This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/07/2019 at 07:50:21 (UTC).

Acis Capital Management LP et al v. Highland Capital Management LP et al

Case Summary

On 08/08/2019 Acis Capital Management LP filed a Bankruptcy - Withdrawal lawsuit against Highland Capital Management LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are A. Joe Fish and Sidney A Fitzwater. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01888

  • Filing Date:

    08/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Withdrawal

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

A. Joe Fish

Sidney A Fitzwater

 

Party Details

Debtors and Plaintiffs

Acis Capital Management, L.P.

Acis Capital Management GP, LLC

Acis Capital Management LP

Acis Capital Management GP LLC

Defendants

Highland CLO Holdings, Ltd.

Highland CLO Management Ltd.

Highland HCF Advisor, Ltd..

Highland CLO Funding, Ltd.

Highland Capital Management, L.P.

Highland Capital Management LP

Highland CLO Management Ltd

Highland HCF Advisor Ltd

Highland CLO Holdings Ltd

Highland CLO Funding Ltd

Not Classified By Court

Stacey G Jernigan

Dallas, TX 75242-1496

Case Admin Sup

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor and Plaintiff Attorneys

Annmarie Antoniette Chiarello

Attorney at Winstead PC

2728 North Harwood Street, Suite 500

Dallas, TX 75201

Rakhee V Patel

Attorney at Winstead PC

2728 N. Harwood Street, Suite 500

Dallas, TX 75201

Defendant Attorneys

Jason Bradley Binford

Attorney at Foley Gardere, Foley & Lardner LLP

2021 Mckinney Avenue, Suite 1600

Dallas, TX 75201

Mark Mitchell Maloney

Attorney at King & Spalding LLP

1180 Peachtree St

Atlanta, GA 30309

Melina Niaz Bales

Attorney at Foley Gardere

2021 Mckinney Avenue, Suite 1600

Dallas, TX 75201

Michael K Hurst

Attorney at Lynn Pinker Cox & Hurst LLP

2100 Ross Avenue, Suite 2700

Dallas, TX 75201

Holland Neff O'Neil

Attorney at Foley Gardere, Foley & Lardner LLP

2021 Mckinney Avenue, Suite 1600

Dallas, TX 75201

Rebecca Teryn Matsumura

Attorney at King & Spalding LLP

500 W 2Nd Street, Suite 1800

Austin, TX 78701

Paul R Bessette

Attorney at King & Spalding LLP

500 W 2Nd Street, Suite 1800

Austin, TX 78701

 

Court Documents

8 #1

Reply to (Response filed by Plaintiff Acis Capital Management GP, LLC, Plaintif

#8

7 #1

Reply to Response filed by Plaintiff Acis Capital Management GP, LLC, Plaintiff

#7

6 #1

Replt to Response filed by Plaintiff Acis Capital Management GP, LLC, Plaintiff

#6

#5

#3

2 #12

Exhibit B part 11

2 #6

Exhibit B part 5

2 #5

Exhibit B part 4

2 #4

Exhibit B part 3

2 #3

Exhibit B part 2

2 #2

Support document in re: response to withdraw the reference

2 #1

Response to motion to withdraw the reference

#2

1 #1

Motion to withdraw the reference as to second amended complaint and brief in su

#1

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Notice Transmitting of Reply to Response re: Motion for Withdrawal of Reference. (Attachments: #1 Reply to (Response filed by Plaintiff Acis Capital Management GP LLC, Plaintiff Acis Capital Management LP) filed by Defendants Highland CLO Holdings Ltd, Highland CLO Management Ltd, Highland HCF Advisor, LTD) (Whitaker - TXNB, Sheniqua) Modified text on 8/30/2019 (mla). (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Notice Transmitting of Reply to Response re: Motion for Withdrawal of Reference. (Attachments: #1 Reply to Response filed by Plaintiff Acis Capital Management GP LLC, Plaintiff Acis Capital Management LP) filed by Defendant Highland Capital Management LP. (Whitaker - TXNB, Sheniqua) Modified text on 8/30/2019 (mla). (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Notice Transmitting of Reply to Response re: Motion for Withdrawal of Reference. (Attachments: #1 Reply to Response filed by Plaintiff Acis Capital Management GP LLC, Plaintiff Acis Capital Management LP) filed by Defendant Highland CLO Funding, Ltd. (Whitaker - TXNB, Sheniqua) Modified text on 8/30/2019 (mla). (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER Administratively Closing Case. In accordance with the practice adopted in this district, the July 22, 2019 motion of Highland Capital Management, L.P. to withdraw the reference as to second amended complaint is referred to United States Bankruptcy Judge Stacey G. Jernigan to conduct a status conference and to submit a report and recommendation to the court concerning whether the reference should or must be withdrawn. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 8/29/2019) (Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • (#4) ELECTRONIC ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. This matter is transferred to the docket of the Honorable Judge Sidney A. Fitzwater, who has a related case. All future pleadings shall be filed under case number 3:19-CV-01888-D. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 8/28/2019) (chmb) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Court Request for Recusal: Senior Judge A. Joe Fish recused. Pursuant to instruction in Special Order 3-249, the Clerk has reassigned the case to Judge Ed Kinkeade for all further proceedings. Future filings should indicate the case number as: 3:19-cv-1888-K. (rekc) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of response opposed to motion to withdraw the reference and supporting documents re: #1 Notice Transmitting BK Appeal or Withdrawal of Reference,,, filed by Case Admin Sup (Attachments: #1 Response to motion to withdraw the reference, #2 Support document in re: response to withdraw the reference, #3 Exhibit B part 2, #4 Exhibit B part 3, #5 Exhibit B part 4, #6 Exhibit B part 5, #7 Exhibit B part 6, #8 Exhibit B part 7, #9 Exhibit B part 8, #10 Exhibit B part 9, #11 Exhibit B part 10, #12 Exhibit B part 11, #13 Exhibit B part 12, #14 Exhibit B part 13, #15 Exhibit B part 14, #16 Exhibit C, #17 Exhibit D) (Whitaker - TXNB, Sheniqua) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. (epm) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Notice of transmittal of motion for Withdrawal of Reference in #bankruptcy case number 18-03078 to presiding judge. The filing fee has been paid in the Bankruptcy Court. A link to the #Judges Copy Requirements is provided for your review. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: #Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Motion to withdraw the reference as to second amended complaint and brief in support) (Whitaker - TXNB, Sheniqua) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Highland CLO Funding Ltd is a litigant

Latest cases where ACIS Capital Management LP is a litigant

Latest cases where Highland Capital Management, L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Annmarie Antoniette Chiarello