This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/06/2021 at 08:43:47 (UTC).

Abrams et al v. The Kroger Co.

Case Summary

On 04/07/2021 Abrams filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against The Kroger Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael R. Barrett and Timothy S. Black. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00240

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Michael R. Barrett

Timothy S. Black

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Delilah Parker

Shelly Church

Kevin Corbett

Martin Pinales

Eula Douglas

Albert Abrams

Defendant

The Kroger Co.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert R Sparks

Attorney at Strauss Troy Co., LPA

150 East Fourth Street

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Terence Richard Coates

Attorney at Markovits, Stock & DeMarco, LLC

3825 Edwards Road, Suite 650

Cincinnati, OH 45209

John A Yanchunis

Attorney at Morgan & Morgan Complex Litigation Group

201 N. Franklin St., 7Th Floor

Tampa, FL 33602

Michael Anderson Berry

Attorney at Arnold Law Firm

865 Howe Avenue, Sacramento

Sacramento, CA 95825

Ryan D. Maxey

Attorney at Morgan and Morgan Complex Litigation Group

201 N. Franklin Street, 7Th Floor

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant Attorney

Nathaniel Lampley, Jr

Attorney at Vorys Sater Seymour & Pease - 1

301 E. Fourth Street, Suite 3500, Great American Tower

Cincinnati, OH 45202

 

Court Documents

#12

#15

#14

#5

#12

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION to Appoint Counsel Interim Class Counsel by Plaintiffs Albert Abrams, Shelly Church, Kevin Corbett, Eula Douglas, Delilah Parker, Martin Pinales. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Appoint Interim Class Counsel, #2 Coates Declaration in Support of Motion to Appoint Interim Class Counsel, #3 Proposed Order on Motion to Appoint Interim Class Counsel) (Coates, Terence) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER signed by Judge Matthew W. McFarland and Judge Timothy S. Black on 5/20/2021. The Judges agree that Case Numbers 1:21-cv-146; 1:21-cv-174; 1:21-cv-198; 1:21-cv-226; 1:21-cv-240; 1:21-cv-279; and 1:21-cv-323 ARE related. Case reassigned to Judge Timothy S. Black for all further proceedings. (kl) Modified on 5/24/2021 (eh). (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReset Deadlines re doc. #12 : The Kroger Co. answer due 6/28/2021. (eh) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Defendant The Kroger Co.. (Lampley, Nathaniel) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTATION ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of John A. Yanchunis; granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Ryan D. Maxey as Co-Counsel. Co-Counsel is directed to register for e-filing Through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 5/19/2021. (eh) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8311863) of Ryan D. Maxey by Plaintiffs Albert Abrams, Shelly Church, Kevin Corbett, Eula Douglas, Delilah Parker, Martin Pinales. (Attachments: #1 Florida Supreme Court Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Sparks, Robert) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8311845) of John A. Yanchunis by Plaintiffs Albert Abrams, Shelly Church, Kevin Corbett, Eula Douglas, Delilah Parker, Martin Pinales. (Attachments: #1 Florida Supreme Court Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Sparks, Robert) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTATION ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of M. Anderson Berry as Co-Counsel. Co-Counsel is directed to register for e-filingthrough PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 5/6/2021. (eh) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8292907) of M. Anderson Berry by Plaintiffs Albert Abrams, Shelly Church, Kevin Corbett, Eula Douglas, Delilah Parker, Martin Pinales. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Sparks, Robert) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Correction re: #8 MOTION Admission Pro Hac Vice of M. Anderson Berry Document was filed using the incorrect event type, the filer contacted the Clerk's Office and will re-file the document using the correct event. (bjc) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) [FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE DISREGARD] MOTION Admission Pro Hac Vice of M. Anderson Berry by Plaintiffs Albert Abrams, Shelly Church, Kevin Corbett, Eula Douglas, Delilah Parker, Martin Pinales. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Sparks, Robert) Modified Docket Text and Security on 5/3/2021 (bjc). (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that case numbers 1:21-cv-279, 1:21-cv-146, 1:21-cv-174, 1:21-cv-198, 1:21-cv-226 and 1:21-cv-240 ARE related. Case reassigned to Judge Timothy S. Black for all further proceedings. (kh) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Unopposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Plaintiffs Albert Abrams, Shelly Church, Kevin Corbett, Eula Douglas, Delilah Parker, Martin Pinales. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Coates, Terence) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Terence Richard Coates for Plaintiffs Albert Abrams, Shelly Church, Kevin Corbett, Eula Douglas, Delilah Parker, Martin Pinales (Coates, Terence) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that the cases and case numbers 1:21-cv-240, 1:21-cv-146, 1:21-cv-174, 1:21-cv-198, 1:21-cv-226 ARE related. Case reassigned to Judge Timothy S. Black for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 4/19/2021. (kh) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketIf this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (kh) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against The Kroger Co. ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8255665), filed by Martin Pinales, Eula Douglas, Albert Abrams, Kevin Corbett, Shelly Church, Delilah Parker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice of Data Breach, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Sparks, Robert) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Kroger Co is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nathaniel Lampley, Jr.