This case was last updated from PACER on 07/29/2019 at 07:15:40 (UTC).

Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company v. Red Apple Lounge Inc et al

Case Summary

On 05/30/2019 Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Red Apple Lounge Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gilbert C. Sison and Staci M. Yandle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00567

  • Filing Date:

    05/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Gilbert C. Sison

Presiding Judge

Staci M. Yandle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company

Defendants

Red Apple Lounge

Main Moore

Terrell M. Culpepper

Abdul Hakim Muhammad

Red Apple Lounge Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kyle C. Oehmke

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP-Belleville

521 West Main Street, Suite 300, P.O.Box 509

Belleville, IL 62220

John E. DeLascio

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP - Chicago

151 N. Franklin Street, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Defendant Attorney

Kevin Andrew Hoerner

Attorney at Becker, Hoerner & Ysursa, P.C.

5111 West Main St.

Belleville, IL 62226

 

Court Documents

#1

(#16) Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, for Declaratory Judgment by Red Apple Lounge Inc.(Hoerner, Kevin) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #1

Exhibit 1

1 #2

Exhibit 2

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle C. Oehmke on behalf of Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company (Oehmke, Kyle) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

#3

(#3) EXHIBIT by Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company. Exhibit to #1 Complaint, for Declaratory Judgment. (Oehmke, Kyle) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

#4

(#4) Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Staci M. Yandle and Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison assigned. All future documents must bear case number 19-cv-567-SMY-GCS. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (Attachments: #1 consent brochure)(cds) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

4 #1

consent brochure

#5

(#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Attorney, John E. DeLascio on 6/5/2019. (cds)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 06/05/2019)

#23

(#23) Summons Requested. (Oehmke, Kyle) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

#22

(#22) Summons Reissued as to Main Moore, Abdul Hakim Muhammad. (cds) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

#21

(#21) ORDER: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 8/21/2019 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison. Instructions for the conference call are as follows: (1) call toll-free, 888-273-3658; (2) when prompted, enter the seven-digit Access Code: 5699758; (3) when prompted, enter the four-digit Security Code: 0567. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison on 7/17/2019. (dmw2) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

#20

(#20) Summons Requested. (Oehmke, Kyle) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

#19

(#19) Summons Requested. (Oehmke, Kyle) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

#16

(#16) Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, for Declaratory Judgment by Red Apple Lounge Inc.(Hoerner, Kevin) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

#18

(#18) ANSWER TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES re #16 by Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company. (Oehmke, Kyle) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

17 #1

Consent to Magistrate Judge

#17

(#17) CJRA TRACK B assigned: Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/26/2020 at 10:30 AM and Bench Trial set for 9/8/2020 at 9:00 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge Staci M. Yandle. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Magistrate Judge)(slh) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) Summons Requested. (Oehmke, Kyle) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) Summons Reissued as to Main Moore, Abdul Hakim Muhammad. (cds) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) ORDER: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 8/21/2019 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison. Instructions for the conference call are as follows: (1) call toll-free, 888-273-3658; (2) when prompted, enter the seven-digit Access Code: 5699758; (3) when prompted, enter the four-digit Security Code: 0567. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison on 7/17/2019. (dmw2) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) Summons Requested. (Oehmke, Kyle) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Summons Requested. (Oehmke, Kyle) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ANSWER TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES re #16 by Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company. (Oehmke, Kyle) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) CJRA TRACK B assigned: Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/26/2020 at 10:30 AM and Bench Trial set for 9/8/2020 at 9:00 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge Staci M. Yandle. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Magistrate Judge)(slh) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, for Declaratory Judgment by Red Apple Lounge Inc.(Hoerner, Kevin) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Andrew Hoerner on behalf of Red Apple Lounge Inc (Hoerner, Kevin) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company. Red Apple Lounge Inc served on 6/15/2019, answer due 7/8/2019. (Oehmke, Kyle) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Summons Requested. (Oehmke, Kyle) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Summons Requested. (Oehmke, Kyle) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Summons Requested. (Oehmke, Kyle) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Summons Requested. (Oehmke, Kyle) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Attorney, John E. DeLascio on 6/5/2019. (cds)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney John E. DeLascio $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-3896787 by on behalf of Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company. (DeLascio, John) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Staci M. Yandle and Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison assigned. All future documents must bear case number 19-cv-567-SMY-GCS. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (Attachments: #1 consent brochure)(cds) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) EXHIBIT by Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company. Exhibit to #1 Complaint, for Declaratory Judgment. (Oehmke, Kyle) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle C. Oehmke on behalf of Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company (Oehmke, Kyle) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-3893694.), filed by Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Oehmke, Kyle) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.