This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/29/2021 at 09:30:24 (UTC).

Acres v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation

Case Summary

On 06/30/2021 Acres filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against National Railroad Passenger Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Colin Stirling Bruce and Eric I. Long. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-02165

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colin Stirling Bruce

Referral Judge

Eric I. Long

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Maria M Acres

Defendant

National Railroad Passenger Corporation doing business as Amtrack

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Andrew J Purcell

Attorney at SPIROS LAW PC

Suite 3, 2807 North Vermilion

Danville, IL 61832

Defendant Attorneys

Christopher Thomas Scolire

Attorney at ANDERSON RASOR & PARTNERS LLP

Suite 350, 150 South Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606

Susan K Laing

Attorney at ANDERSON RASOR & PARTNERS LLP

Suite 350, 150 South Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

9 #9

Main Document

9 #1

Exhibit A

9 #2

Exhibit B

9 #3

Exhibit C

#10

#11

#12

#13

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CERTIFICATE of Service/Counsel re #12 Response to Motion by Andrew J Purcell on behalf of Maria M Acres (Purcell, Andrew) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND DISMISS THE COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Maria M Acres. (Purcell, Andrew) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 8/10/2021. Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Response Deadline #10 is GRANTED. Plaintiff's response to Defendant's Motion #8 is now due August 25, 2021. (DS) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Maria M Acres re #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 Memorandum, #8 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND DISMISS THE COMPLAINT (Purcell, Andrew) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 Memorandum, #8 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND DISMISS THE COMPLAINT by Plaintiff Maria M Acres. Responses due by 8/24/2021 (Purcell, Andrew) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MEMORANDUM MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND DISMISS THE COMPLAINT re #8 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND DISMISS THE COMPLAINT by National Railroad Passenger Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Scolire, Christopher) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Dismiss MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND DISMISS THE COMPLAINT by Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation. Responses due by 8/11/2021 (Scolire, Christopher) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 7/23/2021. The Court has reviewed the Status Report #7 . The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 7/29/21 is VACATED. The court directs the parties to file a notice of settlement, status report, or motion to compel arbitration within 45 days. (Status Report due by 9/6/2021.) (DS) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STATUS REPORT by National Railroad Passenger Corporation. (Scolire, Christopher) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 7/8/2021. Defendant's Agreed Motion for Extension of Time #6 is GRANTED. Defendant's deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to 7/28/21. (DS) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer AGREED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING by Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation. Responses due by 7/21/2021 (Laing, Susan) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 7/1/2021. This matter is scheduled for a Rule 16 Scheduling Conference by personal appearance before U.S. Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on July 29, 2021 at 9:30 AM, Courtroom B, Urbana. See written Order.(BMG) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE Proof of Filing Copy of Filed Notice of Removal in Circuit Court - Champaign County. (Laing, Susan) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Christopher Thomas Scolire on behalf of National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Scolire, Christopher) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Susan K Laing on behalf of National Railroad Passenger Corporation d/b/a Amtrak (Laing, Susan) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court-6th Judicial Circuit-Champaign Cnty, case number 2021 L 000045 (Filing fee $402 receipt number AILCDC-3700643), filed by National Railroad Passenger Corporation d/b/a Amtrak. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, (State Court Complaint) #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Laing, Susan) Modified on 6/30/2021 to title exhibit (DS). (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION is a litigant