This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 09:48:47

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 a Immigration - Other Immigration case was filed by Abu Jbareh against United States Citizenship and Immigration Services in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District.

Case Details

  • Case Number 1:19-CV-03361
  • Filing Date 05/17/2019
  • Case Status Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type Immigration - Other Immigration
  • Jurisdiction U.S. District Courts
  • Judge Charles R. Norgle, Sr
  • Courthouse Illinois Northern District

Party Details

  • Defendant uscis
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Plaintiff Jihad Abu Jbareh
  • Represented By
    • Alexander Albert Michael
  • Defendant United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
  • Represented By
    • AUSA - Chicago
    • Elizabeth Inez Treacy
  • Plaintiff Margaret Wangler
  • Represented By
    • Alexander Albert Michael
  • Defendant U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
  • Represented By
    • AUSA - Chicago
    • Elizabeth Inez Treacy

Court Documents

#5

RESTRICTED

Fees Apply
#4

RESTRICTED

Fees Apply
#3

RESTRICTED

Fees Apply
#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Michael, Alexander) (Entered: 05/17/...

Fees Apply
#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Jihad Abu Jbareh; Filing fee $ 400, ...

Fees Apply

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2019
  • (#5) DESIGNATION of Elizabeth Inez Treacy as U.S. Attorney for Defendant United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (Treacy, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/04/2019)
  • 06/03/2019
  • (#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiffs Jihad Abu Jbareh, Margaret Wangler regarding Summons and Complaint served on US Attorney's Office on 5/29/2019 (Michael, Alexander) (Entered: 06/03/2019)
  • 06/03/2019
  • (#3) AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiffs Jihad Abu Jbareh, Margaret Wangler regarding Summons and Complaint served on USCIS on 5/29/2019 (Michael, Alexander) (Entered: 06/03/2019)
  • 05/20/2019
  • SUMMONS Issued as to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General (pj, ) (Entered: 05/20/2019)
  • 05/20/2019
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lma, ) (Entered: 05/20/2019)
  • 05/17/2019
  • (#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Michael, Alexander) (Entered: 05/17/2019)
  • 05/17/2019
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Jihad Abu Jbareh; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15841221.(Michael, Alexander) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.