This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/25/2021 at 04:48:56 (UTC).

Accord v. Anderson County, Tennessee et al

Case Summary

On 02/01/2021 Accord filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Anderson County, Tennessee. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Eli J. Richardson and Jeffery S. Frensley. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00077

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Eli J. Richardson

Referral Judge

Jeffery S. Frensley

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gary Accord

Defendants

Henderson County, Tennessee

Polk County, Tennessee

Hamilton County, Tennessee

Montgomery County, Tennessee

Haywood County, Tennessee

Coffee County, Tennessee

Shelby County, Tennessee

Sullivan County, Tennessee

Unicoi County, Tennessee

Davidson County, Tennessee

Weakley County, Tennessee

Dyer County, Tennessee

Warren County, Tennessee

Pickett County, Tennessee

Sequatchie County, Tennessee

Marshall County, Tennessee

Madison County, Tennessee

Carter County, Tennessee

Bradley County, Tennessee

76 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gordon Ball

Attorney at Gordon Ball, LLC

3728 West End Avenue

Nashville, TN 37205

Patrick W. Pendley

Attorney at Pendley, Baudin & Coffin, LLP

1515 Poydras Street, Suite 1400

New Orleans, LA 70112

Andrea Leigh Barient

Attorney at Pendley, Baudin & Coffin, LLP

24110 Edan Street

Plaquemine, LA 70764

Defendant Attorneys

J. Austin Stokes

Attorney at Pentecost, Glenn & Mauldin, PLLC

162 Murray Guard Drive, Suite B

Jackson, TN 38305

James I. Pentecost

Attorney at Pentecost, Glenn & Mauldin, PLLC

162 Murray Guard Drive, Suite B

Jackson, TN 38305

Nathan D. Tilly

Attorney at Pentecost, Glenn & Mauldin, PLLC

162 Murray Guard Drive, Suite B

Jackson, TN 38305

Mary Neill Southerland

Attorney at Hamilton County Attorney's Office

Room 204, Courthouse, 625 Georgia Avenue

Chattanooga, TN 37402

Sharon McMullan Milling

Attorney at Hamilton County Attorney's Office

Room 204, Courthouse, 625 Georgia Avenue

Chattanooga, TN 37402

John Marshall Jones

Attorney at Shelby County Government

160 N Main Street, Suite 950

Memphis, TN 38103

Allison L. Bussell

Attorney at Metropolitan Legal Department

P O Box 196300

Nashville, TN 37219

Other Attorneys

William C. Scales, Jr.

Attorney at Gullett, Sanford, Robinson & Martin PLLC

150 Third Avenue South, Suite 1700

Nashville, TN 37201

Sarah L. Locker

Attorney at Gullett, Sanford, Robinson & Martin PLLC

150 Third Avenue South, Suite 1700

Nashville, TN 37201

Leah May Dennen

Attorney at Sumner County Law Department

355 N Belvedere Drive, Room 303

Gallatin, TN 37066

Lisa M. Carson

Attorney at Buerger, Moseley & Carson, PLC

306 Public Square

Franklin, TN 37064

Brad A. Fraser

Attorney at Leitner, Williams, Dooley & Napolitan, PLLC (Knoxville)

900 S. Gay Street, Suite 1800

Knoxville, TN 37902

Jeffrey G. Jones

Attorney at Wimberly, Lawson, Wright, Daves & Jones, PLLC

P O Box 655, 1420 Neal Street

Cookeville, TN 38503-0655

Benjamin C. Allen

Attorney at Sumner County Law Department

355 N Belvedere Drive, Room 303

Gallatin, TN 37066

Nicholas Clinton Christiansen

Attorney at Hudson, Reed & Christiansen, PLLC

16 Public Square, N

Murfreesboro, TN 37130

Howard L. Upchurch

Attorney at Upchurch & Upchurch

P O Box 381

Pikeville, TN 37367

Thomas B. Russell

Attorney at Gullett, Sanford, Robinson & Martin PLLC

150 Third Avenue South, Suite 1700

Nashville, TN 37201

15 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#161

#160

#159

#158

#157

#156

#143

#136

#124

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #3

Attachment 1 - Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

210 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#161) RESPONSE in Support re #157 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Hancock County, Tennessee. (Fraser, Brad) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#160) ORDER: For the reasons stated herein, the motions to stay (Docket Nos. #124 , #136 , #143 ) are GRANTED. The Initial Case Management Conference currently scheduled for August 19, 2021 is cancelled. The case management conference will be rescheduled after a ruling on the dispositive motions, if necessary. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 8/16/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#159) RESPONSE to Motion re #157 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Gary Accord. (Ball, Gordon) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#158) MEMORANDUM in Support of #157 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Hancock County, Tennessee . (Fraser, Brad) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#157) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Hancock County, Tennessee. (Fraser, Brad) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketTN State Bar status verified as active for Caitlin Burchette admitted to this court. (ln) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#156) ORDER: MOTION #153 of Lisa M. Carson to be Excused from August 19, 2021 Initial Case Management Conference GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 7/21/2021. (ln) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#155) NOTICE of Appearance by Caitlin Burchette on behalf of Anderson County, Tennessee, Bedford County, Tennessee, Benton County, Tennessee, Cannon County, Tennessee, Carter County, Tennessee, Chester County, Tennessee, Cocke County, Tennessee, Crockett County, Tennessee, Franklin County, Tennessee, Hamblen County, Tennessee, Hardeman County, Tennessee, Henderson County, Tennessee, Henry County, Tennessee, Hickman County, Tennessee, Humphreys County, Tennessee, Jefferson County, Tennessee, Lauderdale County, Tennessee, Loudon County, Tennessee, McMinn County, Tennessee, Meigs County, Tennessee, Monroe County, Tennessee, Moore County, Tennessee, Morgan County, Tennessee, Obion County, Tennessee, Rhea County, Tennessee, Scott County, Tennessee, Sequatchie County, Tennessee, Stewart County, Tennessee, Trousdale County, Tennessee, Union County, Tennessee, White County, Tennessee (Burchette, Caitlin) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#154) AFFIDAVIT re #153 Unopposed MOTION for Lisa M. Carson to be excused from August 19, 2021 initial case management conference re #148 Order by Williamson County, Tennessee. (Carson, Lisa) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#153) Unopposed MOTION for Lisa M. Carson to be excused from August 19, 2021 initial case management conference re #148 Order by Williamson County, Tennessee. (Carson, Lisa) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
184 More Docket Entries
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Summons to be Issued as to Sullivan County, Tennessee, Sumner County, Tennessee, Tipton County, Tennessee, Trousdale County, Tennessee, Unicoi County, Tennessee, Union County, Tennessee, Van Buren County, Tennessee, Warren County, Tennessee, Washington County, Tennessee, Wayne County, Tennessee, Weakley County, Tennessee, White County, Tennessee, Williamson County, Tennessee, Wilson County, Tennessee. (Ball, Gordon) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Summons to be Issued as to Hickman County, Tennessee, Houston County, Tennessee, Humphreys County, Tennessee, Jackson County, Tennessee, Jefferson County, Tennessee, Johnson County, Tennessee, Knox County, Tennessee, Lake County, Tennessee, Lauderdale County, Tennessee, Lawrence County, Tennessee, Lewis County, Tennessee, Lincoln County, Tennessee, Loudon County, Tennessee, Macon County, Tennessee, Madison County, Tennessee, Marion County, Tennessee, Marshall County, Tennessee, Maury County, Tennessee, McMinn County, Tennessee, McNairy County, Tennessee, Meigs County, Tennessee, Monroe County, Tennessee, Montgomery County, Tennessee, Moore County, Tennessee, Morgan County, Tennessee, Obion County, Tennessee, Overton County, Tennessee, Perry County, Tennessee, Pickett County, Tennessee, Polk County, Tennessee, Putnam County, Tennessee, Rhea County, Tennessee, Roane County, Tennessee, Robertson County, Tennessee, Rutherford County, Tennessee, Scott County, Tennessee, Sequatchie County, Tennessee, Sevier County, Tennessee, Shelby County, Tennessee, Smith County, Tennessee, Stewart County, Tennessee. (Ball, Gordon) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Summons to be Issued as to Anderson County, Tennessee, Bedford County, Tennessee, Benton County, Tennessee, Bledsoe County, Tennessee, Blount County, Tennessee, Bradley County, Tennessee, Campbell County, Tennessee, Cannon County, Tennessee, Carroll County, Tennessee, Carter County, Tennessee, Cheatham County, Tennessee, Chester County, Tennessee, Claiborne County, Tennessee, Clay County, Tennessee, Cocke County, Tennessee, Coffee County, Tennessee, Crockett County, Tennessee, Cumberland County, Tennessee, Davidson County, Tennessee, Decatur County, Tennessee, Dekalb County, Tennessee, Dickson County, Tennessee, Dyer County, Tennessee, Fayette County, Tennessee, Fentress County, Tennessee, Franklin County, Tennessee, Gibson County, Tennessee, Giles County, Tennessee, Grainger County, Tennessee, Greene County, Tennessee, Grundy County, Tennessee, Hamblen County, Tennessee, Hamilton County, Tennessee, Hancock County, Tennessee, Hardeman County, Tennessee, Hardin County, Tennessee, Hawkins County, Tennessee, Haywood County, Tennessee, Henderson County, Tennessee, Henry County, Tennessee. (Ball, Gordon) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 02/04/021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE by Gary Accord Notice of Filing Description of Exhibits (Ball, Gordon) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketTN State Bar status verified as active for Gordon Ball admitted to this court. (ln) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/6/2021 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (ln) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ln) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO FILER re DE#1 : Counsel failed to include the mandatory description of the attached exhibits. Counsel is directed to file a notice that lists each exhibit with a brief description. (ln) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Anderson County, Tennessee, Bedford County, Tennessee, Benton County, Tennessee, Bledsoe County, Tennessee, Blount County, Tennessee, Bradley County, Tennessee, Campbell County, Tennessee, Cannon County, Tennessee, Carroll County, Tennessee, Carter County, Tennessee, Cheatham County, Tennessee, Chester County, Tennessee, Claiborne County, Tennessee, Clay County, Tennessee, Cocke County, Tennessee, Coffee County, Tennessee, Crockett County, Tennessee, Cumberland County, Tennessee, Davidson County, Tennessee, Decatur County, Tennessee, Dekalb County, Tennessee, Dickson County, Tennessee, Dyer County, Tennessee, Fayette County, Tennessee, Fentress County, Tennessee, Franklin County, Tennessee, Gibson County, Tennessee, Giles County, Tennessee, Grainger County, Tennessee, Greene County, Tennessee, Grundy County, Tennessee, Hamblen County, Tennessee, Hamilton County, Tennessee, Hancock County, Tennessee, Hardeman County, Tennessee, Hardin County, Tennessee, Hawkins County, Tennessee, Haywood County, Tennessee, Henderson County, Tennessee, Henry County, Tennessee, Hickman County, Tennessee, Houston County, Tennessee, Humphreys County, Tennessee, Jackson County, Tennessee, Jefferson County, Tennessee, Johnson County, Tennessee, Knox County, Tennessee, Lake County, Tennessee, Lauderdale County, Tennessee, Lawrence County, Tennessee, Lewis County, Tennessee, Lincoln County, Tennessee, Loudon County, Tennessee, Macon County, Tennessee, Madison County, Tennessee, Marion County, Tennessee, Marshall County, Tennessee, Maury County, Tennessee, McMinn County, Tennessee, McNairy County, Tennessee, Meigs County, Tennessee, Monroe County, Tennessee, Montgomery County, Tennessee, Moore County, Tennessee, Morgan County, Tennessee, Obion County, Tennessee, Overton County, Tennessee, Perry County, Tennessee, Pickett County, Tennessee, Polk County, Tennessee, Putnam County, Tennessee, Rhea County, Tennessee, Roane County, Tennessee, Robertson County, Tennessee, Rutherford County, Tennessee, Scott County, Tennessee, Sequatchie County, Tennessee, Sevier County, Tennessee, Shelby County, Tennessee, Smith County, Tennessee, Stewart County, Tennessee, Sullivan County, Tennessee, Sumner County, Tennessee, Tipton County, Tennessee, Trousdale County, Tennessee, Unicoi County, Tennessee, Union County, Tennessee, Van Buren County, Tennessee, Warren County, Tennessee, Washington County, Tennessee, Wayne County, Tennessee, Weakley County, Tennessee, White County, Tennessee, Williamson County, Tennessee, Wilson County, Tennessee (Filing fee $402, Receipt number 0650-3305930) filed by Gary Accord. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Attachment 1 - Civil Cover Sheet).(ln) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sullivan County, Tennessee is a litigant

Latest cases where Henderson County, Tennessee is a litigant