This case was last updated from PACER on 10/17/2020 at 05:54:33 (UTC).

ACKRIDGE

Case Summary

On 10/09/2020 ACKRIDGE was filed as a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is PAUL S. DIAMOND. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-05083

  • Filing Date:

    10/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

PAUL S. DIAMOND

 

Party Details

In Re

AMIN ACKRIDGE

Marienville, PA 16239

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) ORDERED THAT THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO SEND ACKRIDGE A BLANK COPY OF THIS COURTS FORM FOR FILING A 2254 HABEAS PETITION BEARING THE ABOVE CIVIL ACTION NUMBER. THE CLERK OF COURT IS FURTHER DIRECTED TO SEND ACKRIDGE A BLANK COPY OF THE COURTS SHORT FORM MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUERIS. ACKRIDGE SHOULD REVIEW THE INSTRUCTIONS INCLUDED WITH THE STANDARD FORM FOR A PETITION PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 2254. IF ACKRIDGE INTENDS TO PURSUE THIS MATTER PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 2254, HE SHALL COMPLETE IN FULL THIS COURTS CURRENT STANDARD FORM, SIGN THE COMPLETED PETITION, AND RETURN IT TO THE CLERK OF COURT WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. ACKRIDGE MUST ALSO PAY THE $5 FILING FEE FOR FILING A 2254 HABEAS PETITION OR MOVE FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (WITH HIS INSTITUTIONAL ACCOUNT BALANCE PROPERLY CERTIFIED BY PRISON OFFICIALS) WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. IF ACKRIDGE FAILS TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER HIS CASE MAY BE DISMISSED WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 10/16/20. 10/16/20 ENTERED AND COPIES OF ORDER AND FORMS NOT MAILED TO PRO SE PETITIONER(jpd, ) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

#2

(#2) PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (bw, ) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

1 #2

Designation Form

1 #1

Case Management Track Form

#1

(#1) PETITION FOR REQUEST by AMIN ACKRIDGE. (NO FEE PAID; NO IFP FILED) (Attachments: #1 Case Management Track Form, #2 Designation Form)(bw, ) Modified on 10/14/2020 (bw, ). (Entered: 10/14/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDERED THAT THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO SEND ACKRIDGE A BLANK COPY OF THIS COURTS FORM FOR FILING A 2254 HABEAS PETITION BEARING THE ABOVE CIVIL ACTION NUMBER. THE CLERK OF COURT IS FURTHER DIRECTED TO SEND ACKRIDGE A BLANK COPY OF THE COURTS SHORT FORM MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUERIS. ACKRIDGE SHOULD REVIEW THE INSTRUCTIONS INCLUDED WITH THE STANDARD FORM FOR A PETITION PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 2254. IF ACKRIDGE INTENDS TO PURSUE THIS MATTER PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 2254, HE SHALL COMPLETE IN FULL THIS COURTS CURRENT STANDARD FORM, SIGN THE COMPLETED PETITION, AND RETURN IT TO THE CLERK OF COURT WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. ACKRIDGE MUST ALSO PAY THE $5 FILING FEE FOR FILING A 2254 HABEAS PETITION OR MOVE FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (WITH HIS INSTITUTIONAL ACCOUNT BALANCE PROPERLY CERTIFIED BY PRISON OFFICIALS) WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. IF ACKRIDGE FAILS TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER HIS CASE MAY BE DISMISSED WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 10/16/20. 10/16/20 ENTERED AND COPIES OF ORDER AND FORMS NOT MAILED TO PRO SE PETITIONER(jpd, ) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketDOC # 2 (PRO SE GUIDELINES) MAILED TO ACKRIDGE ON 10/15/20 (rf, ) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (bw, ) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION FOR REQUEST by AMIN ACKRIDGE. (NO FEE PAID; NO IFP FILED) (Attachments: #1 Case Management Track Form, #2 Designation Form)(bw, ) Modified on 10/14/2020 (bw, ). (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less