This case was last updated from PACER on 07/11/2020 at 14:18:42 (UTC).

Acosta v. Mejia Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 02/11/2019 Acosta filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Mejia Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Liam O'Grady and John F. Anderson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00166

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Courthouse:

    Virginia Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Liam O'Grady

Referral Judge

John F. Anderson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

United States Department Of Labor

R. Alexander Acosta

Defendants

Mejia Corporation

Armando Mejia

Gloria Mejia

Cesar Mejia

Mejia Corporation a corporation doing business as El Tio Tex-Mex Grill

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ryma Naje Lewis

Attorney at US Department of Labor

201 12Th Street South, Suite 401

Arlington, VA 22202

Avni Amin

Attorney at U. S. Department of Labor

201 12Th St South, Suite 401

Arlington, VA 22202

Defendant Attorney

Michael Edward Veve

Attorney at Lasa Monroig & Veve PLLC

5029 Backlick Road, Suite A

Annandale, VA 22003

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Nadya Maldonado and Certification of Local Counsel Michael E. Veve Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6587175. by Mejia Corporation. (Veve, Michael) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by Mejia Corporation.(Veve, Michael) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE/Waiver of Service Returned Executed as to Armando Mejia, Cesar Mejia, Gloria Mejia, Mejia Corporation, waiver sent on 2/13/19, answer due 4/15/19 , by R. Alexander Acosta Defendants Mejia Corporation, et. all Waivers of the Service of Summons (Lewis, Ryma) Modified text on 3/14/2019 (klau, ). (Entered: 03/13/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Pro hac vice as to Avni Amin. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 2/13/2019. (aott) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

#2

(#2) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Avni Amin and Certification of Local Counsel Ryma Lewis by United States Department Of Labor. (Lewis, Ryma) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit Schedule A

#1

(#1) Complaint against Mejia Corporation, Armando Mejia, Gloria Mejia and Cesar Mejia , filed by United States Department Of Labor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedule A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Lewis, Ryma) Modified text on 2/12/2019 to add defendant parties (klau, ). (Entered: 02/11/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Nadya Maldonado and Certification of Local Counsel Michael E. Veve Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6587175. by Mejia Corporation. (Veve, Michael) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by Mejia Corporation.(Veve, Michael) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE/Waiver of Service Returned Executed as to Armando Mejia, Cesar Mejia, Gloria Mejia, Mejia Corporation, waiver sent on 2/13/19, answer due 4/15/19 , by R. Alexander Acosta Defendants Mejia Corporation, et. all Waivers of the Service of Summons (Lewis, Ryma) Modified text on 3/14/2019 (klau, ). (Entered: 03/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Pro hac vice as to Avni Amin. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 2/13/2019. (aott) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Liam O'Grady and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (klau, ) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Avni Amin and Certification of Local Counsel Ryma Lewis by United States Department Of Labor. (Lewis, Ryma) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Complaint against Mejia Corporation, Armando Mejia, Gloria Mejia and Cesar Mejia , filed by United States Department Of Labor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedule A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Lewis, Ryma) Modified text on 2/12/2019 to add defendant parties (klau, ). (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mejia is a litigant

Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Edward Veve