This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/09/2022 at 14:52:55 (UTC).

Ackley v. CNA Financial Corporation

Case Summary

On 02/18/2022 Ackley filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against CNA Financial Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Rodney Smith. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:22-CV-60377

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Smith

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Charles Albert Ackley

Defendants

CNA Financial Corporation

CNA Financial Corporation a wholly owned subsidiary doing business as National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford

Continental Casualty Company

Po Box 6200, 200 E. Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Richard Mark Benrubi

Attorney at Benrubi Law, P.A.

1401 Forum Way, Suite 600

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

Defendant Attorneys

Lisa Anne Pach

Attorney at Stroock & Stroock & Lavan LLP

200 South Biscayne Blvd., Suite 3100

Miami, FL 33131

Laura Besvinick

Attorney at Stroock and Stroock and Lavan, LLP

200 South Biscayne Boulevard, Suite 3100

Miami, FL 33131

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #9 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal, by Continental Casualty Company. Responses due by 5/11/2022 (Besvinick, Laura) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

17 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

17 #17

Main Document

#10

(#20) PAPERLESS ORDER denying #10 Motion to Dismiss. The Complaint was not the operative complaint at the time when Defendant filed its motion to dismiss. The Complaint, having been superseded by the Amended Complaint, could not be dismissed. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 5/7/2022. (tcl) (Entered: 05/07/2022)

9 #4

Exhibit EXH D

9 #3

Exhibit EXH C

9 #2

Exhibit EXH B

9 #1

Exhibit EXH A

9 #9

Main Document

1 #11

Summon(s) Summons

1 #10

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #9

Exhibit EXH I

1 #8

Exhibit EXH H

1 #5

Exhibit EXH E

1 #4

Exhibit EXH D

1 #3

Exhibit EXH C

1 #2

Exhibit EXH B

1 #1

Main Document

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) PAPERLESS ORDER denying #10 Motion to Dismiss. The Complaint was not the operative complaint at the time when Defendant filed its motion to dismiss. The Complaint, having been superseded by the Amended Complaint, could not be dismissed. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 5/7/2022. (tcl) (Entered: 05/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot #17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 5/7/2022. (tcl) (Entered: 05/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #9 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal, by Continental Casualty Company. Responses due by 5/11/2022 (Besvinick, Laura) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #9 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal, by Continental Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Besvinick, Laura) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Joint Election to Jurisdiction for Final Disposition of Motions . Filed by Continental Casualty Company (Besvinick, Laura) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Continental Casualty Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Scheduling Order)(Besvinick, Laura) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement by Continental Casualty Company identifying Other Affiliate The Continental Corporation for Continental Casualty Company (Besvinick, Laura) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Striking #12 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement, filed by Continental Casualty Company by Continental Casualty Company (Besvinick, Laura) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) STRICKEN PER DE #13 .. Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Continental Casualty Company identifying Other Affiliate Pincus & Currier LLP, Other Affiliate Steven B. Phillips, Other Affiliate Richard M. Benrubi, Other Affiliate Benrubi Law, P.A., Other Affiliate CNA Financial Corporation for Continental Casualty Company (Besvinick, Laura) Modified on 4/18/2022 (lbc). (Entered: 04/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Charles Albert Ackley (Benrubi, Richard) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Plaintiff's AMENDED COMPLAINT against Continental Casualty Company, filed by Charles Albert Ackley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXH A, #2 Exhibit EXH B, #3 Exhibit EXH C, #4 Exhibit EXH D, #5 Exhibit EXH E, #6 Exhibit EXH F, #7 Exhibit EXH G, #8 Exhibit EXH H, #9 Exhibit EXH I)(Benrubi, Richard) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketReset Response/Answer Due Deadline: CNA Financial Corporation response/answer due 4/11/2022 per d.e. 7 Order. (mee) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT, CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS. Joint Scheduling Report,Certificates of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statements due by 4/18/2022. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 3/18/2022. See attached document for full details. (mee) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time. CNA FINANCIAL CORPORATION shall file its Response/Answer ti Complaint by April 11, 2022 . Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 3/18/2022. (tcl) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lisa Anne Pach on behalf of CNA Financial Corporation. Attorney Lisa Anne Pach added to party CNA Financial Corporation(pty:dft). (Pach, Lisa) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time respond to the Complaint re #1 Complaint, by CNA Financial Corporation. Attorney Laura Besvinick added to party CNA Financial Corporation(pty:dft). Responses due by 3/31/2022 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Besvinick, Laura) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corrected Summons Issued as to CNA Financial Corporation. (mee) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to CNA Financial Corporation. (mee) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodney Smith. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. Modified on 2/22/2022 (mee). (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against CNA Financial Corporation. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15414180, filed by Charles Albert Ackley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXH A, #2 Exhibit EXH B, #3 Exhibit EXH C, #4 Exhibit EXH D, #5 Exhibit EXH E, #6 Exhibit EXH F, #7 Exhibit EXH G, #8 Exhibit EXH H, #9 Exhibit EXH I, #10 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #11 Summon(s) Summons)(Benrubi, Richard) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CNA Financial Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Continental Casualty Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lisa A. Pach(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Laura Besvinick