This case was last updated from PACER on 09/18/2021 at 09:16:17 (UTC).

Access 4 All Incorporated et al v. Intervest Kendall LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/20/2021 Access 4 All Incorporated filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Intervest Kendall LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is James Lawrence King. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-22586

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James Lawrence King

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Access 4 All Incorporated

Juan Carlos Gil

Defendants

Intervest Kendall LLC

Fedex Office and Print Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Anthony Joseph Perez

Attorney at Garcia-Menocal & Perez, P.L.

4937 Sw 74Th Court, No. 3

Miami, FL 33155

Beverly Virues

Attorney at Law Office of Garcia-Menocal & Prez, P.L.

Defendant Attorneys

Jeffrey C. Roth

Attorney at Roth & Scholl

866 S Dixie Highway

Coral Gables, FL 33146

Kelly Marie Pena

Attorney at Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.

9130 S. Dadeland Boulevard, Suite 1625

Miami, FL 33156

 

Court Documents

13 #1

Text of Proposed Order

13 #13

Main Document

#12

(#12) ORDER Granting #11 unopposed Motion to Amend/Correct. Clerks Notice: Filer must separately re-file the amended pleading pursuant to Local Rule 15.1, unless otherwise ordered by the Judge. Responses due by 10/19/2021 Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 9/3/2021. See attached document for full details. (jw) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

11 #1

Text of Proposed Order

11 #11

Main Document

#10

(#10) ORDER Granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document Intervest Kendall LLC. Answer due 9/15/2021. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 8/23/2021. See attached document for full details. (jw) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

9 #1

Text of Proposed Order

9 #9

Main Document

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document Fedex Office and Print Services, Inc.. Answer due 9/15/2021. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 8/16/2021. See attached document for full details. (ch1) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

7 #1

Text of Proposed Order

7 #7

Main Document

#6

(#6) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Access 4 All Incorporated, Juan Carlos Gil. Intervest Kendall LLC served on 7/30/2021, answer due 8/20/2021. (Perez, Anthony) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE by Juan Carlos Gil re #4 Order NOTICE OF ESTIMATED LENGTH OF TRIAL (Perez, Anthony) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

#4

(#4) ORDER Directing Party to File Estimate Length of Trial re #1 Complaint, filed by Access 4 All Incorporated, Juan Carlos Gil Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 7/22/2021. See attached document for full details. (jw) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Fedex Office and Print Services, Inc., Intervest Kendall LLC. (scn) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER Granting #13 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document Fedex Office and Print Services, Inc.. Answer due 9/29/2021. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 9/9/2021. See attached document for full details. (jw) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by Fedex Office and Print Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pena, Kelly) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER Granting #11 unopposed Motion to Amend/Correct. Clerks Notice: Filer must separately re-file the amended pleading pursuant to Local Rule 15.1, unless otherwise ordered by the Judge. Responses due by 10/19/2021 Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 9/3/2021. See attached document for full details. (jw) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION to Amend/Correct #10 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer, by Intervest Kendall LLC. Responses due by 9/16/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Roth, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER Granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document Intervest Kendall LLC. Answer due 9/15/2021. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 8/23/2021. See attached document for full details. (jw) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by Intervest Kendall LLC. Attorney Jeffrey C. Roth added to party Intervest Kendall LLC (pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Roth, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document Fedex Office and Print Services, Inc.. Answer due 9/15/2021. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 8/16/2021. See attached document for full details. (ch1) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by Fedex Office and Print Services, Inc.. Attorney Kelly Marie Pena added to party Fedex Office and Print Services, Inc. (pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pena, Kelly) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Access 4 All Incorporated, Juan Carlos Gil. Intervest Kendall LLC served on 7/30/2021, answer due 8/20/2021. (Perez, Anthony) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE by Juan Carlos Gil re #4 Order NOTICE OF ESTIMATED LENGTH OF TRIAL (Perez, Anthony) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER Directing Party to File Estimate Length of Trial re #1 Complaint, filed by Access 4 All Incorporated, Juan Carlos Gil Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 7/22/2021. See attached document for full details. (jw) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Fedex Office and Print Services, Inc., Intervest Kendall LLC. (scn) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge James Lawrence King. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (scn) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Fedex Office and Print Services, Inc., Intervest Kendall LLC. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14861042, filed by Access 4 All Incorporated, Juan Carlos Gil. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s))(Perez, Anthony) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Access 4 All, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where FEDEX OFFICE AND PRINT SERVICES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeffrey C. Roth

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kelly Marie Pena