This case was last updated from PACER on 09/12/2020 at 14:48:35 (UTC).

Academy of Television Arts and Sciences v. Julien's Auctions LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/14/2020 Academy of Television Arts and Sciences filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Julien's Auctions LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Consuelo B. Marshall and Alicia G. Rosenberg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-06272

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Consuelo B. Marshall

Referral Judge

Alicia G. Rosenberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Academy of Television Arts and Sciences

Defendants

DOES 1 through 10

Juliens Auctions LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Eric J Bakewell

Attorney at Venable LLP

2049 Century Park East Suite 2100

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Matthew J Busch

Attorney at Venable LLP

2049 Century Park East Suite 2300

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Melissa Caren Rose McLaughlin

Attorney at Venable LLP

2049 Century Park East Suite 2300

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Defendant Attorneys

Nathaniel Michael Carle

Attorney at Raines Feldman LLP

1800 Avenue Of The Stars 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Robert M Shore

Attorney at Raines Feldman LLP

1800 Avenue Of The Stars, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Laith D Mosely

Attorney at Raines Feldman LLP

1800 Avenue Of The Stars 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Miles J Feldman

Attorney at Raines Fledman LLP

1800 Avenue Of The Stars 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

#30

(#30) MINUTES IN CHAMBERS-ORDER AND NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: Counsel are hereby notified that pursuant to the Judge's directive, the motion to extend time to file answer #27 is hereby denied as moot. IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

#29

(#29) ORDER ON UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINTFOR COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT; CONVERSION; REPLEVIN; AND DECLARATORY RELIEF #26 by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Juliens Auctions, LLCs Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint for Copyright Infringement; Conversion; Replevin; and Declaratory Relief is GRANTED. Defendant Juliens Auctions, LLCs new deadline to respond to Plaintiffs Complaint is September 24, 2020. (shb) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

#28

(#28) ORDER ON UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT; CONVERSION; REPLEVIN; AND DECLARATORY RELIEF #26 , #27 by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: IT IS HEREBY ORDERD that Defendant Juliens Auctions, LLCs Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint for Copyright Infringement; Conversion; Replevin; and Declaratory Relief is GRANTED. Defendant Juliens Auctions, LLCs new deadline to respond to Plaintiffs Complaint is September 24, 2020. (shb) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

#27

(#27) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer to 9/24/2020 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Juliens Auctions LLC. (Mosely, Laith) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

26 #1

Proposed Order

#26

(#26) Second STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Juliens Auctions LLC answer now due 9/24/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Juliens Auctions LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mosely, Laith) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

7 #5

Proposed Order

7 #4

Memorandum Request for Judicial Notice

7 #1

Declaration of Eric Bakewell ISO Ex Parte Application

#7

(#7) EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Order to Show Cause Why Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue filed by Plaintiff Academy of Television Arts & Sciences, a California nonprofit corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eric Bakewell ISO Ex Parte Application, #2 Declaration of John Leverence ISO Ex Parte, #3 Declaration of Maury McIntyre ISO Ex Parte, #4 Memorandum Request for Judicial Notice, #5 Proposed Order) (Bakewell, Eric) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

#6

(#6) Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Academy of Television Arts & Sciences, a California nonprofit corporation (Bakewell, Eric) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

#5

(#5) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Academy of Television Arts & Sciences, a California nonprofit corporation. (Bakewell, Eric) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

#4

(#4) Request to Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint filed by Plaintiff Academy of Television Arts & Sciences, a California nonprofit corporation (Bakewell, Eric) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Academy of Television Arts & Sciences, a California nonprofit corporation (Bakewell, Eric) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Academy of Television Arts & Sciences, a California nonprofit corporation. (Bakewell, Eric) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1

#1

(#25) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Juliens Auctions LLC answer now due 8/27/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Juliens Auctions LLC.(Mosely, Laith) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) MINUTES IN CHAMBERS-ORDER AND NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: Counsel are hereby notified that pursuant to the Judge's directive, the motion to extend time to file answer #27 is hereby denied as moot. IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) ORDER ON UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINTFOR COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT; CONVERSION; REPLEVIN; AND DECLARATORY RELIEF #26 by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Juliens Auctions, LLCs Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint for Copyright Infringement; Conversion; Replevin; and Declaratory Relief is GRANTED. Defendant Juliens Auctions, LLCs new deadline to respond to Plaintiffs Complaint is September 24, 2020. (shb) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) ORDER ON UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT; CONVERSION; REPLEVIN; AND DECLARATORY RELIEF #26 , #27 by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: IT IS HEREBY ORDERD that Defendant Juliens Auctions, LLCs Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint for Copyright Infringement; Conversion; Replevin; and Declaratory Relief is GRANTED. Defendant Juliens Auctions, LLCs new deadline to respond to Plaintiffs Complaint is September 24, 2020. (shb) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer to 9/24/2020 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Juliens Auctions LLC. (Mosely, Laith) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Second STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Juliens Auctions LLC answer now due 9/24/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Juliens Auctions LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mosely, Laith) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Juliens Auctions LLC answer now due 8/27/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Juliens Auctions LLC.(Mosely, Laith) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall, re Stipulation for Order, #20 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. The Parties Stipulation (Docket No. 20) is approved. 2. The Temporary Restraining Order granted by the Court on July 16, 2016 (Docket No. 18) relating to the sale, auction, or transfer of the 1971, 1972, 1973, and 1975 Valerie Harper Emmy Statuettes identified in the Television Academys request for Temporary Restraining Order (the Harper Statuettes) is converted to a Preliminary Injunction. 3. Juliens and its officers, agents, servants, employees, attorneys, and all those working in concert with Juliens are enjoined from reproducing, distributing, displaying, promoting, offering for sale, selling, auctioning, transferring, or advertising the Harper Statuettes during the pendency of this action. 4. Any bond requirement (including the requirement imposed by the Court as part of its Order granting the Television Academys request for Temporary Restraining Order (Docket No. 18)) is waived. 5. The briefing schedule set forth in the Courts Order granting the Television Academys request for Temporary Restraining Order (Docket No. 18) and the July 30, 2020 order to show cause hearing relating to the Television Academys request for preliminary injunction are vacated. The Order to Show cause hearing set for July 30, 2020 is vacated and off calendar. IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) UNDERTAKING BOND re TRO in the amount of $15,000.00 posted by Plaintiff Academy of Television Arts and Sciences tr BOND No. 3478190. SureTec Insurance Company. (shb) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Academy of Television Arts and Sciences, upon Defendant Juliens Auctions LLC served on 7/16/2020, answer due 8/6/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Amy McLaren, Intake Specialist, CT Corporation, Registered Agent, authorized to accept service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Bakewell, Eric) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE filed by Plaintiff Academy of Television Arts and Sciences. Notice of Posting of Bond By Plaintiff Academy of Television Arts & Sciences (Bakewell, Eric) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. It controls this case and may differ in some respects from the Local Rules. (ys) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Juliens Auctions LLC. (jtil) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (jtil) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Order to Show Cause Why Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue filed by Plaintiff Academy of Television Arts & Sciences, a California nonprofit corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eric Bakewell ISO Ex Parte Application, #2 Declaration of John Leverence ISO Ex Parte, #3 Declaration of Maury McIntyre ISO Ex Parte, #4 Memorandum Request for Judicial Notice, #5 Proposed Order) (Bakewell, Eric) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Academy of Television Arts & Sciences, a California nonprofit corporation (Bakewell, Eric) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Academy of Television Arts & Sciences, a California nonprofit corporation. (Bakewell, Eric) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request to Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint filed by Plaintiff Academy of Television Arts & Sciences, a California nonprofit corporation (Bakewell, Eric) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Academy of Television Arts & Sciences, a California nonprofit corporation (Bakewell, Eric) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Academy of Television Arts & Sciences, a California nonprofit corporation. (Bakewell, Eric) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27208800 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Academy of Television Arts & Sciences, a California nonprofit corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2) (Attorney Eric J Bakewell added to party Academy of Television Arts & Sciences, a California nonprofit corporation(pty:pla))(Bakewell, Eric) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less