This case was last updated from PACER on 02/26/2021 at 08:18:16 (UTC).

Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company v. McKesson Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 12/28/2020 Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against McKesson Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Donna M. Ryu and Jacqueline Scott Corley. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-09356

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Donna M. Ryu

Jacqueline Scott Corley

 

Party Details

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff

Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company

Defendants, Counter Claimants, Cross Claimants and Counter Defendants

Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Subscribing to Policy No. B0509B0WCN1500017

McKesson Corporation

Liberty Special Markets Agency

AIU Insurance Company

Lexington Insurance Company

North American Capacity Insurance Company

Great Lakes Insurance Company SE

Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Subscribing to Policy No. B0509BOWCN1600450

National Fire & Marine Insurance Company

Certain Underwriters at Llyod's London, Subscribing to Policy No. B0509BOWCN1700408

Aspen Insurance UK Limited

Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Subscribing to Policy No. B0509BOWCN1600451

Argo RE Limited

Markel American Insurance Company

Does 1-50

Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Subscribing to Policy No. 509/DL554610

Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company

National Union Fire Insurance Company

GOLDEN STATE INSURANCE COMPANY LIMITED

Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company

Cross Defendants, Defendants and Counter Claimants

AIU Insurance Company

National Union Fire Insurance Company

14 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Patrick G Bollig

Attorney at London Fischer LLP

2505 Mccabe Way Suite 100

Irvine, CA 92614

Blair E. Kaminsky

Attorney at Holwell Shuster and Goldberg LLP

425 Lexington Avenue 14Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Michael S. Shuster

Attorney at Holwell Shuster and Goldberg LLP

425 Lexington Avenue 14Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Daniel M. Sullivan

Attorney at Holwell Shuster and Goldberg LLP

425 Lexington Avenue 14Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

James Maurice McGuire, I

Attorney at Holwell Shuster and Goldberg LLP

425 Lexington Avenue, 14Th Fl

New York, NY 10017

Richard S Endres

Attorney at London Fischer LLP

2505 Mccabe Way Suite 100

Irvine, CA 92614

Denisha Simone Bacchus

425 Lexington Avenue, 14Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Richard Stephen Endres

2505 Mccabe Way, Suite 100

Irvine, CA 92614

Blair Eden Kaminsky

425 Lexington Avenue, 14Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Gregory J Dubinsky

Attorney at Holwell Shuster and Goldberg LLP

425 Lexington Avenue, 14Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Daniel Martin Sullivan

Attorney at Holwell Shuster and Goldberg LLP

425 Lexington Avenue, 14Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

James M. McGuire

Attorney at Holwell Shuster and Goldberg LLP

425 Lexington Avenue, 14Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Defendant, Counter Claimant, Cross Claimant and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Nathan Evans Shafroth

Attorney at Covington and Burling LLP

415 Mission Street Suite 5400

San Francisco, CA 94105-2533

Clea P.M. Liquard

Attorney at Covington and Burling LLP

The New York Times Building, 620 Eighth Avenue

New York, NY 10018

Anna P Engh

One Citycenter, 850 Tenth Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20001

David A Luttinger

Attorney at Covington and Burling LLP

Ny Times Building, 620 Eighth Avenue

New York, NY 10018-1405

Gretchen Ann Hoff Varner

Attorney at Covington Burling LLP

415 Mission Street, Suite 5400

San Francisco, CA 94105

Raymond Gin Lu

Attorney at Covington and Burling LLP

415 Mission Street

San Francisco, CA 94105

Christopher St. Jeanos

Attorney at Willkie Farr and Gallagher LLP

787 7Th Avenue

New York, NY 10019

Mitchell Auslander

Attorney at Willkie Farr and Gallagher LLP

787 7Th Avenue

New York, NY 10019

Patrick G Bollig

Attorney at London Fischer LLP

2505 Mccabe Way Suite 100

Irvine, CA 92614

Blair E. Kaminsky

Attorney at Holwell Shuster and Goldberg LLP

425 Lexington Avenue 14Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Michael S. Shuster

Attorney at Holwell Shuster and Goldberg LLP

425 Lexington Avenue 14Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Daniel M. Sullivan

Attorney at Holwell Shuster and Goldberg LLP

425 Lexington Avenue 14Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

James Maurice McGuire, I

Attorney at Holwell Shuster and Goldberg LLP

425 Lexington Avenue, 14Th Fl

New York, NY 10017

Richard S Endres

Attorney at London Fischer LLP

2505 Mccabe Way Suite 100

Irvine, CA 92614

Denisha Simone Bacchus

425 Lexington Avenue, 14Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Richard Stephen Endres

2505 Mccabe Way, Suite 100

Irvine, CA 92614

Blair Eden Kaminsky

425 Lexington Avenue, 14Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Gregory J Dubinsky

Attorney at Holwell Shuster and Goldberg LLP

425 Lexington Avenue, 14Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Daniel Martin Sullivan

Attorney at Holwell Shuster and Goldberg LLP

425 Lexington Avenue, 14Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

James M. McGuire

Attorney at Holwell Shuster and Goldberg LLP

425 Lexington Avenue, 14Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Defendant, Counter Claimant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Christopher St. Jeanos

Attorney at Willkie Farr and Gallagher LLP

787 7Th Avenue

New York, NY 10019

Mitchell Auslander

Attorney at Willkie Farr and Gallagher LLP

787 7Th Avenue

New York, NY 10019

13 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#130

(#130) TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 2/25/2021 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company, for Court Reporter Ana Dub. (Shuster, Michael) (Filed on 2/25/2021) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

#129

(#129) TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on February 25, 2021 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by AIU Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company, for Court Reporter Ana Dub. (McKenna, Madeleine) (Filed on 2/25/2021) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

#128

(#128) TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 2/25/2021 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by McKesson Corporation, for Court Reporter Ana Dub. (Hoff Varner, Gretchen) (Filed on 2/25/2021) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

#126

(#126) NOTICE of Appearance by Madeleine Frances McKenna for Defendants AIU Insurance Company and National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pa. (McKenna, Madeleine) (Filed on 2/22/2021) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

90 #4

Proposed Order

90 #3

Exhibit B - Proof of Service

90 #2

Exhibit A - McKesson 10Q

90 #1

Declaration of Daniel M. Sullivan

#90

Set/Reset Deadlines as to #90 MOTION to Remand . Motion Hearing reset for 2/25/2021 at 9:00 a.m. by videoconference before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2021) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

2 #2

Exhibit 1

2 #1

Declaration of Nathan Shafroth

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California filed by defendant McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nathan Shafroth, #2 Exhibit 1) (Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party McKesson Corporation(pty:dft)) (Shafroth, Nathan) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

1 #5

Exhibit B, Part 3

1 #4

Exhibit B, Part 2

1 #3

Exhibit B, Part 1

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) * NOTICE OF REMOVAL * filed as NOTICE filed by defendant McKesson Corporation. regarding Removal (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, Part 1, #4 Exhibit B, Part 2, #5 Exhibit B, Part 3)(Shafroth, Nathan) Modified on 12/3/2020 (esa). (Entered: 12/02/2020)

176 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#130) TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 2/25/2021 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company, for Court Reporter Ana Dub. (Shuster, Michael) (Filed on 2/25/2021) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#129) TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on February 25, 2021 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by AIU Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company, for Court Reporter Ana Dub. (McKenna, Madeleine) (Filed on 2/25/2021) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#128) TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 2/25/2021 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by McKesson Corporation, for Court Reporter Ana Dub. (Hoff Varner, Gretchen) (Filed on 2/25/2021) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#127) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Motion Hearing held by Zoom videoconference on 2/25/2021 re #90 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. The motion was argued, submitted, and taken under submission. (Court Reporter: Ana Dub)(Time 00:44)Attorneys for Plaintiffs: Rick Endres, Michael Shuster, Daniel Sullivan, and Gregory DubinskyAttorneys for Defendant McKesson Corporation: Gretchen Hoff Varner, Nathan Shafroth, and Anna EnghAttorneys for Defendants AIU Insurance Co. and National Union: Christopher St. Jeanos, Jocelyn Sher, Madeleine McKennaAttorney for Defendant National Fire & Marine Insurance Company: Jessica Do (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/25/2021) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#126) NOTICE of Appearance by Madeleine Frances McKenna for Defendants AIU Insurance Company and National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pa. (McKenna, Madeleine) (Filed on 2/22/2021) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • Docket(#125) CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Motion Hearing set for 2/25/2021 at 9:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jsc Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identifi ed by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names must be sent to the CRD at jsccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than 12:00 p.m. on 2/24/2021.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ah m, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2021) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#124) STIPULATION To Extend Time to Respond to Complaint Joint filed by GOLDEN STATE INSURANCE COMPANY LIMITED. (Hoff Varner, Gretchen) (Filed on 2/19/2021) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#123) Response re #122 Order byAce Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Shuster, Michael) (Filed on 2/18/2021) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines as to #90 MOTION to Remand . Motion Hearing reset for 2/25/2021 at 9:00 a.m. by videoconference before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2021) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#122) ORDER RE: DISMISSED DEFENDANTS AND REMAND MOTION HEARING. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 2/16/2021. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2021) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
114 More Docket Entries
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Daniel M Sullivan. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Blair E Kaminsky. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney James M McGuire. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Michael S Shuster. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Spiro K Bantis. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (esa) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants AIU Insurance Company, Arch Reinsurance Limited, Argo RE Limited, Aspen Insurance UK Limited, Canopius Underwriting Bermuda Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Subscribing to Policy No. 509/DL554610, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Subscribing to Policy No. B0509B0WCN1500017, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Subscribing to Policy No. B0509BOWCN1600450, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Subscribing to Policy No. B0509BOWCN1600451, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Subscribing to Policy No. B0509BOWCN1700419, Certain Underwriters at Llyod's London, Subscribing to Policy No. B0509BOWCN1700408, Does, Endurance Specialty Insurance Limited, Golden State Insurance Company Limited, Great Lakes Insurance Company SE, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, Liberty Special Markets Agency, Markel American Insurance Company, McKesson Corporation, Munich Reinsurance America, Inc., National Fire & Marine Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company, North American Capacity Insurance Company, Swiss RE International SE, XL Insurance America, Inc., Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (filed in state court 11/2/20, submitted as document 1, attachment 3, p. 2) (esa) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California filed by defendant McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nathan Shafroth, #2 Exhibit 1) (Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party McKesson Corporation(pty:dft)) (Shafroth, Nathan) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) * NOTICE OF REMOVAL * filed as NOTICE filed by defendant McKesson Corporation. regarding Removal (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, Part 1, #4 Exhibit B, Part 2, #5 Exhibit B, Part 3)(Shafroth, Nathan) Modified on 12/3/2020 (esa). (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Argo Re Limited (Bermuda) is a litigant