8:20-CV-02268
12/02/2020
Disposed - Other Disposed
Contract - Insurance
Douglas F. McCormick
David O. Carter
Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company
McKesson Corporation
National Union Fire Insurance Company
GOLDEN STATE INSURANCE COMPANY LIMITED
National Fire & Marine Insurance Company
AIU Insurance Company
Aspen Insurance UK Limited
Lexington Insurance Company
Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Subscribing to Policy No. B0509B0WCN1500017
Liberty Special Markets Agency
North American Capacity Insurance Company
Great Lakes Insurance Company SE
Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Subscribing to Policy No. B0509BOWCN1600450
Certain Underwriters at Llyod's London, Subscribing to Policy No. B0509BOWCN1700408
National Union Fire Insurance Company
AIU Insurance Company
Patrick G Bollig
Blair E. Kaminsky
Michael S. Shuster
Daniel M. Sullivan
James Maurice McGuire, I
Richard S Endres
Nathan Evans Shafroth
Clea P.M. Liquard
David A Luttinger
Gretchen Ann Hoff Varner
Raymond Gin Lu
Anna P. Engh
Exhibit B, Part 3
Exhibit B, Part 2
Exhibit B, Part 1
Exhibit A
Civil Cover Sheet
Docket(#62) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #55 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #56 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #57 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #58 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #59 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #60 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #61 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days). Case is closed as of 12/23/20. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom) (Entered: 12/29/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#61) SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company, upon Defendant Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Subscribing to Policy No. B0509B0WCN1500017 served on 12/24/2020, answer due 1/14/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Endres, Richard) (Entered: 12/28/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#60) SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company, upon Defendant Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Subscribing to Policy No. B0509BOWCN1700419 served on 12/24/2020, answer due 1/14/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Endres, Richard) (Entered: 12/28/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#59) SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Endres, Richard) (Entered: 12/28/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#58) SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company, upon Defendant Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Subscribing to Policy No. B0509BOWCN1600450 served on 12/24/2020, answer due 1/14/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Endres, Richard) (Entered: 12/28/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#57) SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company, upon Defendant Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Subscribing to Policy No. 509/DL554610 served on 12/24/2020, answer due 1/14/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Endres, Richard) (Entered: 12/28/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#56) SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Defendant Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company, upon Defendant Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Subscribing to Policy No. B0509BOWCN1600451 served on 12/24/2020, answer due 1/14/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Endres, Richard) (Entered: 12/28/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#55) SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company, upon Defendant Certain Underwriters at Llyod's London, Subscribing to Policy No. B0509BOWCN1700408 served on 12/24/2020, answer due 1/14/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Endres, Richard) (Entered: 12/28/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#54) Transfer Out Transmittal Letter (twdb) (Entered: 12/23/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#53) ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: IT IS ORDERED: 1. ACE consents to McKessons pending motion to transfer venue to the Northern District of California. Case transferred to the Northern District of California. Case electronically sent. MD JS-6. Case Terminated #21 #2 . (twdb) (Entered: 12/23/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#9) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Daniel M Sullivan. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa) (Entered: 12/03/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#8) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Blair E Kaminsky. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa) (Entered: 12/03/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#7) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney James M McGuire. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa) (Entered: 12/03/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#6) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Michael S Shuster. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa) (Entered: 12/03/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#5) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Spiro K Bantis. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa) (Entered: 12/03/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#4) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 12/03/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (esa) (Entered: 12/03/2020)
[-] Read LessDocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants AIU Insurance Company, Arch Reinsurance Limited, Argo RE Limited, Aspen Insurance UK Limited, Canopius Underwriting Bermuda Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Subscribing to Policy No. 509/DL554610, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Subscribing to Policy No. B0509B0WCN1500017, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Subscribing to Policy No. B0509BOWCN1600450, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Subscribing to Policy No. B0509BOWCN1600451, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Subscribing to Policy No. B0509BOWCN1700419, Certain Underwriters at Llyod's London, Subscribing to Policy No. B0509BOWCN1700408, Does, Endurance Specialty Insurance Limited, Golden State Insurance Company Limited, Great Lakes Insurance Company SE, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, Liberty Special Markets Agency, Markel American Insurance Company, McKesson Corporation, Munich Reinsurance America, Inc., National Fire & Marine Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company, North American Capacity Insurance Company, Swiss RE International SE, XL Insurance America, Inc., Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (filed in state court 11/2/20, submitted as document 1, attachment 3, p. 2) (esa) (Entered: 12/03/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#2) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California filed by defendant McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nathan Shafroth, #2 Exhibit 1) (Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party McKesson Corporation(pty:dft)) (Shafroth, Nathan) (Entered: 12/02/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#1) * NOTICE OF REMOVAL * filed as NOTICE filed by defendant McKesson Corporation. regarding Removal (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, Part 1, #4 Exhibit B, Part 2, #5 Exhibit B, Part 3)(Shafroth, Nathan) Modified on 12/3/2020 (esa). (Entered: 12/02/2020)
[-] Read Less