This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/31/2021 at 08:07:31 (UTC).

Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company v. McKesson Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 12/02/2020 Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against McKesson Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Douglas F. McCormick and David O. Carter. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:20-CV-02268

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Douglas F. McCormick

Presiding Judge

David O. Carter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company

Defendants, Counter Claimants and Cross Claimants

McKesson Corporation

National Union Fire Insurance Company

GOLDEN STATE INSURANCE COMPANY LIMITED

National Fire & Marine Insurance Company

AIU Insurance Company

Aspen Insurance UK Limited

Lexington Insurance Company

Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Subscribing to Policy No. B0509B0WCN1500017

Liberty Special Markets Agency

North American Capacity Insurance Company

Great Lakes Insurance Company SE

Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Subscribing to Policy No. B0509BOWCN1600450

Certain Underwriters at Llyod's London, Subscribing to Policy No. B0509BOWCN1700408

Defendants and Cross Defendants

National Union Fire Insurance Company

AIU Insurance Company

18 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Patrick G Bollig

Blair E. Kaminsky

Michael S. Shuster

Daniel M. Sullivan

James Maurice McGuire, I

Richard S Endres

Defendant, Counter Claimant and Cross Claimant Attorneys

Nathan Evans Shafroth

Clea P.M. Liquard

David A Luttinger

Gretchen Ann Hoff Varner

Raymond Gin Lu

Anna P. Engh

 

Court Documents

#62

#61

#60

#59

#58

#57

#56

#55

#54

#5

#4

#3

1 #5

Exhibit B, Part 3

1 #4

Exhibit B, Part 2

1 #3

Exhibit B, Part 1

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

58 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

12/29/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#62) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #55 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #56 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #57 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #58 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #59 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #60 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #61 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days). Case is closed as of 12/23/20. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/28/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#61) SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company, upon Defendant Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Subscribing to Policy No. B0509B0WCN1500017 served on 12/24/2020, answer due 1/14/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Endres, Richard) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/28/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#60) SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company, upon Defendant Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Subscribing to Policy No. B0509BOWCN1700419 served on 12/24/2020, answer due 1/14/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Endres, Richard) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/28/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#59) SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Endres, Richard) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/28/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#58) SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company, upon Defendant Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Subscribing to Policy No. B0509BOWCN1600450 served on 12/24/2020, answer due 1/14/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Endres, Richard) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/28/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#57) SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company, upon Defendant Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Subscribing to Policy No. 509/DL554610 served on 12/24/2020, answer due 1/14/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Endres, Richard) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/28/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#56) SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Defendant Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company, upon Defendant Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Subscribing to Policy No. B0509BOWCN1600451 served on 12/24/2020, answer due 1/14/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Endres, Richard) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/28/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#55) SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company, upon Defendant Certain Underwriters at Llyod's London, Subscribing to Policy No. B0509BOWCN1700408 served on 12/24/2020, answer due 1/14/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Endres, Richard) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/23/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#54) Transfer Out Transmittal Letter (twdb) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/23/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#53) ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: IT IS ORDERED: 1. ACE consents to McKessons pending motion to transfer venue to the Northern District of California. Case transferred to the Northern District of California. Case electronically sent. MD JS-6. Case Terminated #21 #2 . (twdb) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
43 More Docket Entries
12/03/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Daniel M Sullivan. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/03/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Blair E Kaminsky. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/03/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney James M McGuire. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/03/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Michael S Shuster. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/03/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Spiro K Bantis. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/03/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/03/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (esa) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/02/2020

DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants AIU Insurance Company, Arch Reinsurance Limited, Argo RE Limited, Aspen Insurance UK Limited, Canopius Underwriting Bermuda Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Subscribing to Policy No. 509/DL554610, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Subscribing to Policy No. B0509B0WCN1500017, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Subscribing to Policy No. B0509BOWCN1600450, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Subscribing to Policy No. B0509BOWCN1600451, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Subscribing to Policy No. B0509BOWCN1700419, Certain Underwriters at Llyod's London, Subscribing to Policy No. B0509BOWCN1700408, Does, Endurance Specialty Insurance Limited, Golden State Insurance Company Limited, Great Lakes Insurance Company SE, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, Liberty Special Markets Agency, Markel American Insurance Company, McKesson Corporation, Munich Reinsurance America, Inc., National Fire & Marine Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company, North American Capacity Insurance Company, Swiss RE International SE, XL Insurance America, Inc., Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (filed in state court 11/2/20, submitted as document 1, attachment 3, p. 2) (esa) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/02/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California filed by defendant McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nathan Shafroth, #2 Exhibit 1) (Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party McKesson Corporation(pty:dft)) (Shafroth, Nathan) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/02/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) * NOTICE OF REMOVAL * filed as NOTICE filed by defendant McKesson Corporation. regarding Removal (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, Part 1, #4 Exhibit B, Part 2, #5 Exhibit B, Part 3)(Shafroth, Nathan) Modified on 12/3/2020 (esa). (Entered: 12/02/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less