This case was last updated from PACER on 06/19/2020 at 08:39:48 (UTC).

ACA International v. Maura Healey

Case Summary

On 04/20/2020 ACA International filed a Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality lawsuit against Maura Healey. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard G. Stearns. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-10767

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Massachusetts District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard G. Stearns

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ACA International

Defendant

Maura Healey

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David M. Bizar

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw

World Trade Center East, Suite 300, Two Seaport Lane

Boston, MA 02210

Robert J. Carty, Jr.

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

700 Milam Street, Suite 1400

Houston, TX 77002

Defendant Attorneys

Eric A. Haskell

Attorney at Attorney General's Office

18Th Floor, One Ashburton Place

Boston, MA 02108

Jennifer E. Greaney

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General (MA)

20Th Floor, One Ashburton Place

Boston, MA 02108

 

Court Documents

#31

(#31) MOTION for Clarification re #28 Order on Motion for TRO (Unopposed by Defendant) by ACA International.(Bizar, David) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

#29

RESTRICTED

#28

(#28) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered granting #6 Motion for TRO (Zierk, Marsha) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

#26

(#26) Supplemental MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #6 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Maura Healey. (Haskell, Eric) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

#25

(#25) Supplemental MEMORANDUM in Support re #14 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , #6 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by ACA International. (Bizar, David) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

14 #2

Exhibit B (GAI Declaration)

14 #1

Exhibit A (ACA Declaration)

#14

(#25) Supplemental MEMORANDUM in Support re #14 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , #6 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by ACA International. (Bizar, David) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

#6

(#23) Second Notice of Supplemental Authorities re #6 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction #7 Memorandum of Law (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (CFPB Letter))(Bizar, David) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

2 #11

Category Form

2 #10

Civil Cover Sheet

2 #9

Exhibit I

2 #8

Exhibit H

2 #7

Exhibit G

2 #6

Exhibit F

2 #5

Exhibit E

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against Maura Healey, In Her Official Capacity as Massachusetts Attorney General Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8204223 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by ACA International. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Civil Cover Sheet, #11 Category Form)(Bizar, David) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

#1

(#1) Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet by ACA International. (Bizar, David) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

46 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #31 Motion for Clarification. The assented-to motion correctly interprets the Order as a grant of a temporary retraining order and the entry of a preliminary injunction. (Zierk, Marsha) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) MOTION for Clarification re #28 Order on Motion for TRO (Unopposed by Defendant) by ACA International.(Bizar, David) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • Docket(#30) NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Transcript of Motion Hearing for Temporary Restraining Order via Zoom Videoconference held on May 1, 2020, before Judge Richard G. Stearns. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: James Gibbons at jamesgibbonsrpr@gmail.com Redaction Request due 6/4/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/15/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/12/2020. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered granting #6 Motion for TRO (Zierk, Marsha) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Supplemental MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #6 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Maura Healey. (Haskell, Eric) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Supplemental MEMORANDUM in Support re #14 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , #6 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by ACA International. (Bizar, David) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Stearns: Motion Hearing held on 5/1/2020 re #6 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by ACA International. Court hears argument from the parties. The court takes the matter under advisement. (Court Reporter: James Gibbons at jamesgibbonsrpr@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Carty, Bizar for plaintiff; Haskell for the defendant) (Maynard, Timothy) Modified on 5/4/2020 to edit date (Maynard, Timothy). (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Opposition re #6 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Maura Healey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (blog post), #2 Affidavit of AAG Max Weinstein)(Haskell, Eric) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Second Notice of Supplemental Authorities re #6 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction #7 Memorandum of Law (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (CFPB Letter))(Bizar, David) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 04/21/2020
  • Docket(#9) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. ACA International's request for an expedited briefing schedule is ALLOWED. The Massachusetts Attorney General Maura Healey will respond to the Emergency Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order within ten days of proper service. Plaintiff will serve this Order on the Attorney General's office along with its Complaint and motion filings.(Zierk, Marsha) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketELECTRONIC NOTICE of Duplicate Filing Fee and Credit for Refund, for $400.00 paid on 04/20/2020, receipt number 0101-8204202. (Tran, Henry) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) EXHIBIT re #7 Memorandum in Support of Motion, Numbered Exhibits by ACA International. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (AG Regulation), #2 Exhibit 2 (AG Guidance), #3 Exhibit 3 (DOJ Statement of Interest))(Bizar, David) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Emergency MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by ACA International. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Bizar, David) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by ACA International.(Bizar, David) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Maura Healey. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Danieli, Chris) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Danieli, Chris) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ACA International. (Bizar, David) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against Maura Healey, In Her Official Capacity as Massachusetts Attorney General Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8204223 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by ACA International. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Civil Cover Sheet, #11 Category Form)(Bizar, David) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet by ACA International. (Bizar, David) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less