This case was last updated from PACER on 12/07/2020 at 10:26:13 (UTC).

Acevedo v. Russell Cellular, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/08/2020 Acevedo filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Russell Cellular, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Stanley A. Boone. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01440

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Stanley A. Boone

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Marco Acevedo

Defendant

Russell Cellular, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Freiman

Attorney at Law Office of Michael Freiman

100 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 700

Santa Monica, CA 90401

Defendant Attorneys

Peter J. Woo

Attorney at Goldberg Segalla LLP

777 S Figueroa St., Suite 2000

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Victor Xu

Attorney at Golderg Segalla LLP

2600 Michelson Dr., Suite 100

Irvine, CA 92612

 

Court Documents

10 #1

Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Robert Lister ISO Defendant's Reply

#10

(#10) REPLY by Russell Cellular, Inc. re #7 Motion to Compel, #9 Opposition to Motion. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Robert Lister ISO Defendant's Reply)(Xu, Victor) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

9 #1

Declaration of Marco Acevedo

#9

(#9) OPPOSITION by Marco Acevedo to #7 Motion to Compel,. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Marco Acevedo)(Freiman, Michael) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

7 #4

Proposed Order

7 #3

Declaration of Robert Lister ISO MTC

7 #2

Declaration of Victor T. Xu ISO MTC

7 #1

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

#7

(#7) MOTION to COMPEL Arbitration and Stay Proceedings by Russell Cellular, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/24/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4 before UnassignedDJ. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Victor T. Xu ISO MTC, #3 Declaration of Robert Lister ISO MTC, #4 Proposed Order)(Xu, Victor) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Russell Cellular, Inc.. (Xu, Victor) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Russell Cellular, Inc.. (Xu, Victor) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE to Adverse Party of Removal to Federal Court by Russell Cellular, Inc.. (Xu, Victor) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

2 #4

VDRP

2 #3

Consent Form

2 #2

Standing Order re Judicial Emergency

2 #1

Standing Order

#2

(#2) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 11/24/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #3 Consent Form, #4 VDRP) (Jessen, A) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

1 #5

Declaration

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) REPLY by Russell Cellular, Inc. re #7 Motion to Compel, #9 Opposition to Motion. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Robert Lister ISO Defendant's Reply)(Xu, Victor) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) OPPOSITION by Marco Acevedo to #7 Motion to Compel,. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Marco Acevedo)(Freiman, Michael) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • Docket(#8) MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) Due to the pending Motion to Compel Arbitration the Scheduling Conference is reset from 11/24/2020 to 3/30/2021 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. A Joint Scheduling Conference Report is due one week before the new conference date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/30/2020. (Hernandez, M) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to COMPEL Arbitration and Stay Proceedings by Russell Cellular, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/24/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4 before UnassignedDJ. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Victor T. Xu ISO MTC, #3 Declaration of Robert Lister ISO MTC, #4 Proposed Order)(Xu, Victor) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Russell Cellular, Inc.. (Xu, Victor) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Russell Cellular, Inc.. (Xu, Victor) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CLERK'S NOTICE to Attorney Victor Xu re #3 Notice to Adverse Party: When filing a Certificate of Service, please use the event Certificate of Service under the category, Service of Process. Do not use the generic Notice event when a more specific event is available. Please re-file your document using the correct event. (Rivera, O) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE to Adverse Party of Removal to Federal Court by Russell Cellular, Inc.. (Xu, Victor) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 11/24/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #3 Consent Form, #4 VDRP) (Jessen, A) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of REMOVAL from Kings County Superior Court, case number 20C-0246 by Russell Cellular, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-9169782) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Declaration, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Corporate Disclosure)(Woo, Peter) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less