This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/19/2022 at 07:41:52 (UTC).

A.C. et al v. New York City Department of Education

Case Summary

On 05/20/2022 A C filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against New York City Department of Education. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Valerie E. Caproni. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-04182

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Valerie E. Caproni

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

A.C.

A.C. on behalf of his child A.C., a minor

Defendant

New York City Department of Education

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Irina Roller

Attorney at Law Offices of Irina Roller, PLLC

40 Wall Street, Suite 2508

Defendant Attorneys

Pasquale Viscusi

Attorney at New York City Law Department

100 Church Street

New York, NY 10007

Wynstelle Simone Nicholson

Attorney at New York City Law Department

100 Church Street

New York, NY 10007

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against New York City Department of Education. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26179018)Document filed by A.C., A.C. on behalf of his child A.C., a minor..(Roller, Irina) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

#2

(#2) FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NEW YORK CITY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by A.C., A.C. on behalf of his child A.C., a minor..(Roller, Irina) Modified on 5/23/2022 (gp). (Entered: 05/20/2022)

#3

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Roller, Irina) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NEW YORK CITY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by A.C., A.C. on behalf of his child A.C., a minor..(Roller, Irina) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE FOR CASES FILED UNDER 20 U.S.C. 1415(i)(3): Initial Conference set for 8/12/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 443, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 5/24/2022) (jca) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

#6

(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to New York City Department of Education. (sj) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

#7

(#7) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. New York City Department of Education served on 5/25/2022, answer due 6/15/2022. Service was accepted by serviceecf@law.nyc.gov. Service was made by email. Document filed by A.C.; A.C. on behalf of his child A.C., a minor..(Roller, Irina) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Wynstelle Simone Nicholson on behalf of New York City Department of Education..(Nicholson, Wynstelle) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

#9

(#9) FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer On Consent addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Simone Nicholson dated June14, 2022., FIRST LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference On Consent addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Simone Nicholson dated June14, 2022. Document filed by New York City Department of Education..(Nicholson, Wynstelle) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

#10

(#10) ORDER granting #9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #9 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer On Consent addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Simone Nicholson dated June14, 2022.FIRST LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference On Consent addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Simone Nicholson dated June14, 2022., #1 Complaint; granting #9 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application GRANTED. SO ORDERED. New York City Department of Education answer due 9/14/2022. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 6/14/2022) (tg) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

#11

(#11) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Pasquale Viscusi on behalf of New York City Department of Education..(Viscusi, Pasquale) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Pasquale Viscusi on behalf of New York City Department of Education..(Viscusi, Pasquale) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #9 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer On Consent addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Simone Nicholson dated June14, 2022.FIRST LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference On Consent addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Simone Nicholson dated June14, 2022., #1 Complaint; granting #9 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application GRANTED. SO ORDERED. New York City Department of Education answer due 9/14/2022. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 6/14/2022) (tg) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer On Consent addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Simone Nicholson dated June14, 2022., FIRST LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference On Consent addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Simone Nicholson dated June14, 2022. Document filed by New York City Department of Education..(Nicholson, Wynstelle) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Wynstelle Simone Nicholson on behalf of New York City Department of Education..(Nicholson, Wynstelle) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. New York City Department of Education served on 5/25/2022, answer due 6/15/2022. Service was accepted by serviceecf@law.nyc.gov. Service was made by email. Document filed by A.C.; A.C. on behalf of his child A.C., a minor..(Roller, Irina) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to New York City Department of Education. (sj) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE FOR CASES FILED UNDER 20 U.S.C. 1415(i)(3): Initial Conference set for 8/12/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 443, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 5/24/2022) (jca) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NEW YORK CITY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by A.C., A.C. on behalf of his child A.C., a minor..(Roller, Irina) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Irina Roller to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the TO section of the PDF is blank. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (gp) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (gp) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (gp) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(gp) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Roller, Irina) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NEW YORK CITY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by A.C., A.C. on behalf of his child A.C., a minor..(Roller, Irina) Modified on 5/23/2022 (gp). (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against New York City Department of Education. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26179018)Document filed by A.C., A.C. on behalf of his child A.C., a minor..(Roller, Irina) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where A.C. is a litigant

Latest cases where New York City Department of Education is a litigant