This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/17/2019 at 07:27:54 (UTC).

Ackerman v. Given et al

Case Summary

On 10/18/2019 Ackerman filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Given. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sara Lioi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-02433

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sara Lioi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

William R. Ackerman

Defendants

John T. Given

John T. Given MD Inc.

Allergy and Respiratory Center, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ray L. Weber

Attorney at Renner, Kenner, Greive, Bobak, Taylor & Weber

400 First National Tower, 106 South Main Street

Akron, OH 44308

Laura J. Gentilcore

Attorney at Renner, Kenner, Greive, Bobak, Taylor & Weber

400 First National Tower, 106 South Main Street

Akron, OH 44308

Defendant Attorneys

Gary A. Corroto

Attorney at Tzangas, Plakas & Mannos

8Th Floor, 220 Market Avenue, S

Canton, OH 44702

Maria C. Klutinoty

Attorney at Tzangas, Plakas & Mannos

8Th Floor, 220 Market Avenue, S

Canton, OH 44702

Edmond J. Mack

Attorney at Tzangas, Plakas & Mannos

8Th Floor, 220 Market Avenue, S

Canton, OH 44702

 

Court Documents

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

4 #2

Appendix B Exhibit List

4 #1

Appendix A Witness List

#4

3 #1

Magistrate Consent Form

#3

#2

1 #5

Summons

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit 3 - Ackerman-Given Agreement

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - U.S. Patent No. 9,962,397

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Allergy and Respiratory Center, Inc., John T. Given MD Inc.. (Klutinoty, Maria) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Answer to #1 Complaint, filed by Allergy and Respiratory Center, Inc., John T. Given, John T. Given MD Inc.. (Mack, Edmond) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order [non-document] granting defendants' #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer until 12/2/2019. Judge Sara Lioi on 11/6/2019.(D,N) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Unopposed Motion for extension of time until 12/2/19 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Allergy and Respiratory Center, Inc., John T. Given, and John T. Given MD Inc. (Klutinoty, Maria) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Attorney Appearance by Maria C. Klutinoty filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Klutinoty, Maria) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Allergy and Respiratory Center, Inc. on 10/22/2019, no delivery date on green card, date obtained from U.S. Postal Service website, filed on behalf of William R. Ackerman. Related document(s) #3 . (O,K) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon John T. Given on 10/21/2019, filed on behalf of William R. Ackerman. Related document(s) #3 . (T,Je) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Allergy and Respiratory Center, Inc. (Receipt # 7017 3040 0000 3587 6616), John T. Given (Receipt # 7017 3040 0000 3587 6623), John T. Given MD Inc. (Receipt # 7017 3040 0000 3587 6630) placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. (T,Je) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • This action has been identified as a Patent Case that is subject to the Local Patent Rules. Link to #Local Patent Rules. (O,K) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Initial Standing Order. Judge Sara Lioi on 10/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A Witness List, #2 Appendix B Exhibit List) (O,K) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Allergy and Respiratory Center, Inc., John T. Given, John T. Given MD Inc. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (T,Je) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (T,Je) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • Judge Sara Lioi assigned to case. (T,Je) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (AO120) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Weber, Ray) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Complaint with jury demand for contract breach, an accounting, fraud in the inducement, and patent infringement against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9581779.. Filed by William R. Ackerman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - U.S. Patent No. 9,949,989, #2 Exhibit 2 - U.S. Patent No. 9,962,397, #3 Exhibit 3 - Ackerman-Given Agreement, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons) (Weber, Ray) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ray L. Weber