This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/11/2022 at 08:21:17 (UTC).

Acosta v. Ross Dress for Less Inc et al

Case Summary

On 07/13/2022 Acosta filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Ross Dress for Less Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is A. Joe Fish. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-01512

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

A. Joe Fish

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Maria Isabel Acosta

Defendant

Ross Dress for Less Inc doing business as Ross Dress for Less 1030 and Shops at Pinnacle LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mildred Ibale Ashley

Attorney at Kelly T Curran Law Firm

5720 Lbj Freeway, Suite 440

Dallas, TX 75240

Defendant Attorneys

Fernando P Arias

Attorney at Fletcher Farley Shipman & Salinas LLP

9201 N Central Expwy, Suite 600

Dallas, TX 75231

Clarissa Perez

Attorney at Fletcher Farley Shipman & Salinas LLP

9201 N Central Expressway, Suite 600

Dallas, TX 75231

Meredith Livermore

Attorney at Fletcher, Farley, Shipman & Salinas, LLP

9201 N. Central Expressway, Suite 600

Dallas, TX 75231

William Marcus Toles

Attorney at Munsch Hardt Kopf & Harr, P.C.

500 N. Akard Street, Suite 3800

Dallas, TX 75201

Kelly Elizabeth Wise

Attorney at Munsch Hardt Kopf & Harr, P.C.

500 N. Akard Street, Suite 3800

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Ross Dress for Less Inc. (Filing fee $402; receipt number 0539-12961259) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Cover Sheet, #3 Index of Documents) (Arias, Fernando) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Supplemental Cover Sheet

1 #3

Index of Documents

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ross Dress for Less Inc. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Arias, Fernando) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

#3

(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mlb) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

#6

(#6) MOTION to Vacate Dismissal and Reinstate filed by Maria Isabel Acosta. (Ashley, Mildred) Modified text on 8/18/2022 (ygl). (Entered: 08/17/2022)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Maria Isabel Acosta. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Ashley, Mildred) (Entered: 08/17/2022)

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #6 Motion to Reopen Case and it is ORDERED that this case is REOPENED. The plaintiff's motion for leave to file her certificate of interested persons is GRANTED, the plaintiff's certificate of interested persons is deemed filed. It is further ORDERED that counsel for the plaintiff is to review the en banc decision of this court in Dondi Properties Corporation v. Commerce Savings and Loan Association, 121 F.R.D. 284 (N.D. Tex. 1988) (per curiam) (standards of litigation conduct), the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and the Local Civil Rules. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 8/18/2022) (ykp) (Entered: 08/18/2022)

#9

(#9) STATUS REPORT ORDER: Status Report due by 9/8/2022. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 8/18/2022) (oyh) (Entered: 08/18/2022)

#10

(#10) Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Ross Dress for Less Inc. (Arias, Fernando) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

#11

(#11) ORDER ESTABLISHING SCHEDULE AND CERTAIN PRETRIAL REQUIREMENTS: Trial set for four-week docket beginning 6/5/2023 before Senior Judge A. Joe Fish. Joinder of Parties due by 11/25/2022. Amended Pleadings due by 11/25/2022. Motions due by 3/3/2023. Discovery due by 4/3/2023. Pretrial Order due by 5/26/2023. Pretrial Materials due by 5/26/2023. Pretrial Conference set for 6/2/2023 10:30 AM before Senior Judge A. Joe Fish. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 9/9/2022) (ygl) (Entered: 09/09/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER ESTABLISHING SCHEDULE AND CERTAIN PRETRIAL REQUIREMENTS: Trial set for four-week docket beginning 6/5/2023 before Senior Judge A. Joe Fish. Joinder of Parties due by 11/25/2022. Amended Pleadings due by 11/25/2022. Motions due by 3/3/2023. Discovery due by 4/3/2023. Pretrial Order due by 5/26/2023. Pretrial Materials due by 5/26/2023. Pretrial Conference set for 6/2/2023 10:30 AM before Senior Judge A. Joe Fish. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 9/9/2022) (ygl) (Entered: 09/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Ross Dress for Less Inc. (Arias, Fernando) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STATUS REPORT ORDER: Status Report due by 9/8/2022. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 8/18/2022) (oyh) (Entered: 08/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #6 Motion to Reopen Case and it is ORDERED that this case is REOPENED. The plaintiff's motion for leave to file her certificate of interested persons is GRANTED, the plaintiff's certificate of interested persons is deemed filed. It is further ORDERED that counsel for the plaintiff is to review the en banc decision of this court in Dondi Properties Corporation v. Commerce Savings and Loan Association, 121 F.R.D. 284 (N.D. Tex. 1988) (per curiam) (standards of litigation conduct), the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and the Local Civil Rules. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 8/18/2022) (ykp) (Entered: 08/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Maria Isabel Acosta. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Ashley, Mildred) (Entered: 08/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Vacate Dismissal and Reinstate filed by Maria Isabel Acosta. (Ashley, Mildred) Modified text on 8/18/2022 (ygl). (Entered: 08/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketCivil case terminated. (chmb) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC ORDER: On July 14, 2022, the plaintiff was ordered to file a certificate of interested persons satisfying the requirements of Local Rule 3.1(c) or 3.2(e) within twenty days (docket entry 4) but has failed to do so. Accordingly, this case is dismissed without prejudice. Rule 16(f)(1)(C), F.R. Civ. P. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 8/5/2022) (chmb) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC ORDER: On July 13, 2022, defendant removed this civil action to this court. Local Rule 81.2 provides that "[w]ithin 21 days after the notice of removal is filed, the plaintiff shall file a separately signed certificate of interested persons that complies with LR 3.1(c) or 3.2(e). If the plaintiff concurs in the accuracy of another partys previously-filed certificate, the plaintiff may adopt that certificate." LR 3.1(c) and 3.2(e) in turn require that when a complaint is filed, the plaintiff must provide the clerk with "a separately signed certificate of interested persons -- in a form approved by the clerk -- that contains -- in addition to the information required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a) -- a complete list of all persons, associations of persons, firms, partnerships, corporations, guarantors, insurers, affiliates, parent or subsidiary corporations, or other legal entities that are financially interested in the outcome of the case. If a large group of persons or firms can be specified by a generic description, individual listing is not necessary." Accordingly, no later than 20 days after this order is filed, the plaintiff must comply with Rule 3.1(c) or 3.2(e) so that the court can ensure that recusal is not required in this case. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 7/14/2022) (chmb) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mlb) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ross Dress for Less Inc. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Arias, Fernando) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Ross Dress for Less Inc. (Filing fee $402; receipt number 0539-12961259) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Cover Sheet, #3 Index of Documents) (Arias, Fernando) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Meredith Livermore

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Fernando P Arias