This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 09:58:29 (UTC).

Academy of Allergy & Asthma in Primary Care et al v. Amerigroup Tennessee Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 Academy of Allergy Asthma in Primary Care filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Amerigroup Tennessee Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Harry S Mattice, Jr and Debra C Poplin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00180

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Harry S Mattice, Jr

Referral Judge

Debra C Poplin

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Academy of Allergy & Asthma in Primary Care

United Biologics, LLC

Defendants

Ned DeLozier

Allergy Associates, P.A.

Amerigroup Tennessee Inc.

Volunteer State Health Plan, Inc.

Physicians' Medical Enterprises LLC

BlueCross BlueShield of Tennessee, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Paige W Mills

Attorney at Bass, Berry & Sims, PLC (Nashville)

150 3Rd Avenue South, Suite 2800

Nashville, TN 37201

Lucas R Smith

Attorney at Bass, Berry & Sims, PLC (Nashville)

150 3Rd Avenue South, Suite 2800

Nashville, TN 37201

Dillon J Ferguson

Attorney at Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

401 Congress Avenue, Suite 1700

Austin, TX 78701

R. Casey Low

Attorney at Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

401 Congress Avenue, Suite 1700

Austin, TX 78701

Defendant Attorneys

Debra Hewetson Dermody

Attorney at Reed Smith, LLP (PA)

225 Fifth Avenue, Suite 1200

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Abraham J Souza

Attorney at Reed Smith, LLP (IL)

10 South Wacker Drive, 40Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60606-7507

Brian F Hendricks

Attorney at Reed Smith, LLP (IL)

10 South Wacker Drive, 40Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60606-7507

Douglas G Hewitt

Attorney at Reed Smith, LLP (IL)

10 South Wacker Drive, 40Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60606-7507

Roger W Dickson

Attorney at Miller & Martin, PLLC (Chattanooga)

832 Georgia Avenue, 1200 Volunteer Building

Chattanooga, TN 37402

Martin J Bishop

Attorney at Reed Smith, LLP (IL)

10 South Wacker Drive, 40Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60606-7507

Kyle W Eiselstein

Attorney at Miller & Martin, PLLC (Chattanooga)

832 Georgia Avenue, 1200 Volunteer Building

Chattanooga, TN 37402

William Jordan

Attorney at Alston & Bird, LLP (GA)

1201 W. Peachtree Street Ne, Suite 4900

Atlanta, GA 30309-3424

Jahnisa T Loadholt

Attorney at Alston & Bird, LLP (GA)

1201 W. Peachtree Street Ne, Suite 4900

Atlanta, GA 30309-3424

Marc H Harwell

Attorney at Leitner Williams Dooley Napolitan, PLLC (Chattanooga)

200 W. Martin Luther King Boulevard, Tallan Building, Suite 500

Chattanooga, TN 37402

Matthew L.J.D. Dowell

Attorney at Alston & Bird, LLP (GA)

1201 W. Peachtree Street Ne, Suite 4900

Atlanta, GA 30309-3424

Wade P Miller

Attorney at Alston & Bird, LLP (GA)

1201 W. Peachtree Street Ne, Suite 4900

Atlanta, GA 30309-3424

11 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

28 #1

Supplement Certificate of Good Standing

#28

(#28) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of William Jordan ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4022170.) by BlueCross BlueShield of Tennessee, Inc., Volunteer State Health Plan, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing)(Harwell, Marc) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

27 #1

Supplement Certificate of Good Standing

#27

(#27) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Wade Miller ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4022164.) by BlueCross BlueShield of Tennessee, Inc., Volunteer State Health Plan, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing)(Harwell, Marc) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

26 #1

Supplement Certificate of Good Standing

#26

(#26) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Matthew Dowell ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4022144.) by BlueCross BlueShield of Tennessee, Inc., Volunteer State Health Plan, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing)(Harwell, Marc) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

25 #1

Supplement Certificate of Good Standing

#25

(#25) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jahnisa Loadholt ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4022105.) by BlueCross BlueShield of Tennessee, Inc., Volunteer State Health Plan, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing)(Harwell, Marc) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

#20

Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #23 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Abraham J. Souza ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4004835.) filed by Amerigroup Tennessee Inc., #19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Martin J. Bishop ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4004821.) filed by Amerigroup Tennessee Inc., #21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Debra H. Dermody ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4004828.) filed by Amerigroup Tennessee Inc., #20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Douglass G. Hewitt ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4004824.) filed by Amerigroup Tennessee Inc., #22 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Brian F. Hendricks ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4004830.) filed by Amerigroup Tennessee Inc. (ABF) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

2 #5

Summons Delozier

1 #7

Other Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Summons Volunteer State Health

1 #5

Summons Physicians' Medical

1 #4

Summons DeLozier

1 #3

Summons BlueCross

1 #2

Summons Amerigroup

1 #1

Summons Allergy Associates

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3975618.), filed by United Biologics, LLC, Academy of Allergy & Asthma in Primary Care. (Attachments: #1 Summons Allergy Associates, #2 Summons Amerigroup, #3 Summons BlueCross, #4 Summons DeLozier, #5 Summons Physicians' Medical, #6 Summons Volunteer State Health, #7 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(Mills, Paige) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #25 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jahnisa Loadholt ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4022105.) filed by Volunteer State Health Plan, Inc., BlueCross BlueShield of Tennessee, Inc., #28 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of William Jordan ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4022170.) filed by Volunteer State Health Plan, Inc., BlueCross BlueShield of Tennessee, Inc., #27 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Wade Miller ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4022164.) filed by Volunteer State Health Plan, Inc., BlueCross BlueShield of Tennessee, Inc., #26 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Matthew Dowell ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4022144.) filed by Volunteer State Health Plan, Inc., BlueCross BlueShield of Tennessee, Inc. (ABF) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of William Jordan ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4022170.) by BlueCross BlueShield of Tennessee, Inc., Volunteer State Health Plan, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing)(Harwell, Marc) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Wade Miller ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4022164.) by BlueCross BlueShield of Tennessee, Inc., Volunteer State Health Plan, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing)(Harwell, Marc) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Matthew Dowell ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4022144.) by BlueCross BlueShield of Tennessee, Inc., Volunteer State Health Plan, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing)(Harwell, Marc) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jahnisa Loadholt ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4022105.) by BlueCross BlueShield of Tennessee, Inc., Volunteer State Health Plan, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing)(Harwell, Marc) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) ORDER granting #19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form; granting #20 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form; granting #21 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form; granting #22 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form; granting #23 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 6/21/2019. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court). (AGA) Modified on 6/24/2019 to indicate c/m to Abraham Souza, Brian Hendricks, Casey Low, Debra Dermody, Douglas Hewitt and Martin Bishop (ABF). (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #23 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Abraham J. Souza ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4004835.) filed by Amerigroup Tennessee Inc., #19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Martin J. Bishop ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4004821.) filed by Amerigroup Tennessee Inc., #21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Debra H. Dermody ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4004828.) filed by Amerigroup Tennessee Inc., #20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Douglass G. Hewitt ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4004824.) filed by Amerigroup Tennessee Inc., #22 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Brian F. Hendricks ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4004830.) filed by Amerigroup Tennessee Inc. (ABF) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Abraham J. Souza ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4004835.) by Amerigroup Tennessee Inc.. (Eiselstein, Kyle) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Brian F. Hendricks ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4004830.) by Amerigroup Tennessee Inc.. (Eiselstein, Kyle) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Debra H. Dermody ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4004828.) by Amerigroup Tennessee Inc.. (Eiselstein, Kyle) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United Biologics, LLC, Academy of Allergy & Asthma in Primary Care. BlueCross BlueShield of Tennessee, Inc. waiver sent on 5/22/2019. (Mills, Paige) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on May 20, 2019. (AYB) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on May 20, 2019. (AYB) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on May 20, 2019. (AYB) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificates of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by Academy of Allergy & Asthma in Primary Care and United Biologics, LLC. (AYB) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) as to Casey Low and Dillon Ferguson (AYB) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) as to Lucas Smith (AYB) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Allergy Associates, P.A., Amerigroup Tennessee Inc., BlueCross BlueShield of Tennessee, Inc., Ned DeLozier, Physicians' Medical Enterprises LLC, Volunteer State Health Plan, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons Blue Cross, #2 Summons Volunteer State, #3 Summons Physicians' Medical, #4 Summons Allergy Associates, #5 Summons Delozier)(AYB) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (AYB) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3975618.), filed by United Biologics, LLC, Academy of Allergy & Asthma in Primary Care. (Attachments: #1 Summons Allergy Associates, #2 Summons Amerigroup, #3 Summons BlueCross, #4 Summons DeLozier, #5 Summons Physicians' Medical, #6 Summons Volunteer State Health, #7 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(Mills, Paige) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.