (lep) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#67) ORDER granting #64 motion to withdraw as attorney; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#66) NOTICE re #61 Selection of Mediator by plaintiff Acrisure, LLC (Hofman, Herman) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#65) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Acrisure, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K) (Hofman, Herman) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#64) MOTION to withdraw as attorney of Tanya Chaney and Sonila Themeli by plaintiff Acrisure, LLC, counter-defendant Acrisure, LLC; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order) (Hofman, Herman) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Copy of Order on Stipulation and Proposed Order #63 sent via U.S. Mail to Tanya Lynn Chaney and Sonila Themeli (ns) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#63) ORDER granting STIPULATION #62 ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#62) PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER to Extend Deadline to Respond to Defendants' Counterclaims by plaintiff Acrisure, LLC, counter-defendant Acrisure, LLC (Murphy, Lawrence) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Copy of Case Management Order, #61 sent via U.S. Mail to Tanya Lynn Chaney and Sonila Themeli (ns) (Entered: 04/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#61) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: settlement conference set for 5/27/2020 at 01:30 PM at 584 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Ray Kent; final pretrial conference set for 6/26/2020 at 03:00 PM at 699 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker; jury trial set for 7/14/2020 at 08:30 AM at 699 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
60 More Docket Entries
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER and setting Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction to be held 3/5/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9C before Judge Andrew S Hanen. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/6/2019.] (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 6/13/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(ckrus, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/6/2019.] (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Summons Issued as to Nikki Howes, Jose Palmer. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summon, #2 Summon)(hlerma, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/6/2019.] (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) PROPOSED ORDER re: #6 MOTION to Expedite Hearing, filed.(Chaney, Tanya) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/6/2019.] (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Expedite Hearing by Acrisure LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/19/2019. (Chaney, Tanya) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/6/2019.] (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Nikki Howes, filed.(Chaney, Tanya) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/6/2019.] (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Jose Palmer, filed.(Chaney, Tanya) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/6/2019.] (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Edgewood Partners Insurance Center d/b/a EPIC Insurance Brokers and Consultants, filed.(Chaney, Tanya) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/6/2019.] (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MEMORANDUM In Support re: #1 Complaint, by Acrisure LLC, filed.(Chaney, Tanya) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/6/2019.] (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Edgewood Partners Insurance Center d/b/a EPIC Insurance Brokers and Consultants, Nikki Howes, Jose Palmer (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21940944) filed by Acrisure LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Proposed Order, #13 Civil Cover Sheet)(Chaney, Tanya) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/6/2019.] (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EDGEWOOD PARTNERS INSURANCE CENTER A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Facilitative Mediator is a litigant