This case was last updated from PACER on 04/21/2019 at 07:26:49 (UTC).

ABS-CBN Corporation et al v. dramaslikes.com et al

Case Summary

On 02/20/2019 ABS-CBN Corporation filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against dramaslikes com. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Federico A. Moreno and Barry S. Seltzer. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:19-CV-60448

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Federico A. Moreno

Referral Judge

Barry S. Seltzer

 

Party Details

Defendants

ofwpinoychannel.su

pinoylambinganreplay.su

lambinganofw.su

dramaslikes.com

ofwtv.info

pinoyph.ru

pinoyflixtv.su

tambayun.com

wowpinoytvs.com

pinoymovies.me

pinoy

pinoytv2019.su

ofwpinoytambayans.su

ofwpinoytv.com

magtvnaph.com

lambingantv.tv

filikulamo.me

braine.win

pinoytvae.com

ediahs.science

34 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

T. Raquel Wiborg-Rodriguez

Attorney at Stephen M. Gaffigan, P.A.

401 East Las Olas Boulevard, Suite 130-453

Ft. Lauderdale, FL 33301

Stephen Michael Gaffigan

Attorney at Stpehen M. Gaffigan, P.A.

401 East Las Olas Blvd., #130-453

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33316

Christine Ann Daley

Attorney at Stephen M. Gaffigan, P.A.

401 East Las Olas Boulevard, Suite 130-453

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Virgilio Gigante

Attorney at Stephen M Gaffigan PA

401 E Las Olas Boulevard, #130-453

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO ENTER DEFAULT as to all Defendants. The Clerk is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/28/2019. See attached document for full details. (km02) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

10 #3

Affidavit of Service

10 #2

Affidavit of Service

10 #1

Affidavit of Service

#10

(#10) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by ABS-CBN Film Productions, Inc., ABS-CBN Corporation, ABS-CBN International. 10kadumsony.net served on 3/7/2019, answer due 3/28/2019; ceneko.com served on 3/7/2019, answer due 3/28/2019; dramaserver.com served on 3/7/2019, answer due 3/28/2019; dramaslikes.com served on 3/7/2019, answer due 3/28/2019; filikulamo.me served on 3/7/2019, answer due 3/28/2019; fullhdpinoymovies.com served on 3/7/2019, answer due 3/28/2019; fullpinoymoviesonline.com served on 3/7/2019, answer due 3/28/2019; herpal.su served on 3/7/2019, answer due 3/28/2019; lambinganofw.su served on 3/7/2019, answer due 3/28/2019; lambinganpinoytambayan.com served on 3/7/2019, answer due 3/28/2019; lambingantv.tv served on 3/7/2019, answer due 3/28/2019; ofwpinoychannel.su served on 3/7/2019, answer due 3/28/2019; ofwpinoytv.com served on 3/7/2019, answer due 3/28/2019; ofwtv.info served on 3/7/2019, answer due 3/28/2019; ofwtv.su served on 3/7/2019, answer due 3/28/2019; pariwikihd.com served on 3/7/2019, answer due 3/28/2019; pinoyakochannel.com served on 3/7/2019, answer due 3/28/2019; pinoychannels.co served on 3/7/2019, answer due 3/28/2019; pinoyflixtv.su served on 3/7/2019, answer due 3/28/2019; pinoylambinganhd.com served on 3/7/2019, answer due 3/28/2019; pinoylambinganhd.net served on 3/7/2019, answer due 3/28/2019; pinoylambinganreplay.su served on 3/7/2019, answer due 3/28/2019; pinoymovieonline.net served on 3/7/2019, answer due 3/28/2019; pinoymovies.me served on 3/7/2019, answer due 3/28/2019; pinoymovieshub.co served on 3/7/2019, answer due 3/28/2019; pinoyph.ru served on 3/7/2019, answer due 3/28/2019; pinoytv2019.su served on 3/7/2019, answer due 3/28/2019; pinoytvae.com served on 3/7/2019, answer due 3/28/2019; sinepinoy.net served on 3/7/2019, answer due 3/28/2019; tambayan.blog served on 3/7/2019, answer due 3/28/2019; tambayanplay.net served on 3/7/2019, answer due 3/28/2019; tambayun.com served on 3/7/2019, answer due 3/28/2019; viewasian.io served on 3/7/2019, answer due 3/28/2019; watchfree1.com served on 3/7/2019, answer due 3/28/2019; wowpinoytvs.com served on 3/7/2019, answer due 3/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service, #2 Affidavit of Service, #3 Affidavit of Service)(Gaffigan, Stephen) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

#9

(#9) Summons Issued as to 10kadumsony.net, ceneko.com, dramaserver.com, dramaslikes.com, filikulamo.me, fullhdpinoymovies.com, fullpinoymoviesonline.com, herpal.su, lambinganofw.su, lambinganpinoytambayan.com, lambingantv.tv, ofwpinoychannel.su, ofwpinoytv.com, ofwtv.info, ofwtv.su, pariwikihd.com, pinoyakochannel.com, pinoychannels.co, pinoyflixtv.su, pinoylambinganhd.com, pinoylambinganhd.net, pinoylambinganreplay.su, pinoymovieonline.net, pinoymovies.me, pinoymovieshub.co, pinoyph.ru, pinoytv2019.su, pinoytvae.com, sinepinoy.net, tambayan.blog, tambayanplay.net, tambayun.com, viewasian.io, watchfree1.com, wowpinoytvs.com. (vmz) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

8 #1

Summon(s) Proposed Summonses

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by ABS-CBN Corporation, ABS-CBN Film Productions, Inc., ABS-CBN International re #6 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) Proposed Summonses) (Daley, Christine) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

#7

(#7) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer for any and all pretrial matters. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 2/25/2019. See attached document for full details. (km02) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER granting #5 Plaintiffs' Motion for Order Authorizing Alternate Service of Process on Defendants. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 2/25/2019. See attached document for full details. (km02) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

5 #2

Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Christine Ann Daley

5 #1

Declaration of Christine Ann Daley in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Or

#5

(#5) Plaintiff's MOTION for Order Authorizing Alternate Service of Process on Defendants Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(f)(3) by ABS-CBN Corporation, ABS-CBN Film Productions, Inc., ABS-CBN International. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christine Ann Daley in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Order Authorizing Alternate Service of Process on Defendants, #2 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Christine Ann Daley, #3 Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of Christine Ann Daley, #4 Declaration of Kathleen Burns in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Order Authorizing Alternate Service of Process on Defendants, #5 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Kathleen Burns, #6 Text of Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Order Authorizing Alternate Service of Process on Defendants Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(f)(3))(Daley, Christine) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

1 #4

Exhibit 3 to the Complaint

1 #3

Exhibit 2 to the Complaint

1 #2

Exhibit 1 to the Complaint

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Damages and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11407982, filed by ABS-CBN Film Productions, Inc., ABS-CBN Corporation, ABS-CBN International. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 to the Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2 to the Complaint, #4 Exhibit 3 to the Complaint)(Gaffigan, Stephen) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Clerks Entry of Default as to 10kadumsony.net, ceneko.com, dramaserver.com, dramaslikes.com, filikulamo.me, fullhdpinoymovies.com, fullpinoymoviesonline.com, herpal.su, lambinganofw.su, lambinganpinoytambayan.com, lambingantv.tv, ofwpinoychannel.su, ofwpinoytv.com, ofwtv.info, ofwtv.su, pariwikihd.com, pinoyakochannel.com, pinoychannels.co, pinoyflixtv.su, pinoylambinganhd.com, pinoylambinganhd.net, pinoylambinganreplay.su, pinoymovieonline.net, pinoymovies.me, pinoymovieshub.co, pinoyph.ru, pinoytv2019.su, pinoytvae.com, sinepinoy.net, tambayan.blog, tambayanplay.net, tambayun.com, viewasian.io, watchfree1.com, wowpinoytvs.com per Order Directing Clerk to Enter Default Re: #11 Order Directing Clerk to Enter Default. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 4/1/2019. (lh) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Terminated following #11 ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO ENTER DEFAULT. Closing Case. (km02) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO ENTER DEFAULT as to all Defendants. The Clerk is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/28/2019. See attached document for full details. (km02) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by ABS-CBN Film Productions, Inc., ABS-CBN Corporation, ABS-CBN International. 10kadumsony.net served on 3/7/2019, answer due 3/28/2019; ceneko.com served on 3/7/2019, answer due 3/28/2019; dramaserver.com served on 3/7/2019, answer due 3/28/2019; dramaslikes.com served on 3/7/2019, answer due 3/28/2019; filikulamo.me served on 3/7/2019, answer due 3/28/2019; fullhdpinoymovies.com served on 3/7/2019, answer due 3/28/2019; fullpinoymoviesonline.com served on 3/7/2019, answer due 3/28/2019; herpal.su served on 3/7/2019, answer due 3/28/2019; lambinganofw.su served on 3/7/2019, answer due 3/28/2019; lambinganpinoytambayan.com served on 3/7/2019, answer due 3/28/2019; lambingantv.tv served on 3/7/2019, answer due 3/28/2019; ofwpinoychannel.su served on 3/7/2019, answer due 3/28/2019; ofwpinoytv.com served on 3/7/2019, answer due 3/28/2019; ofwtv.info served on 3/7/2019, answer due 3/28/2019; ofwtv.su served on 3/7/2019, answer due 3/28/2019; pariwikihd.com served on 3/7/2019, answer due 3/28/2019; pinoyakochannel.com served on 3/7/2019, answer due 3/28/2019; pinoychannels.co served on 3/7/2019, answer due 3/28/2019; pinoyflixtv.su served on 3/7/2019, answer due 3/28/2019; pinoylambinganhd.com served on 3/7/2019, answer due 3/28/2019; pinoylambinganhd.net served on 3/7/2019, answer due 3/28/2019; pinoylambinganreplay.su served on 3/7/2019, answer due 3/28/2019; pinoymovieonline.net served on 3/7/2019, answer due 3/28/2019; pinoymovies.me served on 3/7/2019, answer due 3/28/2019; pinoymovieshub.co served on 3/7/2019, answer due 3/28/2019; pinoyph.ru served on 3/7/2019, answer due 3/28/2019; pinoytv2019.su served on 3/7/2019, answer due 3/28/2019; pinoytvae.com served on 3/7/2019, answer due 3/28/2019; sinepinoy.net served on 3/7/2019, answer due 3/28/2019; tambayan.blog served on 3/7/2019, answer due 3/28/2019; tambayanplay.net served on 3/7/2019, answer due 3/28/2019; tambayun.com served on 3/7/2019, answer due 3/28/2019; viewasian.io served on 3/7/2019, answer due 3/28/2019; watchfree1.com served on 3/7/2019, answer due 3/28/2019; wowpinoytvs.com served on 3/7/2019, answer due 3/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service, #2 Affidavit of Service, #3 Affidavit of Service)(Gaffigan, Stephen) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Summons Issued as to 10kadumsony.net, ceneko.com, dramaserver.com, dramaslikes.com, filikulamo.me, fullhdpinoymovies.com, fullpinoymoviesonline.com, herpal.su, lambinganofw.su, lambinganpinoytambayan.com, lambingantv.tv, ofwpinoychannel.su, ofwpinoytv.com, ofwtv.info, ofwtv.su, pariwikihd.com, pinoyakochannel.com, pinoychannels.co, pinoyflixtv.su, pinoylambinganhd.com, pinoylambinganhd.net, pinoylambinganreplay.su, pinoymovieonline.net, pinoymovies.me, pinoymovieshub.co, pinoyph.ru, pinoytv2019.su, pinoytvae.com, sinepinoy.net, tambayan.blog, tambayanplay.net, tambayun.com, viewasian.io, watchfree1.com, wowpinoytvs.com. (vmz) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by ABS-CBN Corporation, ABS-CBN Film Productions, Inc., ABS-CBN International re #6 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) Proposed Summonses) (Daley, Christine) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer for any and all pretrial matters. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 2/25/2019. See attached document for full details. (km02) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER granting #5 Plaintiffs' Motion for Order Authorizing Alternate Service of Process on Defendants. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 2/25/2019. See attached document for full details. (km02) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Plaintiff's MOTION for Order Authorizing Alternate Service of Process on Defendants Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(f)(3) by ABS-CBN Corporation, ABS-CBN Film Productions, Inc., ABS-CBN International. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christine Ann Daley in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Order Authorizing Alternate Service of Process on Defendants, #2 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Christine Ann Daley, #3 Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of Christine Ann Daley, #4 Declaration of Kathleen Burns in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Order Authorizing Alternate Service of Process on Defendants, #5 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Kathleen Burns, #6 Text of Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Order Authorizing Alternate Service of Process on Defendants Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(f)(3))(Daley, Christine) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by ABS-CBN Corporation, ABS-CBN Film Productions, Inc., ABS-CBN International identifying Other Affiliate PCD Nominee Corporation, Other Affiliate ABS-CBN Holdings Corporation, Other Affiliate Lopez, Inc. for ABS-CBN Corporation (Daley, Christine) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (vmz) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • (#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (vmz) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for Damages and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11407982, filed by ABS-CBN Film Productions, Inc., ABS-CBN Corporation, ABS-CBN International. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 to the Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2 to the Complaint, #4 Exhibit 3 to the Complaint)(Gaffigan, Stephen) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.