This case was last updated from PACER on 12/13/2019 at 11:26:50 (UTC).

Accident Insurance Company, Inc. v. Kettley Trucking, INC., et al

Case Summary

On 10/14/2019 Accident Insurance Company, Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Kettley Trucking, INC . This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Daniel P. Jordan, III and F. Keith Ball. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00730

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mississippi Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Daniel P. Jordan, III

Referral Judge

F. Keith Ball

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Accident Insurance Company, Inc.

Defendants

AmFed National Insurance Company,

Alex Mayberry

Cottonport Hardwoods, LLC,

747 Trucking, LLC,

Kettley Trucking, INC.,

B.L.C. Trucking, Inc.

Kettley Trucking, Inc.

Cottonport Hardwoods, LLC

747 Trucking, LLC

Louisiana Loggers Self-Insured Fund

AmFed National Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew T. Biggers

Attorney at DEUTSCH KERRIGAN, LLP - New Orleans

755 Magazine St.

New Orleans, LA 70130-3672

Lawrence M. Quinlivan

Attorney at DEUTSCH KERRIGAN, LLP - Gulfport

2510 14Th Street, Suite 1001

Gulfport, MS 39501

Defendant Attorneys

Scott Timothy Ellzey

Attorney at PHELPS DUNBAR, LLP - Gulfport

2602 13Th Street, Suite 300

Gulfport, MS 39501

Adam B. Harris

Attorney at PHELPS DUNBAR, LLP - Gulfport

2602 13Th Street, Suite 300

Gulfport, MS 39501

Joseph A. O'Connell

Attorney at BRYAN NELSON, PA - Hattiesburg

109 Fairfield Drive, P. O. Drawer 18109 (39404)

Hattiesburg, MS 39402

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Adam B. Harris on behalf of B.L.C. Trucking, Inc. (Harris, Adam) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#10

(#10) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by B.L.C. Trucking, Inc. (Ellzey, Scott) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence M. Quinlivan on behalf of Accident Insurance Company, Inc. (Quinlivan, Lawrence) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#8

(#8) Summons Reissued as to AmFed National Insurance Company. (LAT) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#7

(#7) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Amended Complaint, by Louisiana Loggers Self-Insured Fund (O'Connell, Joseph) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#6

(#6) Summons Returned Unexecuted by Accident Insurance Company, Inc. as to AmFed National Insurance Company,. (Biggers, Matthew) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Accident Insurance Company, Inc.. B.L.C. Trucking, Inc. served on 11/20/2019, answer due 12/11/2019. (Biggers, Matthew) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Accident Insurance Company, Inc.. Louisiana Loggers Self-Insured Fund served on 11/18/2019, answer due 12/9/2019. (Biggers, Matthew) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to 747 Trucking, LLC, AmFed National Insurance Company, B.L.C. Trucking, Inc., Cottonport Hardwoods, LLC, Kettley Trucking, INC., Louisiana Loggers Self-Insured Fund, Alex Mayberry. (LAT) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

2 #5

Exhibit 5 - Rescission Letter

2 #4

Exhibit 4 - 2017 Audit

2 #3

Exhibit 3 - 2016 Audit

2 #2

Exhibit 2 - Application

2 #1

Exhibit 1 - Renewal Policy

#2

(#2) AMENDED COMPLAINT against 747 Trucking, LLC,, AmFed National Insurance Company,, Cottonport Hardwoods, LLC,, Kettley Trucking, INC.,, Alex Mayberry, B.L.C. Trucking, Inc., Louisiana Loggers Self-Insured Fund, filed by Accident Insurance Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Renewal Policy, #2 Exhibit 2 - Application, #3 Exhibit 3 - 2016 Audit, #4 Exhibit 4 - 2017 Audit, #5 Exhibit 5 - Rescission Letter)(Biggers, Matthew) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit 4-2017 Audit

1 #3

Exhibit 3-2016 Audit

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Adam B. Harris on behalf of B.L.C. Trucking, Inc. (Harris, Adam) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ONLY ORDER. The Court has reviewed the Motion #10 for Additional Time filed by B.L.C. Trucking, Inc., and will treat the motion as an urgent and necessitous matter. Therefore, any response in opposition to B.L.C. Trucking's Motion #10 for Additional Time is due on or before 12/13/2019. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 12/11/2019. (dcw) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by B.L.C. Trucking, Inc. (Ellzey, Scott) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence M. Quinlivan on behalf of Accident Insurance Company, Inc. (Quinlivan, Lawrence) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT-ONLY ORDER. The Court has reviewed the Motion #7 for Additional Time filed by Louisiana Loggers Self-Insured Fund ("Louisiana Loggers") and will treat the motion as an urgent and necessitous matter. Therefore, any response in opposition to Louisiana Loggers' Motion #7 for Additional Time is due on or before 12/12/2019. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 12/9/2019. (dcw) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Summons Reissued as to AmFed National Insurance Company. (LAT) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Amended Complaint, by Louisiana Loggers Self-Insured Fund (O'Connell, Joseph) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Returned Unexecuted by Accident Insurance Company, Inc. as to AmFed National Insurance Company,. (Biggers, Matthew) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Accident Insurance Company, Inc.. B.L.C. Trucking, Inc. served on 11/20/2019, answer due 12/11/2019. (Biggers, Matthew) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Accident Insurance Company, Inc.. Louisiana Loggers Self-Insured Fund served on 11/18/2019, answer due 12/9/2019. (Biggers, Matthew) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to 747 Trucking, LLC, AmFed National Insurance Company, B.L.C. Trucking, Inc., Cottonport Hardwoods, LLC, Kettley Trucking, INC., Louisiana Loggers Self-Insured Fund, Alex Mayberry. (LAT) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) AMENDED COMPLAINT against 747 Trucking, LLC,, AmFed National Insurance Company,, Cottonport Hardwoods, LLC,, Kettley Trucking, INC.,, Alex Mayberry, B.L.C. Trucking, Inc., Louisiana Loggers Self-Insured Fund, filed by Accident Insurance Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Renewal Policy, #2 Exhibit 2 - Application, #3 Exhibit 3 - 2016 Audit, #4 Exhibit 4 - 2017 Audit, #5 Exhibit 5 - Rescission Letter)(Biggers, Matthew) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against 747 Trucking, LLC, AmFed National Insurance Company, Cottonport Hardwoods, LLC, Kettley Trucking, INC., Alex Mayberry ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4113344) filed by Accident Insurance Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Renewal Policy, #2 Exhibit 2-Application, #3 Exhibit 3-2016 Audit, #4 Exhibit 4-2017 Audit, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(PG) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less