This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/09/2022 at 05:10:51 (UTC).

Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company v. McKesson Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 12/28/2020 Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against McKesson Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Jacqueline Scott Corley. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-09356

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jacqueline Scott Corley

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company

Counter Defendants, Defendants, Cross Claimants and Counter Claimants

McKesson Corporation

Liberty Special Markets Agency

AIU Insurance Company

North American Capacity Insurance Company

Great Lakes Insurance Company SE

Aspen Insurance UK Limited

Argo RE Limited

Markel American Insurance Company

Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company

National Union Fire Insurance Company

Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company

Defendants, Counter Claimants and Cross Defendants

AIU Insurance Company

National Union Fire Insurance Company

23 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Richard Stephen Endres

Blair Eden Kaminsky

Daniel Martin Sullivan

Gregory J Dubinsky

Patrick G Bollig

James M. McGuire

Counter Defendant, Defendant, Cross Claimant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

David A Luttinger

Gretchen Ann Hoff Varner

Anna P Engh

Clea P.M. Liquard

Nathan Evans Shafroth

Raymond Gin Lu

Mitchell Auslander

Christopher St. Jeanos

Richard Stephen Endres

Blair Eden Kaminsky

Daniel Martin Sullivan

Gregory J Dubinsky

Patrick G Bollig

James M. McGuire

Defendant, Counter Claimant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Mitchell Auslander

Christopher St. Jeanos

23 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#173

(#173) ORDER by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting (147) Stipulation re Briefing Schedule in case 3:20-cv-07469-JSC. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2022) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

#172

(#172) Transcript of Proceedings held on 1/27/22, before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Sullivan. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (130 in 3:20-cv-07469-JSC) Transcript Order, (131 in 3:20-cv-07469-JSC) Transcript Order, (129 in 3:20-cv-07469-JSC) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/2/2022. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 1/31/2022) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

#171

(#171) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting as modified (108) Stipulation Regarding Briefing Schedule and Page Limitations in case 3:20-cv-07469-JSC. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2021) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

#170

(#170) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting (106) Stipulation Regarding Briefing Schedule in case 3:20-cv-07469-JSC. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2021) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

#169

(#169) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting in part and denying in part (93) Motion to Stay in case 3:20-cv-07469-JSC. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2021) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

#166

(#166) STIPULATED ORDER RE: DISCOVERY OF ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 6/3/2021. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2021) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

165 #1

Exhibit A

165 #165

Main Document

#3

2 #2

Exhibit 1

2 #1

Declaration of Nathan Shafroth

#2

1 #5

Exhibit B, Part 3

1 #4

Exhibit B, Part 2

1 #3

Exhibit B, Part 1

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

194 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

05/11/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#173) ORDER by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting (147) Stipulation re Briefing Schedule in case 3:20-cv-07469-JSC. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2022) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#172) Transcript of Proceedings held on 1/27/22, before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Sullivan. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (130 in 3:20-cv-07469-JSC) Transcript Order, (131 in 3:20-cv-07469-JSC) Transcript Order, (129 in 3:20-cv-07469-JSC) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/2/2022. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 1/31/2022) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#171) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting as modified (108) Stipulation Regarding Briefing Schedule and Page Limitations in case 3:20-cv-07469-JSC. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2021) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/20/2021

DocketSet/Reset Deadlines as to (79 in 3:20-cv-07469-JSC) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on the Duty to Defend. Insurers' Opposition due by 10/20/2021. McKesson's Reply and opposition to Insurers' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment Replies due by 11/19/2021. Insurers' Reply due by 12/10/2021. Motion Hearing set for 1/13/2022 at 9:00 a.m. (location to be determined) before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2021) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/20/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#170) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting (106) Stipulation Regarding Briefing Schedule in case 3:20-cv-07469-JSC. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2021) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#169) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting in part and denying in part (93) Motion to Stay in case 3:20-cv-07469-JSC. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2021) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2021

Docket(#168) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Motion Hearing held by Zoom videoconference on 8/12/2021 re (93 in 3:20-cv-07469-JSC) McKesson's Motion to Stay Discovery and Proceedings. The Court to issue an order. (Court Reporter: Ana Dub)(Time 00:30)Attorneys for AIU Insurance: Jocelyn Sher/Chris St. Jeanos Attorneys for Ace Property: Michael Shuster/Daniel Sullivan/Blair Kaminsky/Daniel Horowitz/Robert Mangino/Susan Sullivan/Rick Endres Attorneys for McKesson: Anna P. Engh/ Gretchen A. Hoff Varner/Clea P.M. Liquard/David A. Luttinger/Shannon R. Tucker (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/12/2021) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2021

Docket(#167) CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. The hearing on Defendant's Motion for Stay set for 8/12/2021 at 9:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jsc Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of couns el or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names must be sent to the CRD at jsccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than 12:00 p.m. 8/11/2021.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2021) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/03/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#166) STIPULATED ORDER RE: DISCOVERY OF ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 6/3/2021. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2021) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/03/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#165) STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 6/3/2021. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2021) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
158 More Docket Entries
12/03/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Daniel M Sullivan. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/03/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Blair E Kaminsky. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/03/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney James M McGuire. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/03/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Michael S Shuster. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/03/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Spiro K Bantis. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/03/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/03/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (esa) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/02/2020

DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants AIU Insurance Company, Arch Reinsurance Limited, Argo RE Limited, Aspen Insurance UK Limited, Canopius Underwriting Bermuda Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Subscribing to Policy No. 509/DL554610, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Subscribing to Policy No. B0509B0WCN1500017, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Subscribing to Policy No. B0509BOWCN1600450, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Subscribing to Policy No. B0509BOWCN1600451, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Subscribing to Policy No. B0509BOWCN1700419, Certain Underwriters at Llyod's London, Subscribing to Policy No. B0509BOWCN1700408, Does, Endurance Specialty Insurance Limited, Golden State Insurance Company Limited, Great Lakes Insurance Company SE, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, Liberty Special Markets Agency, Markel American Insurance Company, McKesson Corporation, Munich Reinsurance America, Inc., National Fire & Marine Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company, North American Capacity Insurance Company, Swiss RE International SE, XL Insurance America, Inc., Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (filed in state court 11/2/20, submitted as document 1, attachment 3, p. 2) (esa) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/02/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California filed by defendant McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nathan Shafroth, #2 Exhibit 1) (Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party McKesson Corporation(pty:dft)) (Shafroth, Nathan) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/02/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) * NOTICE OF REMOVAL * filed as NOTICE filed by defendant McKesson Corporation. regarding Removal (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, Part 1, #4 Exhibit B, Part 2, #5 Exhibit B, Part 3)(Shafroth, Nathan) Modified on 12/3/2020 (esa). (Entered: 12/02/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less