This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/08/2021 at 08:29:05 (UTC).

ACCIUS et al v. SP Plus Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 01/07/2021 ACCIUS filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against SP Plus Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Roy K. Altman and Patrick M. Hunt. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:21-CV-60047

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Roy K. Altman

Referral Judge

Patrick M. Hunt

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jean Altidor

CARYL JOSEPH

ERNST VIRGILE

ADAMO ACCIUS

ROMENA CEUS

TAMARA TOUSSAINT

Willy Saintil

RUTH PAUL

SARAPHINA PIERRE ANDRE

JIMMY PETIT-FRERE

Eriles Maxean

Jean Emmanuel Pierre-Louis

Assade Vedrine

WILFRED SAINT LOUIS

VANESSA JOSEPH

KERLANDE THELEMERQUE

Evens Hilaire

Defendants

Baggage Airline Guest Services, Inc.

SP Plus Corporation

Baggage Airline Guest Services, Inc. a Florida Corporation doing business as BAGS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Peter Michael Hoogerwoerd

Attorney at Remer & Georges-Pierre, PLLC

44 West Flager Street, Suite 2200

Miami, FL 33130

Defendant Attorneys

Vanessa Patel

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins

100 North Tampa Street, Suite 3600

Tampa, FL 33602

Jennifer Monrose Moore

Attorney at Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart PC

100 North Tampa Street, Suite 3600

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

#18

#17

#16

#15

#14

#13

#9

#8

#7

6 #1

Summon(s)

#6

#5

#4

#3

1 #3

Summon(s)

1 #2

Summon(s)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Plaintiff's NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Selected/Added Scott J. Silverman as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for 3/23/2021 at 10:00 a.m.. (Hoogerwoerd, Peter) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE by Baggage Airline Guest Services, Inc., Baggage Airline Guest Services, Inc.(a Florida Corporation ), SP Plus Corporation re #13 Order, of Parties' Early Resolution Plan in Compliance with the Court's Order & Request for Short Extension of Time to Finalize (Moore, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates / CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS by Baggage Airline Guest Services, Inc., Baggage Airline Guest Services, Inc.(a Florida Corporation ), SP Plus Corporation (Patel, Vanessa) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Baggage Airline Guest Services, Inc., Baggage Airline Guest Services, Inc.(a Florida Corporation ), SP Plus Corporation (Patel, Vanessa) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Joint Scheduling Report,certificates of interested parties and corporate disclosure statements due by 3/18/2021 Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 2/21/2021. See attached document for full details. (mee) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER. By February 24, 2021, the parties shall schedule either an informal settlement conference, a formal settlement conference with Magistrate Judge Hunt,1 or a mediation. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 2/21/2021. See attached document for full details. (mee) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • Docket(#12) PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Roy K. Altman: Miscellaneous Hearing held on 2/19/2021. Total time in court: 0 hour(s) : 15 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Peter Michael Hoogerwoerd, Jennifer Monrose Moore, Court Reporter: Francine Salopek, 954-769-5686 / Francine_Salopek@flsd.uscourts.gov. (mpt) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • Docket(#11) PAPERLESS NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 2/19/2021 10:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Roy K. Altman. The Hearing will be held via Zoom videoconference. Meeting ID: 160 817 2249 Password: 7777 (mpt) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #9 the Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. The Defendants shall file a responsive pleading by April 12, 2021. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 2/5/2021. (mpt) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by Baggage Airline Guest Services, Inc., Baggage Airline Guest Services, Inc.(a Florida Corporation ), SP Plus Corporation. (Moore, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Monrose Moore on behalf of Baggage Airline Guest Services, Inc., Baggage Airline Guest Services, Inc.(a Florida Corporation ), SP Plus Corporation. Attorney Jennifer Monrose Moore added to party Baggage Airline Guest Services, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jennifer Monrose Moore added to party Baggage Airline Guest Services, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jennifer Monrose Moore added to party SP Plus Corporation(pty:dft). (Moore, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Baggage Airline Guest Services, Inc.(mee) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by ADAMO ACCIUS, Jean Altidor, ROMENA CEUS, Evens Hilaire, CARYL JOSEPH, VANESSA JOSEPH, Eriles Maxean, RUTH PAUL, JIMMY PETIT-FRERE, SARAPHINA PIERRE ANDRE, Jean Emmanuel Pierre-Louis, WILFRED SAINT LOUIS, Willy Saintil, KERLANDE THELEMERQUE, TAMARA TOUSSAINT, ERNST VIRGILE, Assade Vedrine, Baggage Airline Guest Services, Inc. re #3 Summons Issued (Attachments: #1 Summon(s)) (Hoogerwoerd, Peter) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER IN CASES WITH MULTIPLE PLAINTIFFS AND MULTIPLE DEFENDANTS. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 1/12/2021. See attached document for full details. (mee) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER IN CASES WITH MULTIPLE PLAINTIFFS AND MULTIPLE DEFENDANTS. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 1/12/2021. See attached document for full details. (wc) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Baggage Airline Guest Services, Inc., SP Plus Corporation. (mee) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman and Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mee) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number BFLSDC-14173677, filed by RUTH PAUL, Willy Saintil, ERNST VIRGILE, Jean Altidor, ADAMO ACCIUS, Assade Vedrine, Evens Hilaire, Eriles Maxean, ROMENA CEUS, WILFRED SAINT LOUIS, TAMARA TOUSSAINT, JIMMY PETIT-FRERE, SARAPHINA PIERRE ANDRE, KERLANDE THELEMERQUE, CARYL JOSEPH, Jean Emmanuel Pierre-Louis, VANESSA JOSEPH. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s))(Hoogerwoerd, Peter) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Baggage Airline Guest Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where SP Plus Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VANESSA A PATEL

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JENNIFER MONROSE MOORE