This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/13/2020 at 08:33:37 (UTC).

Absher/Kitchell JV v. Puyallup Tribe of Indians

Case Summary

On 09/14/2020 Absher/Kitchell JV filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against Puyallup Tribe of Indians. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Barbara J. Rothstein. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-05917

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Barbara J. Rothstein

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Absher/Kitchell JV

Defendant

Puyallup Tribe of Indians

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John P Ahlers

Attorney at AHLERS CRESSMAN & SLEIGHT, PLLC

999 Third Ave, Suite 3800

Seattle, WA 98104

Nicholas C Korst

Attorney at AHLERS CRESSMAN & SLEIGHT, PLLC

999 Third Ave, Suite 3800

Seattle, WA 98104

Lindsay Taft Watkins

Attorney at AHLERS CRESSMAN & SLEIGHT, PLLC

999 Third Ave, Suite 3800

Seattle, WA 98104

Defendant Attorneys

Lauren King

Attorney at FOSTER GARVEY PC (SEA)

1111 3Rd Avenue, Ste 3000

Seattle, WA 98101-3299

Jon Grawn Hongladarom

Attorney at FOSTER GARVEY PC (SEA)

1111 3Rd Avenue, Ste 3000

Seattle, WA 98101-3299

 

Court Documents

#22

(#22) ORDER granting the parties' #21 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal. This action is dismissed in its entirety with prejudice. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein.(PM) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

21 #1

Proposed Order

#21

(#21) Joint MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice, filed by Defendant Puyallup Tribe of Indians. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/9/2020, (King, Lauren) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

#20

(#20) ORDER granting Parties' #19 Stipulated Motion to Continue Stay of Case Pending Settlement Discussions. This case is stayed until November 6, 2020, and (a) the due date for Plaintiff's Reply in support of its Motion to Compel Arbitration (Dkt. #4 ) shall be November 13, 2020, and (b) Plaintiff's Response to Defendants Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. #14 ) shall not be due until November 30, 2020. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (LH) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

19 #1

Proposed Order

#19

(#19) Stipulated MOTION to Continue Stay of Case Pending Settlement Discussions, filed by Defendant Puyallup Tribe of Indians. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(King, Lauren) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

#18

(#18) ORDER granting parties' #17 Stipulated Motion to Stay Pending Settlement Discussions. This case is stayed until October 23, 2020, and (a) the due date for Plaintiff's Reply in support of its Motion to Compel Arbitration (Dkt. #4 ) shall be Monday, October 30, 2020, and (b) Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. #14 ) shall not be due until November 13, 2020. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein.(PM) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

14 #1

Proposed Order

#14

(#14) MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Defendant Puyallup Tribe of Indians. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/30/2020, (King, Lauren) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

5 #4

Exhibit D

5 #3

Exhibit C

5 #2

Exhibit B

5 #1

Exhibit A

4 #1

Proposed Order

#4

(#18) ORDER granting parties' #17 Stipulated Motion to Stay Pending Settlement Discussions. This case is stayed until October 23, 2020, and (a) the due date for Plaintiff's Reply in support of its Motion to Compel Arbitration (Dkt. #4 ) shall be Monday, October 30, 2020, and (b) Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. #14 ) shall not be due until November 13, 2020. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein.(PM) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

#3

(#3) PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff Absher/Kitchell J.V. (Ahlers, John) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET ; filed by Plaintiff Absher/Kitchell J.V.. (Ahlers, John) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

#1

(#7) NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (ERA) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER granting the parties' #21 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal. This action is dismissed in its entirety with prejudice. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein.(PM) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Joint MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice, filed by Defendant Puyallup Tribe of Indians. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/9/2020, (King, Lauren) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER granting Parties' #19 Stipulated Motion to Continue Stay of Case Pending Settlement Discussions. This case is stayed until November 6, 2020, and (a) the due date for Plaintiff's Reply in support of its Motion to Compel Arbitration (Dkt. #4 ) shall be November 13, 2020, and (b) Plaintiff's Response to Defendants Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. #14 ) shall not be due until November 30, 2020. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (LH) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Stipulated MOTION to Continue Stay of Case Pending Settlement Discussions, filed by Defendant Puyallup Tribe of Indians. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(King, Lauren) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER granting parties' #17 Stipulated Motion to Stay Pending Settlement Discussions. This case is stayed until October 23, 2020, and (a) the due date for Plaintiff's Reply in support of its Motion to Compel Arbitration (Dkt. #4 ) shall be Monday, October 30, 2020, and (b) Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. #14 ) shall not be due until November 13, 2020. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein.(PM) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Stipulated MOTION to Stay Case Pending Settlement Discussions, filed by Defendant Puyallup Tribe of Indians. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(King, Lauren) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) STANDING ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (LW) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAttorney Jon Grawn Hongladarom for Puyallup Tribe of Indians added; per #11 Notice of Appearance. (TH) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) DECLARATION of Robert L. Hunter, Jr. filed by Defendant Puyallup Tribe of Indians re #14 MOTION to Dismiss (King, Lauren) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Defendant Puyallup Tribe of Indians. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/30/2020, (King, Lauren) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Puyallup Tribe of Indians on 9/15/2020, filed by Plaintiff Absher/Kitchell JV. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ahlers, John) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Puyallup Tribe of Indians. (ERA) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (ERA) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketJudge Barbara J. Rothstein added. (ERA) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Absher Construction Co., Corporate Parent Kitchell Corporation, Other Affiliate Kitchell Contractors, Inc. for Absher/Kitchell JV. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Absher/Kitchell JV (Ahlers, John) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DECLARATION of Lindsay Watkins filed by Plaintiff Absher/Kitchell J.V. re #4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Ahlers, John) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Compel Arbitration, filed by Plaintiff Absher/Kitchell J.V.. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/9/2020, (Ahlers, John) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff Absher/Kitchell J.V. (Ahlers, John) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET ; filed by Plaintiff Absher/Kitchell J.V.. (Ahlers, John) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Puyallup Tribe of Indians (Receipt # WAWDC-6595456) Attorney John P Ahlers added to party Absher/Kitchell J.V.(pty:pla), filed by Absher/Kitchell J.V..(Ahlers, John) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Puyallup Tribe of Indians is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John P Ahlers