This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/27/2020 at 07:06:27 (UTC).

Acorn Bay v. CamelBak Products, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/29/2020 Acorn Bay filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against CamelBak Products, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jacqueline Scott Corley. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-05214

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jacqueline Scott Corley

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Acorn Bay

Defendants

Vista Outdoor Inc.

CamelBak Products, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Sarah JoAnn Guske

Attorney at Baker Botts LLP

101 California Street, Suite 3600

San Francisco, CA 94111

Cheryl Ann Cauley

Attorney at Baker Botts L.L.P.

1001 Page Mill Road, Building 1, Suite 200

Palo Alto, CA 94304

 

Court Documents

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #9

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #8

Exhibit H

1 #7

Exhibit G

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Acorn Bay Vista Outdoor Inc. served on 09.16.2020 (Cauley, Cheryl) (Filed on 9/23/2020) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Acorn Bay Camelbak Products LLC served on 09.16.2020 (Cauley, Cheryl) (Filed on 9/23/2020) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Acorn Bay.. (Cauley, Cheryl) (Filed on 8/12/2020) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. Filer did not add all interested parties when prompted. E-filer is reminded to enter all affiliates or corporate parents in future filings when prompted.C orrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #3 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by Acorn Bay. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2020) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to CamelBak Products, LLC, Vista Outdoor Inc. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2020) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/22/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/29/2020 01:30 PM. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2020) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • Docket(#6) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/12/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2020) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding U.S. Patent No. 9,609,969 (cc: form mailed to register). (Cauley, Cheryl) (Filed on 7/29/2020) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Proposed Summons. (Cauley, Cheryl) (Filed on 7/29/2020) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interested Entities identifying Other Affiliates Treasure Bay, Inc. and Acorn Products LLC for Acorn Bay, filed by Acorn Bay. (Cauley, Cheryl) (Filed on 7/29/2020) Modified on 7/30/2020 (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah JoAnn Guske (Guske, Sarah) (Filed on 7/29/2020) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Acorn Bay ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14751136.). Filed byAcorn Bay. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cauley, Cheryl) (Filed on 7/29/2020) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Vista Outdoor Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where CamelBak Products, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cheryl A Cauley

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sarah JoAnn Guske