This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/24/2020 at 08:34:42 (UTC).

Accordia Life and Annuity Company v. Antunes

Case Summary

On 08/25/2020 Accordia Life and Annuity Company filed a Government Benefit - Government Benefit Recovery lawsuit against Antunes. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard M Gergel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:20-CV-03049

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Government Benefit Recovery

  • Courthouse:

    South Carolina District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard M Gergel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Accordia Life and Annuity Company

Defendant

John Antunes

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stephen M Cox

Attorney at Robinson Bradshaw and Hinson

Po Box 12070

Rock Hill, SC 29731

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE by Accordia Life and Annuity Company. John Antunes waiver executed on 8/26/2020, answer due 10/26/2020. (Cox, Stephen) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to John Antunes. (sshe, ) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

#2

(#2) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Accordia Life and Annuity Company.(sshe, ) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - Surrender check

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Policy

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against John Antunes ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9299987.), filed by Accordia Life and Annuity Company. Service due by 11/23/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Policy, #2 Exhibit 2 - Surrender check)(sshe, ) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE by Accordia Life and Annuity Company. John Antunes waiver executed on 8/26/2020, answer due 10/26/2020. (Cox, Stephen) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to John Antunes. (sshe, ) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Accordia Life and Annuity Company.(sshe, ) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against John Antunes ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9299987.), filed by Accordia Life and Annuity Company. Service due by 11/23/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Policy, #2 Exhibit 2 - Surrender check)(sshe, ) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Accordia Life and Annuity Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephen Mark Cox