This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/02/2021 at 07:46:13 (UTC).

ACCOUNTING PRINCIPALS, INC. v. ZETUSKY et al

Case Summary

On 02/01/2021 ACCOUNTING PRINCIPALS, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ZETUSKY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is HARVEY BARTLE, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00460

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

HARVEY BARTLE, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ACCOUNTING PRINCIPALS, INC.

Defendants

CHRISTOPHER ZETUSKY

JAMES KANE

JUNO SEARCH PARTNERS, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ALEXANDER NEMIROFF

Defendant Attorney

DAVID F. MCCOMB

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit 1

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Designation Form

#2

2 #1

Declaration

2 #2

Text of Proposed Order

2 #3

Certificate of Service

#3

#4

#5

#6

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STIPULATED ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 3/29/21. 3/29/21 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Adecco, Inc. with Certificate of Service by ACCOUNTING PRINCIPALS, INC..(NEMIROFF, ALEXANDER) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID F. MCCOMB on behalf of JUNO SEARCH PARTNERS, LLC, JAMES KANE, CHRISTOPHER ZETUSKY with Jury Demand, Certificate of Service(MCCOMB, DAVID) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) FIRST SCHEDULING ORDER. ORDER THAT THE MOTION OF PLAINTIFF FOR EXPEDITED DISCOVERY IS GRANTED. FACT DISCOVERY IS DUE BY 4/9/21. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 2/9/21. 2/9/21 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by ACCOUNTING PRINCIPALS, INC..proposed Order, Declaration, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(NEMIROFF, ALEXANDER) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued as to JUNO SEARCH PARTNERS, LLC, JAMES KANE, CHRISTOPHER ZETUSKY. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 2/2/21 (bw, ) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against JUNO SEARCH PARTNERS, LLC, JAMES KANE, CHRISTOPHER ZETUSKY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-14883925.), filed by ACCOUNTING PRINCIPALS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Designation Form)(NEMIROFF, ALEXANDER) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less