This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/17/2019 at 07:03:34 (UTC).

Accor Management US Inc. et al v. Visa Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/19/2019 Accor Management US Inc filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Visa Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Virginia K. DeMarchi and Beth Labson Freeman. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-04188

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Virginia K. DeMarchi

Presiding Judge

Beth Labson Freeman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Warner Bros. Home Entertainment Inc.

Accor Hotels & Resorts (Maryland) LLC

Bridgestone Americas, Inc.

E.C. Publications, Inc.

White Lodging Services Corporation

Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc.

Sage Investment Holdings, L.L.C.

Public Storage

UnitedHealth Group Incorporated

Pacifica Hotel Management, LLC

Cornerstone Brands, Inc.

CarMax, Inc.

Auro Hotels Management, LLC

Concord Hospitality Enterprises Company, LLC

Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc.

HSN, Inc.

Warner Bros. Consumer Products Inc.

Defendants

Visa Inc.

MasterCard Incorporated

Visa International Service Association

57 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Daniel Allen Sasse

Attorney at Crowell & Moring LLP

3 Park Plaza, 20Th Floor

Irvine, CA 92614

Jordan Lee Ludwig

Attorney at Crowell and Moring LLP

3 Park Plaza, 20Th Floor

Irvine, CA 92614

Deborah Ellen Arbabi

Attorney at Crowell and Moring LLP

3 Park Plaza, 20Th Floor

Irvine, CA 92614

John Samuel Gibson

Attorney at Crowell & Moring LLP

3 Park Plaza, 20Th Floor

Irvine, CA 92614

 

Court Documents

#61

#60

#59

#58

#57

#56

#55

54 #2

Exhibit B

#54

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A - T

#1

56 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) Certificate of Interested Entities by Jack in the Box Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Jack in the Box Properties, LLC for Jack in the Box Inc.. and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 8/14/2019) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketCase transferred from California Northern has been opened in Eastern District of New York as case 1:19-cv-04616, filed 08/12/2019. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2019) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) ORDER FROM MDL PANEL OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER-29 TO THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2019) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) Certificate of Interested Entities by Marriott International, Inc. and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 8/9/2019) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) Certificate of Interested Entities by Hyatt Hotels Corporation and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 8/8/2019) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) Certificate of Interested Entities by Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc. and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 8/8/2019) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) Certificate of Interested Entities by Accor Hotels & Resorts (Maryland) LLC, Accor Management US Inc., Fairmont Hotel Management L.P. identifying Other Affiliate Fairmont Hotel Management Company, Other Affiliate Accor Management US Inc. for Fairmont Hotel Management L.P.; Corporate Parent FHI Finance (U.S.) Inc., Corporate Parent Accor SA for Accor Management US Inc.; Corporate Parent Accor Management US Inc. for Accor Hotels & Resorts (Maryland) LLC. and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 8/8/2019) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) Certificate of Interested Entities by Mountain Standard Group, LLC and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 8/6/2019) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) NOTICE by AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility II, LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services, Inc., Accor Hotels & Resorts (Maryland) LLC, Accor Management US Inc., Auro Hotels Management, LLC, AutoNation, Inc., BJ's Restaurants, Inc., BellSouth Telecommunications LLC, Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC, Bridgestone Americas, Inc., Bridgestone Retail Operations, LLC, Caleres, Inc., CarMax, Inc., Concord Hospitality Enterprises Company, LLC, Cornerstone Brands, Inc., Crestline Hotels & Resorts, LLC, Cricket Wireless LLC, DC Comics, DIRECTV, LLC, E.C. Publications, Inc., Enterprise Holdings, Inc., Fairmont Hotel Management L.P., Fitness International, LLC, Flynn Restaurant Group LP, Gordon Brothers Group, LLC, HBO Digital Services, Inc., HBO Retail Ventures, Inc., HSN, Inc., Heart of America Management, L.L.C., Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc., Host Hotels & Resorts, L.P., Hyatt Hotels Corporation, Ingram Micro Inc., Interstate Hotels & Resorts, Inc., Jack in the Box Inc., Joshi Hotel Group, LLC, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc., Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, LEGO Brand Retail, Inc., LEGO Systems, Inc., Loews Hotels Holding Corporation, Mananto Enterprises LLC, Marriott International, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Mountain Standard Group, LLC, National General Holdings Corp., National General Management Corp., Nespresso USA, Inc., Nestle Waters North America Inc., Old Comp Inc., OnStar, LLC, Pacifica Hotel Management, LLC, Public Storage, Qdoba Restaurant Corporation, Sage Hospitality Resources LLC, Sage Investment Holdings, L.L.C., Sephora USA, Inc., Sunstone Hotel Investors, Inc., Telepictures Productions Inc., The Container Store, Inc., United Airlines, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, WB Games Boston Inc., WB Studio Enterprises Inc., Warner Bros. Consumer Products Inc., Warner Bros. Digital Networks Labs Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Warner Bros. Home Entertainment Inc., Warner Brothers Advanced Media Services Inc., White Lodging Services Corporation OF FILING OF NOTICE OF TAG-ALONG ACTION AND CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 8/6/2019) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Virginia K. DeMarchi is the referral judge assigned to case. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero is no longer assigned to the case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 8/6/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2019) Modified on 8/6/2019 (cfeS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/8/2019 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Certificate of Interested Entities and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cornerstone Brands, Inc., HSN, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Qurate Retail, Inc. for Cornerstone Brands, Inc., HSN, Inc.. (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 7/23/2019) Modified on 7/24/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Certificate of Interested Entities and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Host Hotels & Resorts, L.P. identifying Corporate Parent Host Hotels & Resorts, Inc., Other Affiliate BlackRock Inc. for Host Hotels & Resorts, L.P.. (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 7/23/2019) Modified on 7/24/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Certificate of Interested Entities and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Flynn Restaurant Group LP (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 7/23/2019) Modified on 7/24/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Certificate of Interested Entities and Corporate Disclosure Statement by AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility II, LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services, Inc., BellSouth Telecommunications LLC, Cricket Wireless LLC, DC Comics, DIRECTV, LLC, E.C. Publications, Inc., HBO Digital Services, Inc., HBO Retail Ventures, Inc., Telepictures Productions Inc., WB Games Boston Inc., WB Studio Enterprises Inc., Warner Bros. Consumer Products Inc., Warner Bros. Digital Networks Labs Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Warner Bros. Home Entertainment Inc., Warner Brothers Advanced Media Services Inc. identifying Corporate Parent AT&T Inc. for AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility II, LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services, Inc., BellSouth Telecommunications LLC, Cricket Wireless LLC, DC Comics, DIRECTV, LLC, E.C. Publications, Inc., HBO Digital Services, Inc., HBO Retail Ventures, Inc., Telepictures Productions Inc., WB Games Boston Inc., WB Studio Enterprises Inc., Warner Bros. Consumer Products Inc., Warner Bros. Digital Networks Labs Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Warner Bros. Home Entertainment Inc., Warner Brothers Advanced Media Services Inc.. (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 7/23/2019) Modified on 7/24/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Certificate of Interested Entities and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Caleres, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Blackrock Inc. for Caleres, Inc.. (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 7/23/2019) Modified on 7/24/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Certificate of Interested Entities and Corporate Disclosure Statement by AutoNation, Inc. (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 7/23/2019) Modified on 7/24/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance on Behalf of All Plaintiffs by Daniel Allen Sasse (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 7/22/2019) Modified on 7/24/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Proposed Summons. (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 7/22/2019) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/5/2019. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2019) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Violations of Sections 1 and 2 of the Sherman Antitrust Act; Demand for Jury Trial against MasterCard Incorporated, MasterCard International Incorporated, Visa Inc., Visa International Service Association, Visa U.S.A., Inc. (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-13538594.). Filed by Fitness International, LLC, Enterprise Holdings, Inc., Sage Hospitality Resources LLC, E.C. Publications, Inc., Bridgestone Retail Operations, LLC, Warner Bros. Consumer Products Inc., BellSouth Telecommunications LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, Jack in the Box Inc., National General Management Corp., Warner Bros. Digital Networks Labs Inc., Nestle Waters North America Inc., Public Storage, DC Comics, Concord Hospitality Enterprises Company, LLC, WB Studio Enterprises Inc., Gordon Brothers Group, LLC, The Container Store, Inc., LEGO Brand Retail, Inc., BJs Restaurants, Inc., Warner Bros. Home Entertainment Inc., Sephora USA, Inc., Mananto Enterprises LLC, HSN, Inc., Sage Investment Holdings, L.L.C., Old Comp Inc., Hyatt Hotels Corporation, Crestline Hotels & Resorts, LLC, AT&T Corp., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Pacifica Hotel Management, LLC, Nespresso USA, Inc., Sunstone Hotel Investors, Inc., Joshi Hotel Group, LLC, LEGO Systems, Inc., Cricket Wireless LLC, Qdoba Restaurant Corporation, National General Holdings Corp., United Airlines, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, AT&T Mobility II, LLC, Accor Hotels & Resorts (Maryland) LLC, Accor Management US Inc., WB Games Boston Inc., Warner Brothers Advanced Media Services Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., AutoNation, Inc., Cornerstone Brands, Inc., AT&T Services, Inc., White Lodging Services Corporation, OnStar, LLC, Loews Hotels Holding Corporation, Telepictures Productions Inc., Mountain Standard Group, LLC, HBO Digital Services, Inc., Ingram Micro Inc., Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc., HBO Retail Ventures, Inc., DIRECTV, LLC, Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC, Heart of America Management, L.L.C., Fairmont Hotel Management L.P., CarMax, Inc., Marriott International, Inc., Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, Host Hotels & Resorts, L.P., Caleres, Inc., Auro Hotels Management, LLC, Flynn Restaurant Group LP, Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc., Interstate Hotels & Resorts, Inc., Bridgestone Americas, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - T, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 7/20/2019) Modified on 7/24/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/20/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cornerstone Brands, Inc. is a litigant