This case was last updated from PACER on 10/18/2020 at 08:13:03 (UTC).

Abramsky v. Cavalry Portfolio Services, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 08/19/2020 Abramsky filed an Other lawsuit against Cavalry Portfolio Services, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Nelson Stephen Roman. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:20-CV-06619

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nelson Stephen Roman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shoshanah Abramsky

Defendants

Cavalry SPV I, LLC

Cavalry Portfolio Services, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Raphael Deutsch

Attorney at Stein Saks PLLC

285 Passaic St

Hackensack, NJ 07601

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY AGREED TO by the Plaintiff and Plaintiff's attorney, that whereas no party hereto is an infant, incompetent person for whom a committee has been appointed or conservatee, and no person not a party has an interest in the subject matter of the action, that the above entitled action against Defendants shall be and hereby is dismissed with prejudice and on the merits, without costs, or disbursements, or attorney's fees to any party pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and that judgment of dismissal with prejudice may be entered in the above entitled action pursuant hereto. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 10/08/2020) (ama) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, against the defendant(s) Cavalry Portfolio Services, LLC, Cavalry SPV I, LLC. Document filed by Shoshanah Abramsky. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Deutsch, Raphael) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Settlement . Document filed by Shoshanah Abramsky..(Deutsch, Raphael) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Deutsch, Raphael) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Cavalry Portfolio Services, LLC, Cavalry SPV I, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21221790)Document filed by Shoshanah Abramsky. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit).(Deutsch, Raphael) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY AGREED TO by the Plaintiff and Plaintiff's attorney, that whereas no party hereto is an infant, incompetent person for whom a committee has been appointed or conservatee, and no person not a party has an interest in the subject matter of the action, that the above entitled action against Defendants shall be and hereby is dismissed with prejudice and on the merits, without costs, or disbursements, or attorney's fees to any party pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and that judgment of dismissal with prejudice may be entered in the above entitled action pursuant hereto. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 10/08/2020) (ama) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #4 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal was reviewed and referred to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman for approval for the following reason(s): and that judgment of dismissal with prejudice may be entered in the above entitled action pursuant hereto. (km) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, against the defendant(s) Cavalry Portfolio Services, LLC, Cavalry SPV I, LLC. Document filed by Shoshanah Abramsky. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Deutsch, Raphael) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Settlement . Document filed by Shoshanah Abramsky..(Deutsch, Raphael) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Raphael Deutsch. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Sullivan;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Deutsch, Raphael) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Cavalry Portfolio Services, LLC, Cavalry SPV I, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21221790)Document filed by Shoshanah Abramsky. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit).(Deutsch, Raphael) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less