This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:14:24 (UTC).

Acker v. Milco National Constructors Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Acker filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Milco National Constructors Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Rhode Island District. The Judges overseeing this case are Lincoln D. Almond and William E. Smith. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00640

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rhode Island District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Lincoln D. Almond

Presiding Judge

William E. Smith

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Daniel Acker

Providence, RI 02906

Defendant

Milco National Constructors Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Barry L. Dolinger

Attorney at The Law Office of Barry Dolinger, Esq. LLC

55 Cromwell Street, Suite 1D

Providence, RI 02907

Defendant Attorney

Mark A. Pogue

Attorney at Pierce Atwood LLP

One Financial Plaza, 26Th Floor

Providence, RI 02903

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Mark A. Pogue on behalf of Milco National Constructors Inc. (Pogue, Mark) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Milco National Constructors Inc.. (Hicks, Alyson) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1453676 ), filed by Daniel Acker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Dolinger, Barry) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint by Milco National Constructors Inc..(Pogue, Mark) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

#2

(#2) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#5

(#5) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint filed by Milco National Constructors Inc.. (Pogue, Mark) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

1 #3

Summons

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint by Milco National Constructors Inc..(Pogue, Mark) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReset Deadlines: Milco National Constructors Inc. answer due 1/24/2020 pursuant to #5 Stipulation filed by Milco National Constructors Inc. (Jackson, Ryan) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint filed by Milco National Constructors Inc.. (Pogue, Mark) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Mark A. Pogue on behalf of Milco National Constructors Inc. (Pogue, Mark) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Milco National Constructors Inc.. (Hicks, Alyson) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Hicks, Alyson) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1453676 ), filed by Daniel Acker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Dolinger, Barry) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1453676 ), filed by Daniel Acker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Dolinger, Barry) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.