This case was last updated from PACER on 03/15/2021 at 09:22:24 (UTC).

ACE American Insurance Company v. Weyenberg, Jr.

Case Summary

On 01/14/2021 ACE American Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Weyenberg, Jr. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Ed Kinkeade. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00092

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ed Kinkeade

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ACE American Insurance Company

Petitioner

Deborah Rosene

Defendant

Larry Weyenberg, Jr.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alicia G Curran

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor

1717 Main St, Suite 3100

Dallas, TX 75201

Alissa Kirksey Christopher

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor

1717 Main Street, Suite 3400

Dallas, TX 75201

Petitioner Attorney

Christopher S Hamilton

Attorney at Hamilton Wingo LLP

325 N St Paul Street, Suite 3300

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

8 #2

Proposed Order

8 #1

Exhibit(s) A

#8

(#8) MOTION to Intervene filed by Deborah Rosene (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Proposed Order). Party Deborah Rosene added.Attorney Christopher S Hamilton added to party Deborah Rosene(pty:intvd) (Hamilton, Christopher) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Larry Weyenberg, Jr. ; served on 2/3/2021. (Christopher, Alissa) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Larry Weyenberg, Jr.. (oyh) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

#5

(#5) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ACE American Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Chubb Limited, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Chubb Group Holdings Inc. for ACE American Insurance Company. (Christopher, Alissa) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

#2

(#2) Request for Clerk to issue Summons for Defendant filed by ACE American Insurance Company. (Christopher, Alissa) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

1 #1

Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Larry Weyenberg, Jr. filed by ACE American Insurance Company. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-11514924) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Curran, Alicia) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Intervene filed by Deborah Rosene (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Proposed Order). Party Deborah Rosene added.Attorney Christopher S Hamilton added to party Deborah Rosene(pty:intvd) (Hamilton, Christopher) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Larry Weyenberg, Jr. ; served on 2/3/2021. (Christopher, Alissa) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Larry Weyenberg, Jr.. (oyh) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ACE American Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Chubb Limited, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Chubb Group Holdings Inc. for ACE American Insurance Company. (Christopher, Alissa) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Clerk to issue Summons for Defendant filed by ACE American Insurance Company. (Christopher, Alissa) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Larry Weyenberg, Jr. filed by ACE American Insurance Company. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-11514924) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Curran, Alicia) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ACE American Insurance Company, a Pennsylvania corporation, and ACE Property & Casualty Insurance Co., a Pennsylvania corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher S Hamilton